Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:23-bk-10232

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mark D Houle
Case #: 6:23-ap-01062
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2023
Terminated:Mar 11, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jorge Ocampo Lopez, Defendant
Represented By
Jorge Ocampo Lopez
contact info
Defendant
Karina Ponce
23806 Elyce Court
Moreno Valley, CA 92553
Represented By
Karina Ponce
contact info
Plaintiff
Ivy Portfolio, LLC, Plaintiff
Represented By
Richard T Baum
Law Offices Of Richard T. Baum
contact info
Trustee
Larry D Simons (TR)
3610 Central Avenue, Suite 400
Riverside, CA 92506
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, March 11, 2024
41 41 court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/11 10:22 AM
Adversary Case 6:23-ap-1062 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (JC6)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 03, 2024
40 40 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 02/03 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 39 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, February 01, 2024
39 39 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Thu 02/01 4:48 PM
ORDER Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/1/2024 Related [+]. (JC6)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC,28 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC,30 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
38 38 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 02/01 11:37 AM
Hearing Held Related [+] - Off Calendar. Lodge order dismissing case uploaded. (JC6)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
37 37 misc Status report Tue 01/23 3:28 PM
Status report re Motion For Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC Related [+]. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-] 32 Motion for Default Judgment Corrected Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants Jorge Ocampo Lopez and Karina Ponce
Sunday, January 14, 2024
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 01/14 9:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Order on Motion for Default Judgment (BNC-PDF)
Friday, January 12, 2024
35 35 order DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Fri 01/12 1:39 PM
Order Denying Motion For Default Judgment Without Prejudice (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/12/2024. (JC6)
Related: [-] 32
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
34 34 court Hearing Held (Motion) Thu 01/11 11:24 AM
Hearing Held Related [+] - Motion Denied. Order by attorney. (JC6)
Related: [-] 28 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants Jorge Ocampo Lopez and Karina Ponce filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
33 33 court Hearing Set (Motion) (AP Case) Tue 12/05 11:37 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 1/10/2024 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 301, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Mark D. Houle (JC6) CORRECTION: HEARING ALREADY SET RE DOC. NO. 28 Modified on 12/5/2023 (JC6)
Related: [-] 32 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC
32 32 motion Default Judgment (motion) Tue 12/05 9:15 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Corrected Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants Jorge Ocampo Lopez and Karina Ponce Filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC Default Judgment Motion due by 01/4/2024. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
31 31 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 12/04 8:08 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - PDF document was not flattened prior to filing. Instructions for flattening a PDF document are available on court's website under CM/ECF Instructions to flatten PDF files. FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE FLATTEN DOCUMENT IMMEDIATELY. Related [+] (JC6)
Related: [-] 30 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC
Friday, December 01, 2023
30 30 motion Default Judgment (motion) Fri 12/01 9:26 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Corrected Motion for Default Judgment adding Defendant Karina Ponce to motion Filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC Default Judgment Motion due by 01/2/2024. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
29 29 court Hearing Set (Motion) (AP Case) Fri 12/01 8:23 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 1/10/2024 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 301, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Mark D. Houle (JC6)
Related: [-] 28 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC
Thursday, November 30, 2023
28 28 motion Default Judgment (motion) Thu 11/30 6:52 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants Jorge Ocampo Lopez and Karina Ponce Filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC Default Judgment Motion due by 01/2/2024. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Points and Aythorities
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Danny Elia in Support of Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, November 02, 2023
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 11/02 11:58 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 01/31/2024 at 02:00 PM 3420 Twelfth Street Courtroom 301 Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (JC6)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ivy Portfolio, LLC
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
27 27 notice Notice Wed 11/01 2:50 PM
Notice of Continued Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
26 26 misc Status report Wed 10/18 5:37 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC Related [+]. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-] 25 Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case)
Thursday, August 31, 2023
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 08/31 10:48 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 11/01/2023 at 02:00 PM 3420 Twelfth Street Courtroom 301 Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (JC6)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ivy Portfolio, LLC
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
25 25 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 08/31 12:15 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Related [+] Status Conference hearing to be held on 11/1/2023 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 301, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. No joint status report will be due. The case judge is Mark D. Houle (JC6)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC
