Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Timothy L Brooks
Case #: 5:23-cv-05105
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2023
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 26, 2023 2:34 AM CST
Amicus
American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By
Holly Elizabeth Dickson
Aclu Of Arkansas, Inc.
contact info
Amicus
Americans Civil Liberties Union of Arkansas
Represented By
Holly Elizabeth Dickson
Aclu Of Arkansas, Inc.
contact info
Amicus
Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By
Holly Elizabeth Dickson
Aclu Of Arkansas, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Tim Griffin
Represented By
Jordan Broyles
Arkansas Attorney General
contact info
Justin Brascher
Arkansas Attorney General
contact info
John O. Payne
Office Of Arkansas Attorney General
contact info
Noah Watson
contact info
Plaintiff
NetChoice, LLC
Represented By
James Xi
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Erin E. Murphy
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Marshall S. Ney
Friday, Eldredge & Clark, LLP
contact info
Joseph DeMott
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Katherine Church Campbell
Friday, Eldredge & Clark
contact info
Paul D. Clement
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
contact info

GPO Aug 31 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 31, 2023. (bjb)
GPO Mar 24 2024
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 48 Netchoice's Motion to Vacate Deadline for Initial Disclosures and to Stay Discovery and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 58 Attorney General's Motion to Deny or Defer Consideration of Netchoice's Motion for Summary Judgment Until Discovery is Completed. NOTE: See Order for deadlines. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 24, 2024. (slc)
GPO Mar 31 2025
ORDER GRANTING 66 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Summary Judgment. Arkansas Act 689 of 2023, the Social Media Safety Act, is PERMANENTLY ENJOINED. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 31, 2025. (Brooks, Timothy)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
85 85 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 04/30 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to78 Judgment,77 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by Tim Griffin. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AARWDC-3175717. (Purvis, Laura)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
84 84 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 04/29 8:50 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting81 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorney's Fees. The deadline to file such motion is extended to May 19, 2025. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 29, 2025. (acb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
83 83 10 pgs msupport Memorandum Brief in Support Mon 04/28 3:51 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of82 MOTION to Alter Judgment ;78 Judgment, ; by Tim Griffin. (Purvis, Laura)
Related: [-]
82 82 motion Alter Judgment Mon 04/28 3:50 PM
MOTION to Alter Judgment ;78 Judgment, ; by Tim Griffin. (Purvis, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
81 81 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 04/25 4:31 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by NetChoice, LLC. (Campbell, Katherine)
Related: [-]