Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10892

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:23-ap-50424
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Recommerce Group, Inc.
2110 Fifth Avenue
Ronkonkoma, NY 11779
Represented By
Recommerce Group, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, Chapter 7 Trustee for the estate of GLOBAL3PL, INC.
1628 John F. Kennedy Boulevard Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Daniel K. Astin
Ciardi, Ciardi & Astin
contact info
Albert A. Ciardi, III
Ciardi Ciardi & Astin
contact info
Walter W. Gouldsbury, III
Ciardi Ciardi & Astin
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
29 29 court Case Reassigned Mon 03/17 11:42 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge J. Kate Stickles added to case. Involvement of Judge John T. Dorsey Terminated (Mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
28 28 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Tue 03/11 4:45 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller, George L. Miller. (McLaughlin, John)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv) Tue 03/11 10:41 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by George L. Miller Hearing scheduled for 3/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (McLaughlin, John)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Withdrawal - Notice Tue 03/11 10:35 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Certificate of No Objection Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller (McLaughlin, John)
Related: [-] 24
25 25 answer Objection Tue 03/11 8:58 AM
Objection to Motion to Approve Settlement Related [+] Filed by Recommerce Group, Inc. (Tancredi, Damien)
Related: [-] 23
Thursday, March 06, 2025
24 24 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Thu 03/06 5:33 PM
Certificate of No Objection Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. (McLaughlin, John)
Related: [-] 23
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 2 Exhibit to Proposed Order - Judgment
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
23 23 motion Approve Settlement - Motion Wed 02/19 12:08 PM
Motion to Approve Settlement -- Motion of George L. Miller, Chapter 7 Trustee to the Estate of Global 3PL, Inc. to (I) Approve First Amended Settlement Agreement; and Enforce First Amended Settlement Agreement Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 3/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 3/4/2025. (McLaughlin, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Att: 6 Proposed Form of Order
Monday, July 08, 2024
22 22 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 07/08 11:13 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. (Astin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
21 21 order Approving Settlement Tue 06/25 1:32 PM
Order Approving the Motion and Settlement Agreement By and Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and Defendant Related [+] Order Signed on 6/25/2024. (RC)
Related: [-] commerce Group, Inc.ument(s)19 ,20
Monday, June 24, 2024
20 20 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Mon 06/24 5:40 PM
Certificate of No Objection Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. (Astin, Daniel)
Related: [-] 19
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
19 19 motion Approve Settlement - Motion Tue 05/28 2:40 PM
Motion to Approve Settlement -- Motion of George L. Miller, Chapter 7 Trustee to the Estate of Global 3PL, Inc. to Approve Settlement Agreement Filed by George L. Miller. Objections due by 6/21/2024. (Astin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 3 Exhibit A
Thursday, March 14, 2024
18 18 mediation Mediator's Certificate of Completion Thu 03/14 11:45 AM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion Related [+] (Weis, Martin)
Related: [-] 15
Monday, March 04, 2024
17 17 misc Status Report Mon 03/04 10:13 PM
Status Report Filed by George L. Miller. (Astin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 20, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/21 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 01/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
Thursday, January 18, 2024
15 15 court VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate) Thu 01/18 11:00 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Martin J Weis is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Mediation Report due by 3/18/2024. Signed on 1/18/2024. (SAP)
Related: [-] 13
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
14 14 4 pgs order Order Wed 01/17 12:32 PM
Amended Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 1/17/2024. (LJH)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Tue 01/16 11:18 PM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Martin J. Weiss of Dilworth Paxson, LLP Between George L. Miller and Recommerce Group, Inc. . Filed by George L. Miller. (Astin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 01/16 11:06 PM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by George L. Miller. (Astin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, December 11, 2023
11 11 misc Status Report Mon 12/11 3:12 PM
Status Report Filed by George L. Miller. (Astin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Status Report Mon 12/11 2:31 PM
Status Report Filed by George L. Miller. (Astin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
9 9 misc Initial Disclosures Tue 11/07 5:58 PM
Initial Disclosures -- Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures Filed by George L. Miller. (Astin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
8 8 4 pgs order Order Wed 10/25 12:55 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 10/25/2023. (LJH)
Related: [-] 6
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 10/25 8:43 AM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2023 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Astin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 10/25 8:29 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by George L. Miller. (Astin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv) Tue 10/24 1:58 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing via Zoom Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2023 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Astin, Daniel)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, September 11, 2023
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/11 8:40 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Recommerce Group, Inc. Mediation due date: 01/9/2024. (Tancredi, Damien)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 06/30 1:59 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Plaintiff George L. Miller. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2023 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Astin, Daniel)
Related: [-] ument1
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 06/30 1:46 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 23-50424 JTD] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A11154794, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 06/30 1:45 PM
Adversary case 23-50424 Complaint by George L. Miller against Recommerce Group, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))). AP Summons Served due date: 9/28/2023. (Astin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B