Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Lee Ann Reno
Referred: Lee Ann Reno
Case #: 2:23-cv-00108
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2023
Terminated:Sep 09, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 26, 2023 3:07 AM CST
Defendant
Bryan Vazquez-Rosales
Represented By
Donald R Loving, II
Kahana Feld
contact info
Defendant
Aling Group Inc
Represented By
Donald R Loving, II
Kahana Feld
contact info
Plaintiff
Dina Velasquez
Represented By
Joe L Lovell
Lovell Hoffman Law
contact info
Mikal C Watts
Watts Guerra LLP
contact info
Jorge Luiz Mares
Watts Guerra LLP
contact info
Ana Victoria Diaz
Watts Guerra LLP
contact info
Hannah Louise Rivera
Lovell Hoffman Law PLLC
contact info
Francisco Guerra, IV
Watts Guerra LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, September 09, 2024
42 42 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 09/09 11:24 AM
ORDER granting41 Agreed Motion to Dismiss. The agreed motion is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE to re-filing of the same, with all attorneys fees and costs taxed against the party incurring the same. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 9/9/2024) (awc)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
41 41 misc Stipulation Fri 09/06 3:54 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Aling Group Inc, Bryan Vazquez-Rosales. (Ahmed, Farrah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Thursday, August 08, 2024
40 40 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Thu 08/08 1:05 PM
ORDER TO FILE JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: The parties shall file a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal in compliance with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on or before September 6, 2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 8/8/2024) (awc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
39 39 adr ADR Summary Wed 08/07 12:41 PM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by Dina Velasquez. Attorneys in Attendance: Jorge Mares, Francisco Guerra, Christian Von Wupperfeld, Scott Bage (Mediator). Prv Fee: $ $1,500.00. Outcome of ADR: Settled as a result of ADR. (Mares, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
38 38 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/17 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Joint Advisory to the Court Regarding Estimated Trial Length filed by Dina Velasquez (Mares, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 06/26 9:54 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD re:36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. (ECF 36). Having considered the motion, the Court finds the motion should be GRANTED. Ana V. Diaz is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Plaintiff will continue to be represented by Francisco Guerra, IV, and Jorge L. Mares of Guerra LLP. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/26/2024) (awc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
36 36 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 06/24 2:42 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ana V. Diaz filed by Dina Velasquez (Mares, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 29, 2024
35 35 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/29 11:38 AM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for mediation is on or before 8/30/2024. Discovery due by 8/16/2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 4/29/2024) (nht)
Related: [-]
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/29 11:34 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION DEADLINES re:33 Motion to Extend Time. The Court will issue a Second Amended Scheduling Order reflecting these extensions. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 4/29/2024) (nht)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
33 33 motion Extension of Time Fri 04/26 6:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time EXTEND DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION DEADLINES filed by Aling Group Inc (Ahmed, Farrah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order ORDER ON DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION DEADLINES
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/24 3:00 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re:31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Donald R. Loving and Rochelle H. Rance Cabe shall be withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendants. Added attorney Christian Von Wupperfeld, Farrah I Ahmed for Aling Group Inc, Christian Von Wupperfeld, Farrah I Ahmed for Bryan Vazquez-Rosales. Attorney Donald R Loving, II terminated. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 4/24/2024) (awc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
31 31 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/23 4:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel filed by Aling Group Inc (Loving, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/17 5:44 PM
NOTICE of JOINT ADVISORY REGARDING TRIAL LENGTH filed by Dina Velasquez (Mares, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 03/18 1:12 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL re:27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mikal C Watts terminated. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 3/18/2024) (awc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/15 1:04 PM
NOTICE of FILING PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES filed by Dina Velasquez (Mares, Jorge)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 03/15 12:54 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Dina Velasquez (Mares, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 01/17 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark S Logsdon on behalf of Bryan Vazquez-Rosales. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Logsdon, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 01/12 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark S Logsdon on behalf of Aling Group Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Logsdon, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
24 24 2 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Wed 12/20 10:48 AM
ORDER FOR DEFENDANTS TO COMPLY WITH ORDER TO OBTAIN LOCAL COUNSEL: Because it does not appear that Mr. Loving resides or maintains a principal office in this District, Plaintiff is ORDERED to comply with the Court's July 19, 2023 Order to Obtain Local Counsel and file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a) on or before January 17, 2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 12/20/2023) (awc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
23 23 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/12 11:19 AM
