Alabama Southern District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00131
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2023
Terminated:May 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 01, 2023 2:31 AM CDT
Defendant
Racquelle Marie Dolores Anteola (2)
Represented By
Stephen C. St. Martin
Stephen C. St. Martin, PC
contact info
T. Jefferson Deen, III
T. Jefferson Deen, Iii, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Melissa Dufour (1)
Represented By
William Carey Alford
William C. Alford, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Elizabeth P. Stepan
Doj-Usao
contact info
George F. May
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/29/2024 5:30 AM CDT
Friday, June 02, 2023
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to Melissa Dufour (1), Racquelle Marie Dolores Anteola (2). (eec) [1:23-mj-00135-MU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Attestation Affidavit
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Elizabeth P. Stepan appearing for USA. (Stepan, Elizabeth) [1:23-mj-00135-MU]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
6 6 MOTION and APPLICATION for Stephen C St Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with[LINK:S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d)] is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-3219987, Online Credit Card Payment) by Racquelle Marie Dolores Anteola. (St. Martin, Stephen) [1:23-mj-00135-MU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit Cert of Good Standing
Friday, June 16, 2023
Set/Reset Deadlines as to Melissa Dufour, Racquelle Marie Dolores Anteola. Unseal deadline set for 12/12/2023 (eec) [1:23-mj-00135-MU]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
18 18 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to Melissa Dufour (1) count(s) 1 & 2: Racquelle Marie Dolores Anteola (2) count(s) 1 & 2. (tgw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Penalty Page,
Att: 2 Signed Indictment