TopPop LLC
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Alan S Trust |
Case #: | 8:23-bk-72310 |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2023 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 18, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
TopPop LLC
44 Seabro Avenue
Amityville, NY 11701 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Gerard R Luckman, Esq.
Subchapter V Trustee Forcelli Deegan Terrana, LLP 333 Earle Ovington Blvd., Suite 1010
Uniondale, NY 11553 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722 |
Docket last updated: 06/27/2023 8:00 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Wed 06/28 1:00 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:8 23-72310 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A21748014. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
17
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 06/28 12:58 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Subchapter V. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Richard S Feinsilver on behalf of TopPop LLC Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Due by 09/26/2023. Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Due by 09/26/2023. (Feinsilver, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 1073b Statement | ||
2 | 2
motion
Authorize/Direct
Wed 06/28 2:24 PM
Emergency Motion to Borrow From Iconic Brands, Inc. to Fund Pre-Petition Payroll and Related Obligation on an expedited basis , in addition to Motion to Pay PrePetition Wages , in addition to Motion to Authorize/Direct Debtor to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Account for a Limited Period , in addition to Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Richard S Feinsilver on behalf of TopPop LLC. (Feinsilver, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Scheduling Hearing on an Expedited Basis | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit - Local Rule 9077-1 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Borrow
Wed 06/28 2:33 PM
Emergency Motion to Borrow from Iconic Brands, Inc to Fund Pre-Petition Payroll and Related Obligations Filed by Richard S Feinsilver on behalf of TopPop LLC. (Feinsilver, Richard) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Authorize/Direct
Wed 06/28 2:36 PM
Emergency Motion to Authorize/Direct Debtor to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Accounts for a Limited Period Filed by Richard S Feinsilver on behalf of TopPop LLC. (Feinsilver, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
motion
Continuation of Utility Service
Wed 06/28 2:37 PM
Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Richard S Feinsilver on behalf of TopPop LLC. (Feinsilver, Richard) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
trustee
Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee
Wed 06/28 3:21 PM
Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Gerard R. Luckman . Gerard R Luckman, Esq. added to the case. 341 Meeting Date Scheduled for July 18, 2023 at 2:00 p.m., at Room 562 Filed by United States Trustee.(Black, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Sub Chapter V Trustee's Verified Statement | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 06/28 4:12 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Paul Rachmuth on behalf of Iconic Brands, Inc. (Rachmuth, Paul) |
|
8 | 8
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Wed 06/28 4:19 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Partnership Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(b)due by 6/28/2023. Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 6/28/2023. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 6/28/2023. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 6/28/2023. Subchapter V Balance Sheet due by 7/5/2023. Subchapter V Cash Flow Statement due by 7/5/2023. Small Business Statement of Operations Subchapter V due by 7/5/2023. Subchapter V Tax Return due by 7/5/2023. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 7/12/2023. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 7/12/2023. Schedule G due 7/12/2023. Schedule H due 7/12/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 7/12/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 7/12/2023. (ssw) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Wed 06/28 4:24 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/18/2023 at 10:00 AM at Room 562, 560 Federal Plaza, CI, NY. (ssw) |