California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: Alexander F Mackinnon
Case #: 2:23-cv-05157
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2023
Terminated:Jan 26, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Cour, 23CHCV01512
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 26, 2023 12:34 AM PST
Defendant
Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.
Represented By
Adam J Fiss
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Kyra Alexandra Buch
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Linda Krieger
Represented By
Linda Guthmann Krieger
Krieger And Krieger Alc
contact info
Plaintiff
Gavino Guitierrez Simmental
Represented By
John F Litwin
Barkhordarian Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Gregory P Wong
Barkhordarian Law Firm PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 63 minutes ago
Friday, January 26, 2024
25 25 order Dismissing Case Mon 01/29 8:17 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL ON STIPULATION by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation24 , Plaintiff's claims are dismissed in their entirety with prejudice. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
24 24 stip Dismiss Case Thu 01/25 9:52 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to All issues resolved filed by Plaintiff Gavino Guitierrez Simmental.(Litwin, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
23 23 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Tue 10/10 1:48 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Linda Krieger has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order Tue 09/19 11:31 AM
ORDER DENYING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., re Stipulation to Continue Trial Date21 . See document for details. (gk)
Related: [-]
21 21 stip Continue Mon 09/18 10:12 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue TRIAL from July 1, 2024 to July 29, 2024 filed by Defendant Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc..(Buch, Kyra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 28, 2023
20 20 9 pgs order Order Mon 08/28 10:02 AM
ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Mon 08/28 10:01 AM
PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
18 18 order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 08/28 9:58 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr: PLEASE READ THIS ORDER (AND ATTACHMENT) CAREFULLY: The Court VACATES the mandatory scheduling conference set for September 1, 2023, and issues this case management order. The post-settlement status conference is set for April 19, 2024 at 8:30 AM. The pretrial conference is set for June 14, 2024 at 10:00 AM. The jury trial is set for July 1, 2024 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DATES AND DEADLINES. (jgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
17 17 misc Disclosure Fri 08/04 2:14 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc. (Buch, Kyra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
16 16 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 08/01 8:07 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendant Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc... (Buch, Kyra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
15 15 order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Order Wed 07/26 10:16 AM
ORDER CONTINUING MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Having considered the request to continue the date of the Mandatory Scheduling Conference, the Court hereby orders that the Mandatory Scheduling Conference be set for September 1, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are advised that this continuance will not extend the case management deadlines that will be set, and they are ordered to include this entire paragraph verbatim in their Joint Rule 26(f) Report (which remains due on August 1, 2023) in the statement of the case. (jgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
14 14 stip Continue Tue 07/25 2:03 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference from Aug. 11, 2023 to Sep. 1, 2023 filed by Defendant Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc..(Buch, Kyra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Continuing Mandatory Scheduling Conference
Friday, July 14, 2023
13 13 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Sat 07/15 12:52 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on August 11, 2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by August 1, 2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Sat 07/15 12:50 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Fri 07/14 5:25 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:23-cv-05157 SB(AFMx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
10 10 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 07/11 9:05 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc., Initiating Documents served on 7/11/2023. (Buch, Kyra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
9 9 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final Wed 07/05 11:36 AM
STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Gavino Guitierrez Simmental. (Litwin, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 07/05 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gavino Guitierrez Simmental, (Litwin, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 07/05 11:26 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John F Litwin counsel for Plaintiff Gavino Guitierrez Simmental. Adding John F. Litwin as counsel of record for Gavino Guitierrez Simmental for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Gavino Guitierrez Simmental. (Litwin, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 07/05 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gavino Guitierrez Simmental, (Litwin, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Mon 07/03 12:42 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Thursday, June 29, 2023
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/29 2:10 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc. (Buch, Kyra)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 06/29 2:08 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Gavino Guitierrez Simmental; Defendant Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.; Barkhordarian Law Firm, PLC Counsel for Plaintiff. (Buch, Kyra)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 06/29 2:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.. (Buch, Kyra)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 06/29 2:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 23CHCV01512 Receipt No: ACACDC-35585240 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.. (Attorney Kyra Alexandra Buch added to party Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.(pty:dft))(Buch, Kyra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 74 pgs Declaration of KYRA A. BUCH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ACUITY BRANDS LIGHTING, INC.'S NOTICE TO FEDERAL COURT OF REMOVAL,
Att: 2 3 pgs Declaration of CHANDA KIRCHNER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ACUITY BRANDS LIGHTING, INC.'S NOTICE TO FEDERAL COURT OF REMOVAL
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 07/03 12:38 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc., Does. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Gavino Guitierrez Simmental. [FILED IN STATE COURT 05/24/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 07/03 12:41 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT 06/27/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT D TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]