Texas Western District Court
Judge:Mark Lane
Case #: 1:23-cv-00749
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2023
Case in other court:53rd Judicial District Court of Travis County, TX, D-1-GN-23-002166
Last checked: Saturday Dec 30, 2023 4:22 AM CST
Defendant
Factory 14 UK Acquisition VI Ltd
Represented By
Scott D Ellis
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Eric B. Williams, II.
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Katherine Harrington
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Factory 14 UK Acquisition VII Ltd
Represented By
Scott D Ellis
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Eric B. Williams, II.
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Katherine Harrington
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Razor Group GmbH
Represented By
Scott D Ellis
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Eric B. Williams, II.
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Katherine Harrington
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nehemiah Heard
Represented By
Mark Douglas Winnubst
Sheils Winnubst, PC
contact info
Latrice E. Andrews
Sheils Winnubst, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
IL Venture LLC - A Kettlebell King Series
Represented By
Mark Douglas Winnubst
Sheils Winnubst, PC
contact info
Latrice E. Andrews
Sheils Winnubst, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jay Perkins
Represented By
Mark Douglas Winnubst
Sheils Winnubst, PC
contact info
Latrice E. Andrews
Sheils Winnubst, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chad Price
Represented By
Mark Douglas Winnubst
Sheils Winnubst, PC
contact info
Latrice E. Andrews
Sheils Winnubst, PC
contact info

GPO Dec 01 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Jay Perkins, Chad Price, Nehemiah Heard, IL Venture LLC - A Kettlebell King Series. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (cc3)
GPO Dec 18 2023
ORDER ADOPTING 14 Report and Recommendations, and DENYING 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jay Perkins, Chad Price, Nehemiah Heard, IL Venture LLC - A Kettlebell King Series. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
GPO Dec 20 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Factory 14 UK Acquisition VI Ltd, Factory 14 UK Acquisition VII Ltd, Razor Group GmbH. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (cc3)
GPO Jan 05 2024
ORDER ADOPTING 17 Report and Recommendations, and DENYING IN PART & GRANTING IN PART 6 MOTION to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by Factory 14 UK Acquisition VI Ltd, Factory 14 UK Acquisition VII Ltd, Razor Group GmbH. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)

Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 05/19 12:57 PM
Text Order GRANTING63 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; the discovery deadline is extended to July 31, 2025, entered by Judge Mark Lane. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ah)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 05/20 9:12 AM
Reset Discovery Deadline: Discovery due by 7/31/2025 (cc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
65 65 motion Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Fri 05/16 9:01 PM
Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Andrews, Latrice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix in Support of Motion to Compel
64 64 7 pgs motion Compel Fri 05/16 8:59 PM
MOTION to Compel by Nehemiah Heard, IL Venture LLC - A Kettlebell King Series, Jay Perkins, Chad Price, Price Digital Consultants, LLC.(Andrews, Latrice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix without Exhibits
Thursday, May 15, 2025
63 63 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 05/15 12:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Nehemiah Heard, IL Venture LLC - A Kettlebell King Series, Jay Perkins, Chad Price, Price Digital Consultants, LLC.(Andrews, Latrice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion