Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-11717

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott C Clarkson
Case #: 8:23-ap-01062
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2023
Terminated:Jun 24, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
United States of America, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By
United States of America, Internal Revenue Service
contact info
Plaintiff
Weneta M.A. Kosmala, soley in her capacity as chapter 7 trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Michael Cyril Rich
4425 Jamboree Road, Ste 183
Newport Beach, CA 92660
Represented By
Jeffrey I Golden
Golden Goodrich LLP
contact info
Trustee
Weneta M.A. Kosmala (TR)
4425 Jamboree Rd., Suite 183
Newport Beach, CA 92660
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, June 24, 2024
30 30 court Close Adversary Case Mon 06/24 9:16 AM
Adversary Case 8:23-ap-1062 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
31 31 court Hearing Held (Other) Mon 07/01 10:45 AM
Hearing Held On Pre-Trial Conference Related [+] PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING OFF CALENDAR PER ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION BETWEEN THE CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE AND THE UNITED STATES FULLY RESOLVING THE CLAIMS IN THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND FOR ORDER DISMISSING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING ENTERED 6 5-2024 - (DOCKET NO.28 ) (NB8)
Related: [-] related document1 Complaint:(1) To Avoid Penalty Portion of Tax Liens Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 724(a);(2) To Preserve Avoided Tax Liens For The Benefit Of The Estate Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 551; And (3) Declaratory Relief
Friday, June 07, 2024
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 06/07 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
28 28 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Wed 06/05 12:06 PM
ORDER Granting Stipulation Between The Chapter 7 Trustee And The United States Fully Resolving The Claims In The Adversary Proceeding And For Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. IT IS ORDERED: The Stipulation Is GRANTED In Its Entirety. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 6/5/2024 (NB8)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
27 27 motion Stipulation (motion) Tue 06/04 11:14 AM
Stipulation By Weneta M.A. Kosmala and the United States Fully Resolving the Claims in the Adversary Proceeding and for Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Proof of Service. Filed by Plaintiff Weneta M.A. Kosmala (Beall, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
26 26 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Tue 05/07 10:21 AM
Hearing Continued On Status Conference Related [+] - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING CONTINUED TO JUNE 18, 2024 AT 1:30P.M. IN COURTROOM 5C, LOCATED AT 411 WEST FOURTH STREET, SANTA ANA, CA 92701 PER ORDER APPROVING SECOND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT ENTERED 4 16-2024 - (DOCKET NO.24 ) The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (NB8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint (2) To Preserve Avoided Tax Liens For The Benefit Of The Estate Pursuant To11 U.S.C. Section 551; And (3) Declaratory Relief filed by Plaintiff Weneta M.A. Kosmala
Thursday, April 18, 2024
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 04/18 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
24 24 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Tue 04/16 5:17 PM
Order Approving Second Stipulation To Continue Pre-Trial Conference And Extend Deadline To File Pre-Trial Statement. IT IS ORDERED: 1. The Stipulation Is APPROVED. 2. The Pre-Trial Conference Currently Set For April 30, 2024 At 1:30 P.M. Is CONTINUED TO JUNE 18, 2024, AT 1:30 P.M. In Courtroom 5C, Located At 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701. 3. All Deadlines Relating To The Pre-Trial Conference Will be Recalculated From The Continued Hearing Date. 4. The Pre-Trial Conference Currently Set for April 30, 2024, At 1:30 P.M. Is OFF CALENDAR. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/16/2024 (NB8)
Related: [-] 23
23 23 motion Stipulation (motion) Tue 04/16 2:54 PM
Stipulation By Weneta M.A. Kosmala and United States of America to Continue Pre-Trial Conference and Extend Deadline to File Pre-Trial Statement with Proof of Service. Filed by Plaintiff Weneta M.A. Kosmala (Beall, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
22 22 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Fri 03/29 10:52 AM
