Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joel D Applebaum
Case #: 4:23-bk-31065
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Delta Wholesale Tire Center, Inc.
G-3476 Saginaw St.
Burton, MI 48529
Represented By
George E. Jacobs
Bankruptcy Law Offices
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 06/28/2023 8:00 PM EDT
Thursday, June 29, 2023
crditcrd none Thu 06/29 2:43 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-31065 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A40857354, amount . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 06/29 2:40 PM
Chapter 11 SubChapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Delta Wholesale Tire Center, Inc. Schedule A/B due 07/13/2023. Schedule D due 07/13/2023. Schedule E/F due 07/13/2023. Schedule G due 07/13/2023. Schedule H due 07/13/2023. Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b) due 07/13/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs due 07/13/2023. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 07/13/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 07/13/2023. Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan due by 09/27/2023. (Jacobs, George)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Thu 06/29 2:41 PM
Chapter 11 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor In Possession Delta Wholesale Tire Center, Inc.. (Jacobs, George)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 06/29 2:42 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Debtor In Possession Delta Wholesale Tire Center, Inc.. (Jacobs, George)
Related: [-]