Sunday, August 27, 2023
24 24 misc Supplemental Sun 08/27 10:48 AM
Supplemental to Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
23 23 misc Status report Wed 08/16 3:47 PM
Status report Unilateral Filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC Related [+]. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, August 14, 2023
22 22 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 08/14 11:22 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect PDF was attached to the docket entry. PDF document was not flattened prior to filing. Instructions for flattening a PDF document are available on the court's website under CM/ECF Instructions to flatten PDF files. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE FLATTENED DOCUMENT IMMEDIATELY. NO ACTION HAS BEEN TAKEN ON THE INCORRECT PDF. Related [+] (CJ)
Related: [-] 21 Status report filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC
21 21 misc Status report Mon 08/14 10:37 AM
Status report Unilateral Filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC Related [+]. (Baum, Richard) WARNING: See docket entry number 22 for corrective action. Modified on 8/14/2023 (CJ)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 08/09 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Notice that Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC)
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 08/09 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Notice that Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC)
Monday, August 07, 2023
18 18 misc Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC) Mon 08/07 4:43 PM
Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default Against Defendant(s) Karina Ponce Related [+] (CJ)
Related: [-] 16 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC
17 17 misc Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC) Mon 08/07 4:38 PM
Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default Against Defendant(s) Jorge Ocampo Lopez Related [+] (CJ)
Related: [-] 15 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC
16 16 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Mon 08/07 9:47 AM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Karina Ponce Filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration re Non-Response
Att: 2 Summons - issued
Att: 3 Summons - served
15 15 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Mon 08/07 9:42 AM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Jorge Ocampo Lopez Filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration re Non-Response
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Att: 3 Summons - issued
Friday, August 04, 2023
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 08/04 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/04/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice that Clerk Has Not Entered Default (BNC)
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 08/04 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/04/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Notice that Clerk Has Not Entered Default (BNC)
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
12 12 misc Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk (BNC) Wed 08/02 2:36 PM
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant(s) Karina Ponce Related [+] (JC6)
Related: [-] 10 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC
11 11 misc Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk (BNC) Wed 08/02 2:25 PM
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant(s) George Ocampo Lopez Related [+] (JC6)
Related: [-] 9 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC
10 10 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Wed 08/02 9:30 AM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Karina Ponce Filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
9 9 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Wed 08/02 9:27 AM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Jorge Ocampo Lopez Filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
8 8 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Tue 08/01 3:17 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - Related [+] - PDF document was not flattened prior to filing. Instructions for flattening a PDF document are available on the courts website under CM/ECF Instructions to flatten PDF files. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE FLATTENED DOCUMENT IMMEDIATELY. (JC6)
Related: [-] 6 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC
7 7 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Tue 08/01 3:15 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - Related [+] PDF document was not flattened prior to filing. Instructions for flattening a PDF document are available on the courts website under CM/ECF Instructions to flatten PDF files. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE FLATTENED DOCUMENT IMMEDIATELY. (JC6)
Related: [-] 5 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC
6 6 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Tue 08/01 2:38 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Karina Ponce Filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
5 5 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Tue 08/01 2:36 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Jorge Ocampo Lopez Filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Thursday, June 29, 2023
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 06/29 11:04 AM
Summons Service Executed on Jorge Ocampo Lopez 6/29/2023; Karina Ponce 6/29/2023; Larry D Simons (TR) 6/29/2023; United States Trustee (RS) 6/29/2023 (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 06/28 7:55 PM
Summons Issued on Jorge Ocampo Lopez Date Issued 6/28/2023, Answer Due 7/28/2023; Karina Ponce Date Issued 6/28/2023, Answer Due 7/28/2023 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 8/30/2023 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 301, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Mark D. Houle (JC6)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC
2 2 misc Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) Wed 06/28 3:27 PM
Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Notice of Status Conference (LBR 7004-1(a)(1)(B)) Original Summons and Notice of Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff Ivy Portfolio, LLC. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/28 3:23 PM
Adversary case 6:23-ap-01062. Complaint by Ivy Portfolio, LLC against Jorge Ocampo Lopez, Karina Ponce. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]