Hearing Continued On Pre-Trial Conference Related [+] - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING CONTINUED TO APRIL 30, 2034 AT 1:30 P.M. IN COURTROOM 5C, LOCATED AT 411 WEST FOURTH STREET, SANTA ANA, CA 92701 PER ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE PRE-TRIAL STATUS REPORT ENTERED 3 1-2024 - (DOCKET NO.20 ) The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (NB8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint CONT'D PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE Hearing RE: Complaint: (1) To Avoid Penalty Portion of Tax Liens Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 724(a); (2) To Preserve Avoided Tax Liens For The Benefit Of The Estate Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 551; And (3) Declaratory Relief filed by Plaintiff Weneta M.A. Kosmala
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 03/13 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Monday, March 11, 2024
20 20 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Mon 03/11 12:53 PM
Order Approving Stipulation To Continue Pre-Trial Conference And Extend Deadline To File Pre-Trial Status Report. IT IS ORDERED: 1. The Stipulation Is APPROVED. 2. The Pre-Trial Conference Currently Set For March 26, 2024 At 1:30 P.M. Is CONTINUED TO APRIL 30, 2024 AT 1:30 P.M. In Courtroom 5C, Located At 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701. 3. All Deadlines Relating To The Pre-Trial Conferences Will Be Recalculated From The Continued Hearing Date. 4. The Pre-Trial Conference Currently Set For March 26, 2024, At 1:30 P.M. Is OFF CALENDAR. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/11/2024 (NB8)
Related: [-] 19
Friday, March 08, 2024
19 19 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 03/08 2:09 PM
Stipulation By Weneta M.A. Kosmala (TR) and Najah J. Shariff to Continue Pre-trial Conference and Extend Deadline to File Pre-Trial Status Report With Proof of Service Filed by Trustee Weneta M.A. Kosmala (TR) (Beall, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 10/25 9:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 10/25/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, October 23, 2023
17 17 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 10/23 12:46 PM
Status Conference And Scheduling Order Pursuant To LBR 7016-1(a)(4). IT IS ORDERED: The Last Day For Non-Discovery Pre-Trial Motions To Be Heard Is: February 29, 2024. The Last Day For Discovery To Be Completed, Including Receiving Responses To Discovery Requests And The Resolution Of Any Discovery Motion, Is: January 31, 2024. A Pre-Trial Conference Is Set For: March 26, 2024 At 1:30 P.M. In Courtroom 5C, located at 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER RULING). (BNC-PDF) Signed on 10/23/2023. (NB8)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
16 16 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 10/19 2:32 PM
Hearing Continued On Status Conference Related [+] - DISCOVERY CUTOFF: JANUARY 31, 2024. NOTE: THIS IS THE DATE BY WHICH ALL DISCOVERY MOTIONS MUST BE HEARD AND RESOLVED. LAST DAY TO FILE PRE-TRIAL MOTIONS: FEBRUARY 29, 2024. NOTE: THIS IS THE DATE BY WHICH ALL NON-DISCOVERY MOTIONS MUST BE HEARD AND RESOLVED. PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR MARCH 26, 2024 AT 1:30 P.M. IN COURTROOM 5C, LOCATED AT 411 WEST FOURTH STREET, SANTA ANA, CA 92701. The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (NB8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint (1) To Avoid Penalty Portion of Tax Liens Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 724(a); (2) To Preserve Avoided Tax Liens For The Benefit Of The Estate Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 551; And (3) Declaratory Relief filed by Plaintiff Weneta M.A. Kosmala
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
15 15 misc Status report Tue 10/03 10:46 AM
Status report Joint Status Report [LBR 7016-1(a)(2)] with Proof of Service. Filed by Plaintiff Weneta M.A. Kosmala Related [+]. (Beall, Ryan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
14 14 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Mon 10/02 2:25 PM
Hearing Continued On Status Conference Related [+] STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING CONTINUED TO OCTOBER 17, 2023 AT 1:30 P.M. IN COURTROOM 5C, LOCATED AT 411 WEST FOURTH STREET, SANTA ANA, CA 92701 PER ANOTHER SUMMONS ISSUED 7 13-2023 - (DOCKET NO.6 ). The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (NB8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint (1) To Avoid Penalty Portion of Tax Liens Pusuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 724(a); (2) To Preserve Avoided Tax Liens For The Benefit Of The Estate Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 551; And (3) Declaratory Relief filed by Plaintiff Weneta M.A. Kosmala
Thursday, September 14, 2023
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 09/14 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
12 12 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 09/12 11:28 AM
INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY - ORDER BELONGS IN ADVERSARY CASE NO. 8:22-AP-01049-SC - ORDER WILL BE RESTRICTED. (NB8) Modified on 9/12/2023 (NB8)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
11 11 misc Notice of Change of Address (multi) Wed 08/23 1:12 PM
Notice of Change of Address for Ryan W. Beall, Golden Goodrich LLP; new address 3070 Bristol Street, Suite 640, Costa Mesa, CA 92626 . (Beall, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/17 4:58 PM
Answer to Complaint United States of America's Answer to Complaint: (1) To Avoid Penalty Portion of Tax Liens Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 724(a); (2) To Preserve Avoided Tax Liens for the Benefit of the Estate Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 551; and (3) Declaratory Relief Related [+] Filed by United States of America, Internal Revenue Service. (Shariff, Najah)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary Complaint 8 Summons
Thursday, July 13, 2023
9 9 notice Notice Thu 07/13 5:18 PM
Notice of Compliance with Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1 and Rule 7026 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure with proof of service Filed by Plaintiff Weneta M.A. Kosmala Related [+]. (Beall, Ryan)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 8:23-ap-01062. Complaint by Weneta M.A. Kosmala against United States of America, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). With Adversary Proceeding Sheet Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) filed by Plaintiff Weneta M.A. Kosmala,6 Another Summons Issued on United States of America, Internal Revenue Service Date Issued 7/13/2023, Answer Due 8/17/2023 (RE: related document(s)5 Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) filed by Plaintiff Weneta M.A. Kosmala) Status Conference hearing to be held on 10/17/2023 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (NB8)
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 07/13 5:12 PM
Summons Service Executed on United States of America, Internal Revenue Service 7/13/2023 (Beall, Ryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Proof of service Thu 07/13 5:00 PM
Proof of service of Complaint: (1) to Avoid Penalty Portion of Tax Liens Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 724(A); (2) To Preserve Avoided Tax Liens for the Benefit of the Estate Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 551; and (3) Declaratory Relief Filed by Plaintiff Weneta M.A. Kosmala Related [+]. (Beall, Ryan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
6 6 court Another Summons Issued Thu 07/13 9:07 AM
Another Summons Issued on United States of America, Internal Revenue Service Date Issued 7/13/2023, Answer Due 8/17/2023 Related [+] Status Conference hearing to be held on 10/17/2023 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (NB8)
Related: [-] 5 Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) filed by Plaintiff Weneta M.A. Kosmala
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
5 5 misc Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) Wed 07/12 3:48 PM
Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Notice of Status Conference (LBR 7004-1(a)(1)(B)) with proof of service Filed by Plaintiff Weneta M.A. Kosmala. (Golden, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 06/30 12:48 PM
Summons Service Executed on United States of America, Internal Revenue Service 6/30/2023 (Golden, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proof of service Fri 06/30 11:55 AM
Proof of service of (1) Complaint: (1) To Avoid Penalty Portion of Tax Liens Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §724(a); (2) Preserve Avoided Tax Liens for the Benefit of the Estate Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §551; and (3) Declaratory Relief; (2) Summons and Notice of Status Conference in Adversary Proceeding; (3) Early Meeting of Counsel and Status Conference Instructions Filed by Trustee Weneta M.A. Kosmala (TR) Related [+]. (Golden, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Thursday, June 29, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 06/29 9:20 AM
Summons Issued on United States of America, Internal Revenue Service Date Issued 6/29/2023, Answer Due 8/3/2023 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 9/26/2023 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (JL)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Weneta M.A. Kosmala
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/28 4:24 PM
Adversary case 8:23-ap-01062. Complaint by Weneta M.A. Kosmala against United States of America, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). With Adversary Proceeding Sheet Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Golden, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]