Maryland District Court
Case #: 8:23-mj-01809
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2023
Terminated:Jun 28, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jun 30, 2023 3:20 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Lovet Ayuk-Ako (1)
Terminated: 06/28/2023


Docket last updated: 06/30/2023 4:48 AM EDT
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
1 1 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Lovet Ayuk-Ako(jj2s, Deputy Clerk) (jj2s, Deputy Clerk).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Arrest Warrant
Att: 2 (6/29/2023) Arrest Warrant- Redacted
2 2 Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Lovet Ayuk-Ako held on 6/28/2023 before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan.(FTR- Johnson- 3B) (jj2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER pursuant to Fed R Crim P 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act as to Lovet Ayuk-Ako Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/28/2023. (jj2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing by Lovet Ayuk-Ako(jj2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Lovet Ayuk-Ako Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/28/2023. (copy emailed to USMS on 06/28/2023) (jj2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 Notice to U.S. District Court Southern District of Florida of a Rule 5 Initial Appearance as to Lovet Ayuk-Ako. Your case number is: 0:23-cr-60077-RKA-2. Docket sheet and documents attached. (If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (jj2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]