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2024 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3rd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2024 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (See order for further specifics.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 12/12/2023) (awc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/08 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Joint Advisory re:21 Order, filed by Dina Velasquez (Mares, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/05 11:24 AM
ORDER TO SUBMIT ADVISORY REGARDING TRIAL LENGTH: In order to set a trial date in this action, the parties are directed, on or before December 8, 2023, to jointly file an advisory with the Court providing an estimate of the number of trial days anticipated and indicate whether a jury has been demanded. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 12/5/2023) (cmk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
20 20 order Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge/Order Reassigning Case Mon 11/27 4:48 PM
CONSENT to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by all parties and ORDER Reassigning Case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno for all further proceedings. Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 11/27/2023) (awc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/21 3:44 PM
NOTICE of parties' joint consent(s) to proceed before the magistrate judge filed by Aling Group Inc, Bryan Vazquez-Rosales, Dina Velasquez. (mms)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/06 10:53 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall be ready for trial on or before October 7, 2024. This is not a trial setting. Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2024. Pretrial Materials (Expert Witnesses) due by 3/15/2024 for parties seeking affirmative relief and due by 4/15/2024 for parties opposing affirmative relief. Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2024. Deadline for mediation is on or before 4/30/2024. Discovery due by 5/17/2024. Summary Judgment/Dispositive Motions due by 6/21/2024. Motions Not Otherwise Covered due by 9/16/2024. The parties must file Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures on or before September 23, 2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 11/6/2023) (awc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
17 17 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 11/03 12:06 PM
ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference held on 11/3/2023. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Jorge Luiz Mares, Joe L Lovell; Defense - Donald R Loving, II. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:03. (mcrd)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
16 16 misc Status Report Mon 10/30 2:50 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT Fed. R. CIV. P. 26 Report filed by Dina Velasquez. (Mares, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
15 15 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 10/26 6:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dina Velasquez. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Mares, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
14 14 4 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Thu 10/12 4:09 PM
ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE -- Joint Proposed Scheduling Order Due Date: October 30, 2023; Rule 16 Scheduling Conference: November 3, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 10/12/2023) (awc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/11 3:54 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Aling Group Inc, Bryan Vazquez-Rosales. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Donald R Loving, II added to party Aling Group Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Donald R Loving, II added to party Bryan Vazquez-Rosales(pty:dft) (Loving, Donald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/28 1:12 PM
NOTICE of STATUS UPDATE filed by Dina Velasquez (Mares, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
Monday, September 25, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Mon 09/25 2:23 PM
ORDER TO FILE STATUS UPDATE OR PROOF OF SERVICE: Plaintiff is directed to file a status update regarding their attempts to serve Defendant Aling Group, Inc.--or proof of service--on or before October 2, 2023. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 9/25/2023) (awc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 08/18 3:36 PM
NOTICE of ATTEMPT TO SERVE DEFENDANT ALING GROUP INC. filed by Dina Velasquez (Mares, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Fri 08/11 2:20 PM
ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE: Plaintiff is directed to file proof of service upon Defendant Aling Group, Inc. on or before August 18, 2023. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 8/11/2023) (daa)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 08/07 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joe L Lovell on behalf of Dina Velasquez. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Lovell, Joe)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 08/04 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Jorge Luiz Mares on behalf of Dina Velasquez. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mares, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
6 6 6 pgs order Order Wed 07/19 2:13 PM
STANDING ORDERS: This case is subject to the following standing orders, which concern: (1) compliance with the local counsel requirements of the Northern District of Texas; (2) required procedures for any discovery disputes that may arise in this case; and (3) required procedures for any motions for leave to file documents under seal. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 7/19/2023) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 07/17 4:59 PM
STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 7/17/2023) (nht)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Mon 07/17 8:49 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bryan Vazquez-Rosales ; served on 7/12/2023. (Mares, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 06/30 9:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Aling Group Inc, Bryan Vazquez-Rosales. (awc)
Related: [-]
2 2 qcref Kacsmaryk Fri 06/30 9:42 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (No magistrate judge assigned). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/29 5:40 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Dina, Individually and ANF of DV and LV minors Velasquez. (Filer fee note- Clerk to add prior fee payment info here.) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Mares, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration(s)