Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-bkp-60028
Typebankruptcy appellate panel / other
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2023
Terminated:Mar 27, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 9:46 AM PDT
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting schedule as follows: Appellant Philip Joseph Jaurigui Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/05/2023. Appellant Philip Joseph Jaurigui opening brief due 08/21/2023. Appellee Jonathan Mover answering brief due 09/20/2023 Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12745109] (HH) [Entered: 06/28/2023 03:11 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 3 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet
2 2 Filing fee for Appeal from Bankruptcy Appellate Panel paid by Appellant Philip Joseph Jaurigui. Fee Amount: $505.00 Receipt Number: A09-117680-14. [12745230] 23-60028 (Smyth, David) [Entered: 06/28/2023 04:14 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Philip Joseph Jaurigui. New requested due date is 09/20/2023. [12745251] 23-60028 (Smyth, David) [Entered: 06/28/2023 04:24 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 Streamlined request [3] by Appellant Philip Joseph Jaurigui to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Philip Joseph Jaurigui opening brief due 09/20/2023. Appellee Jonathan Mover answering brief due 10/20/2023. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12745361] (DR) [Entered: 06/28/2023 06:28 PM]
Related: [-]