Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Marian F Harrison
Case #: 3:23-bk-02349
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Jul 31, 2023
Terminated:Sep 05, 2023

Debtor
OnSomble, Inc.
798 Berry Road, #41103
Nashville, TN 37204
Represented By
R. Alex Payne
Dunham Hildebrand, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
EVA M LEMEH
Eva M. Lemeh, Chapter 7 Trustee 380 Spring Creek Road
Lebanon, TN 37087
U.S. Trustee
US TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE 701 BROADWAY STE 318
NASHVILLE, TN 37203


Docket last updated: 09/06/2023 5:26 AM CDT
Friday, June 30, 2023
1 1 34 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 06/30 1:32 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount is $338.00. (Payne, R.)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Payment Fri 06/30 1:39 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:3:23-bk-02349] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt number A18158130. Fee amount $ 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Fri 06/30 2:07 PM
First Meeting of Creditors and Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee - Meeting on 7/31/2023 at 01:00 PM. Refer to www.tnmb.uscourts.gov for details on the remote meeting. LEMEH, EVA M is appointed Interim Trustee and designated to preside at the meeting of creditors unless the appointment is rejected within five days. Trustee is deemed covered under existing panel blanket bond until liquid assets exceed $720,000. Absent election of a Trustee pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 341(a), Interim Trustee shall serve as Trustee without further appointment or qualification under the same bond. LEMEH, EVA M assigned to case. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]