New York Northern District Court
Case #: 1:23-mj-00360
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jun 30, 2023 3:39 AM EDT
Defendant
Robert Cutter (1)
Represented By
Jeremy B. Sporn
Office Of The Federal Public Defender - Albany Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Allen J. Vickey
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/06/2024 1:47 PM EST
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Appearance as to Robert Cutter held on 6/28/2023. Appearances by AFPD Jeremy Sporn, appearing for the defendant; AUSA Allen Vickey, for the government; USPO Melissa Inman, present. The Court issues the oral Rule 5(f) Reminder of Prosecutorial Obligation Order. The Defendant is advised of his rights and the maximum penalties are stated. The government moves for detention as a danger to the community and as a risk of flight. Defense requests a hearing be scheduled and will arrange for a pretrial services interview to be completed. The Detention Hearing is set for Thursday, 6/29/2023 @ 1:30 PM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending the detention hearing. (Court Reporter Lisa Tennyson)[1:58pm-2:03pm] (tab)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Robert Cutter (1). (tab)
Related: [-]
2 2 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Robert Cutter (tab)
Related: [-]
3 3 TEXT ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Robert Cutter [Jeremy B. Sporn for Robert Cutter appointed.] Because the defendant has testified under oath or has otherwise satisfied this court that he (1) is financially unable to employ counsel and (2) does not wish to waive counsel, and because the interests of justice so require it is hereby ORDERED that: The Office of the Federal Public Defender for the Northern District of New York is assigned representation of the defendant and shall file a notice of appearance with the Clerk of Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/28/2023. (tab)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs RULE 5(f) ORDER as to Robert Cutter : This Order is entered, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, to confirm the Government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/28/2023. (tab)
Related: [-]