California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-01273
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jun 30, 2023 12:49 AM PDT
Defendant
Jonathan Mora (1)
Represented By
Jason T. Conforti
Law Office Jason T. Conforti
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Daniel D. Shin
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
David P. Finn
U.S. Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Apr 11 2024
JUDGMENT as to Jonathan Mora (1), Count(s) 1, Custody of BOP for 24 months. Supervised release for 3 years. $100 special assessment imposed. No fine. Appeal waived. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler (jms)

Docket last updated: 06/30/2023 1:32 AM PDT
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
1 1 4 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT (t/w Warrant) as to Jonathan Mora (1).(cdw) [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
3 3 2 pgs MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Jonathan Mora. (cdw) [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to Jonathan Mora (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 11/15/2022.(cdw) [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
5 5 1 pgs Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Jonathan Mora for 6/21/2023 Related [+]. (alns) [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-] ceived by USM on 5/22/2023
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
Arrest of Jonathan Mora (no document attached) (bas1) [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
6 6 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jonathan Mora: Initial Appearance set for 6/20/2023 before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. (no document attached) (bas1) [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
7 7 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jonathan Mora: Initial Appearance set for 6/20/2023 before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. (no document attached) (yem) [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Government oral motion to unseal the case is granted.Initial Appearance as to Jonathan Mora held on 6/20/2023. Appointed Attorney Jason T. Conforti (n/a) provisionally for Jonathan Mora; Financial Affidavit due at next hearing. Government oral motion to detain(Flight). ( Detention Hearing - RF set for 6/22/2023 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher.) Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 6/29/23 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Arraignment set for 7/13/23 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher.) Judge update in case as to Jonathan Mora. Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher added to the case. Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner is no longer assigned to case and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 23MJ4156-DEB. (Sealed Clerk Notified) (CD# 6/20/2023 BLM 23-1:2:32-2:44). (Plaintiff Attorney Arne Bussler). (Defendant Attorney Carmen Rivera, Carson Baucher FD-S/A). (aje) [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-]
9 9 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Jonathan Mora (no document attached) (aje) [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-]
10 10 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight)by USA as to Jonathan Mora. (no document attached) (aje) [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER as to Jonathan Mora: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/20/23. (aje) [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-]
13 13 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF15 **NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David P. Finn appearing for USA. (ddf) Modified on 6/23/2023 to withdrawal document (ggv). [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Daniel D. Shin appearing for USA. (Shin, Daniel)Attorney Daniel D. Shin added to party USA(pty:pla) (ggv). [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
14 14 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/6/2023, in case as to Jonathan Mora (ddf) [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by USA as to Jonathan Mora (Shin, Daniel) (ggv). [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-]
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher:Detention Hearing as to Jonathan Mora held on 6/22/2023. USA oral motion for detention - Moot. Defendant stipulates to detention and is ordered detained without prejudice. ; Preliminary Hearing not held as to Jonathan Mora. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted.( Preliminary Hearing continued to 7/13/2023 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher). (CD# 6/22/2023 DEB 23 10:54-10:57). (Plaintiff Attorney Aaron McElhose AUSA-S/A). (Defendant Attorney Jason Conforti CJA). (no document attached) (acc) [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jonathan Mora. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 6/22/2023. (dim) (anh). [3:22-mj-04156-DEB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
18 18 1 pgs INDICTMENT as to Jonathan Mora (1) count(s) 1.(dim) (anh).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted Indictment