Minnesota District Court
Judge:Nancy E Brasel
Referred: Leo I Brisbois
Case #: 0:23-cv-02013
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 30, 2023 3:24 AM CST
Cross Claimant
Whispering Pines Veterinary Care, LLC
Represented By
Robert E Kuderer
Erickson, Zierke, Kuderer & Madsen, P.A.
contact info
Cross Claimant
Leah Martin
Represented By
Robert E Kuderer
Erickson, Zierke, Kuderer & Madsen, P.A.
contact info
Cross Claimant
Elizabeth Sargent
Represented By
Michael J Tomsche
Tomsche, Sonnesyn & Tomsche, P.A.
contact info
Cross Claimant
Northstar Equine Rehab and Rescue
Represented By
Michael J Tomsche
Tomsche, Sonnesyn & Tomsche, P.A.
contact info
Cross Claimant
Angela Korpela
Represented By
Michael J Tomsche
Tomsche, Sonnesyn & Tomsche, P.A.
contact info
Cross Defendant
Joshua Graves
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Leah Martin
Represented By
Robert E Kuderer
Erickson, Zierke, Kuderer & Madsen, P.A.
contact info
Cross Defendant
Ross Litman
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Jason Kuhnly
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Angela Korpela
Represented By
Michael J Tomsche
Tomsche, Sonnesyn & Tomsche, P.A.
contact info
Cross Defendant
Carley Hungerford
Represented By
Richard Sauceda
Jardine, Logan & O'Brien, Pllp
contact info
Joseph E Flynn
Jardine Logan & O'Brien Pllp
contact info
Cross Defendant
Tony McTavish
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Ben Fye
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Dietrich Friebe
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Darrick Finke
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Does
Cross Defendant
City of Duluth
Represented By
Elizabeth Sellers Tabor
City Of Duluth Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Michael McDoughall
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Matthew Miranda
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
James Nilsson
Represented By
Elizabeth Sellers Tabor
City Of Duluth Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Northstar Equine Rehab and Rescue
Represented By
Michael J Tomsche
Tomsche, Sonnesyn & Tomsche, P.A.
contact info
Cross Defendant
Peter Olson
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Erik Peterson
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Zachary Peterson
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Saint Louis County
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Elizabeth Sargent
Represented By
Michael J Tomsche
Tomsche, Sonnesyn & Tomsche, P.A.
contact info
Cross Defendant
Mike Tusken
Represented By
Elizabeth Sellers Tabor
City Of Duluth Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Whispering Pines Veterinary Care, LLC
Represented By
Robert E Kuderer
Erickson, Zierke, Kuderer & Madsen, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Whispering Pines Veterinary Care, LLC
Represented By
Robert E Kuderer
Erickson, Zierke, Kuderer & Madsen, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Mike Tusken
Represented By
Elizabeth Sellers Tabor
City Of Duluth Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Darrick Finke
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Dietrich Friebe
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Joshua Graves
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Angela Korpela
Represented By
Michael J Tomsche
Tomsche, Sonnesyn & Tomsche, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Jason Kuhnly
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ross Litman
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Leah Martin
Represented By
Robert E Kuderer
Erickson, Zierke, Kuderer & Madsen, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Michael McDoughall
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Miranda
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Northstar Equine Rehab and Rescue
Represented By
Michael J Tomsche
Tomsche, Sonnesyn & Tomsche, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Peter Olson
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Erik Peterson
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Zachary Peterson
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Elizabeth Sargent
Represented By
Michael J Tomsche
Tomsche, Sonnesyn & Tomsche, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
City of Duluth
Represented By
Elizabeth Sellers Tabor
City Of Duluth Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Ben Fye
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Carley Hungerford
Represented By
Richard Sauceda
Jardine, Logan & O'Brien, Pllp
contact info
Joseph E Flynn
Jardine Logan & O'Brien Pllp
contact info
Defendant
Tony McTavish
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
James Nilsson
Represented By
Elizabeth Sellers Tabor
City Of Duluth Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Saint Louis County
Represented By
Nick D Campanario
St. Louis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeannie Ball
Represented By
Miles Ringsred
Mjr Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Ball
Represented By
Miles Ringsred
Mjr Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Rice Lake Township
Terminated: 09/25/2023
Defendant
Jason Lukowsky
Terminated: 09/25/2023
Defendant
City of Duluth Police Department
Terminated: 09/25/2023
Defendant
Saint Louis County Sheriff's Department
Terminated: 09/25/2023


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
142 142 notice Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion Tue 12/17 1:37 PM
(Text-Only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motions. The hearing on the motions to dismiss106 ,111 ,116 ,118 has been cancelled for 1/9/25 at 10:00 a.m. The motions will be handled on the paper submissions. (KMW)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
141 141 respm Reply Memorandum or Notice of No Reply to Response to Motion Fri 12/13 5:31 PM
Reply to Response to Motion re118 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Whispering Pines Veterinary Care, LLC.(Kuderer, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
140 140 respm Reply Fri 12/13 5:19 PM
REPLY re111 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Angela Korpela, Northstar Equine Rehab and Rescue, Elizabeth Sargent.(Tomsche, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
139 139 respm Reply Memorandum or Notice of No Reply to Response to Motion Fri 12/13 4:36 PM
Reply to Response to Motion re116 MOTION to Dismiss/General as to Second Amended Complaint filed by Zachary Peterson, Michael McDoughall, Saint Louis County, Erik Peterson, Dietrich Friebe, Matthew Miranda, Tony McTavish, Darrick Finke.(Campanario, Nick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate