South Carolina District Court
Judge:Donald C Coggins, Jr
Case #: 6:23-cv-03079
Nature of Suit130 Contract - Miller Act
Cause40:3131 Miller Act
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2023
Terminated:Nov 01, 2023
Last checked: Monday Dec 25, 2023 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
ML Builders LLC
Defendant
United Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By
Everett Augustus Kendall, II
Murphy And Grantland (col)
contact info
Plaintiff
MCG Mechanical Inc
Represented By
Charles Harry McDonald
Belser And Belser
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 11/01 3:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by MCG Mechanical Inc. (McDonald, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Fri 10/20 11:57 AM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Pretrial Telephone Conference, Monday October 30, 2023 cancelled and rescheduled to: Pretrial Telephone Conference set for Monday, 11/13/2023 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Instructions remain the same.(alew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Thu 09/28 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Pretrial Telephone Conference, Thursday October 26, 2023 @ 11:00am cancelled and rescheduled to: Pretrial Telephone Conference set for Monday, 10/30/2023 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. *Instructions remain the same(alew) Modified on 9/28/2023 to edit text (alew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
17 17 order Pretrial Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 09/21 4:10 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Telephone Conference. Conference set for Thursday, October 26, 2023 11:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/21/23. (alew)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/21 4:01 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/11/2023, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/5/2023, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/2/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/29/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/20/2024, Discovery due by 3/19/2024, Motions due by 4/2/2024, Mediation Due by 4/16/2024, Motion in Limine due by 5/20/2024, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/27/2024, Bench Trial Deadline 6/17/2024. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/21/23. (alew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
15 15 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 09/01 12:06 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ML Builders LLC (alew)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Entry Deletion Fri 09/01 12:05 PM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 12 Reason: attorney refiled to make correction. Corrected Filing Document Number13 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: 8/30/23. (alew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
13 13 misc Request for Entry of Default Fri 09/01 9:59 AM
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant ML Builders, LLC by MCG Mechanical Inc.(McDonald, Charles) Modified on 9/1/2023 to correct filing date (alew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of default
12 12 motion Entry of Default Wed 08/30 2:37 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant ML Builders, LLC by MCG Mechanical Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/13/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(McDonald, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of default
Monday, August 14, 2023
11 11 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 08/14 3:21 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United Fire and Casualty Company.(alew)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/14 3:20 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by United Fire and Casualty Company.(alew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Agreement of Indemnity
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/14 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Everett Augustus Kendall, II on behalf of United Fire and Casualty Company (Kendall, Everett) Modified on 8/14/2023 to remove and file documents that should be filed separately . See10 ,11 (alew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
8 8 misc Letter Extending Time to Answer Wed 07/26 2:21 PM
LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER All Defendants. (McDonald, Charles)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Wed 07/26 2:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MCG Mechanical Inc. ML Builders LLC served on 7/19/2023, answer due 8/9/2023.(McDonald, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit SCSOS Letter accepting service
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Wed 07/12 12:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MCG Mechanical Inc. United Fire and Casualty Company served on 7/3/2023, answer due 7/24/2023.(alew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Acceptance of Service Letter
5 5 service Acceptance of Service - Complaint Served Tue 07/11 10:25 AM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by MCG Mechanical Inc. United Fire and Casualty Company served on 7/3/2023, answer due 7/24/2023.(McDonald, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Acceptance of Service ltr
Thursday, June 29, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 06/29 10:15 AM
Summons Issued as to ML Builders LLC, United Fire and Casualty Company.(alew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons United Fire and Casualty Company
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 06/29 10:13 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by MCG Mechanical Inc.(alew) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/29/2023) (alew, ). Modified on 6/29/2023 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (alew, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/29 10:11 AM
COMPLAINT against ML Builders LLC, United Fire and Casualty Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11182132.), filed by MCG Mechanical Inc. Service due by 9/26/2023(alew)
Related: [-]