Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joan A Lloyd
Case #: 3:23-bk-31541
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Aug 14, 2023
Dismissed:Jan 19, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Ilari Auto Service, Inc.
145 Rogers Drive
Shepherdsville, KY 40165
Represented By
Michael W. McClain
Goldberg Simpson LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Chapter 11 Trustee
US Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Asst. U.S.Trustee 601 West Broadway #512
Louisville, KY 40202


Docket last updated: 06/29/2023 8:00 PM EDT
Friday, June 30, 2023
1 1 8 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 06/30 4:46 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Ilari Auto Service, Inc.. Remaining Petition and Schedules, including the Statement of Current Monthly Income if not filed previously and if applicable, due by 07/14/2023. This case may be dismissed without further notice if the schedules are not filed timely. (McClain, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 11 - Corp Fri 06/30 4:50 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a)
Related: [-]