Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant, III
Referred: Bill Davis
Case #: 4:23-cv-00620
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2023
Case in other court:401st District Court Collin County, Texas, 401-02870-2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 30, 2023 3:29 AM CST
Defendant
Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Represented By
Ashley F Gilmore
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
James Price Collins
Baker Hotstetler
contact info
Plaintiff
Harbor Lakes Homeowners Association, Inc.
Represented By
Mark Dean Johnson
Saunders Walsh & Beard, Pllc - Mckinney
contact info
Alexander N Beard
Saunders Walsh & Beard, Pllc - Mckinney
contact info
Plaintiff
Texas Star Community Management, Inc.
Represented By
Mark Dean Johnson
Saunders Walsh & Beard, Pllc - Mckinney
contact info
Alexander N Beard
Saunders Walsh & Beard, Pllc - Mckinney
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 01/15 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Ashley F Gilmore. (E-filers are reminded that they must also use their PACER account to submit an address change to the NextGen ECF system.) (Gilmore, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/03 4:06 PM
Pursuant to[LINK:General Order 24-06] , case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bill Davis. Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (mcg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/18 9:32 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendant's Reply in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America . (Gilmore, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 04/12 2:39 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant's deadline to file its reply is extended to April 18, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/12/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Wed 04/10 9:55 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Reply by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America.(Gilmore, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, April 04, 2024
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/04 1:52 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Response to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Texas Star Community Management, Inc. . (Johnson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
14 14 respm Response to Motion Thu 03/14 9:22 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, and Brief in Support filed by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America .(Gilmore, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, February 22, 2024
13 13 motion Partial Summary Judgment Thu 02/22 11:01 AM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Texas Star Community Management, Inc..(Johnson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Affidavit of James Jones,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1 Management Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit A-2 Original Petition Hood Co Lawsuit,
Att: 4 Exhibit A-3 Plaintiff's Original Petition Breach of Contract Lawsuit,
Att: 5 Exhibit B Affidavit of Susan Varnell,
Att: 6 Exhibit B-1 Travelers Policy #106684354,
Att: 7 Exhibit B-2 Travelers' September 2, 2020 Denial Letter,
Att: 8 Proposed Order Order Granting Texas Star Community Management, L.L.C.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Friday, October 20, 2023
12 12 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Fri 10/20 12:13 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 10/20/2023. (jmb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
minutes Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference Thu 10/19 3:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson: Rule 16 Management Conference held on 10/19/2023. Time in Courtfrom 1:23pm - 1:29pm. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Alexander Beard; Defense - Ashley Gilmore. (No exhibits)(Court Reporter Digital Recording.) (mmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 10/16 12:41 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gilmore, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
10 10 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 09/21 3:23 PM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America.(Gilmore, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
9 9 10 pgs order Order Governing Proceedings Tue 09/12 5:23 PM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/16/2023. Rule 16 Management Conference SET for 10/19/2023 at 01:00 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 09/12/2023. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/01 1:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, filed by Harbor Lakes Homeowners Association, Inc., Texas Star Community Management, Inc..(Beard, Alexander)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/01 1:25 PM
NOTICE by Harbor Lakes Homeowners Association, Inc., Texas Star Community Management, Inc. of Written Consent to File First Amended Complaint(Beard, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 07/11 4:46 PM
ORDER OF REFERRAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §636 and the Local Rules of this Court for the Assignment of Matters to Magistrate Judges, the Court hereby REFERS the above-referenced case to the Hon. Kimberly C. Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/11/2023. (xl, )
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 07/11 4:39 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/11/2023. (xl, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
4 4 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 07/07 2:27 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) AND (2) Disclosure Statement filed by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Other Affiliate Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc. for Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. (Gilmore, Ashley)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/07 2:07 PM
Original ANSWER to2 Complaint by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America.(Gilmore, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 07/05 4:44 PM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, filed by Harbor Lakes Homeowners Association, Inc., Texas Star Community Management, Inc..(rpc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 06/30 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America from 401st Collin County, case number 401-02870-2023. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9580817), filed by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America.(Gilmore, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Attachment(s) Information for the Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit A Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit B Certified Copy of the State Court Docket,
Att: 4 7 pgs Exhibit C Plaintiffs' Original Petition,
Att: 5 Exhibit D Citation and Return of Service
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 07/05 4:30 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Wed 07/05 4:33 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rpc, )
Related: [-]
utility Remark Wed 07/05 4:37 PM
Note: Pursuant to Local Rule CV 7(j), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (rpc, )
Related: [-]