Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:23-cv-00752
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause12:1441(a) Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 03, 2023
Terminated:Jan 17, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 30, 2023 4:24 AM CST
Defendant
Umbra Applied Technologies Group, Inc.
4377 Commercial Way
Spring Hill, FL 34606
Plaintiff
Ossifix Technologies, Inc.
128 Lido Street
Lakeway, TX 78734
Represented By
Michael J. Smith
The Fowler Law Firm, P.C.
contact info

GPO Dec 05 2023
ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTREATE JUDGE re 9 Motion for Default Judgment, filed by Ossifix Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (jv2)
GPO Jan 03 2024
ORDER ADOPTING 15 Report and Recommendation and GRANTING 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed final judgment by 01/17/2024. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
26 26 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Show Cause Tue 05/28 5:02 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART19 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff's motion is granted as to sanctioning Defendant for failure to comply with the Court's permanent injunction and denied in all other aspects. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
25 25 misc Proposed Order Fri 05/17 10:51 AM
Proposed Order to19 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Contempt and for Sanctions ,23 Order,, by Ossifix Technologies, Inc.. (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Status Report Fri 05/17 10:18 AM
STATUS REPORT on Defendant's Contempt by Ossifix Technologies, Inc.. (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order Fri 05/03 4:42 PM
ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff file, on or before May 17, 2023, a proposed order granting its motion for sanctions and proposing the dollar amount of sanctions. The proposed amount of sanctions shall include a daily penalty for noncompliance with the imposed injunctions and a separate figure for reasonable attorney' fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve this order upon Defendant via its CEO, Alex Umbra, by certified mail and by email.. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
22 22 notice Notice Thu 05/02 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Proof of Service by Ossifix Technologies, Inc. re20 Order to Show Cause,21 Notice (Other)(Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of Service
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
21 21 notice Notice Tue 04/16 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Service by Ossifix Technologies, Inc. re20 Order to Show Cause,(Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Email Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certified Mail Service
Monday, April 15, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 04/15 3:23 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Umbra Applied Technologies Group, Inc. Show Cause Response due by 4/29/2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve this order upon Defendant via its CEO, Alex Umbra, by certified mail and by email. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
19 19 motion Show Cause Thu 04/04 4:36 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Contempt and for Sanctions by Ossifix Technologies, Inc..(Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
18 18 order Judgment - Default Permanent Injunction Wed 01/17 5:05 PM
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to Umbra Applied Technologies Group, Inc.Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/17 5:03 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
17 17 misc Proposed Order Thu 01/11 12:33 PM
Proposed Order Final Default Judgment and Order for Permanent Injunction to16 Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations by Ossifix Technologies, Inc.. (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations Thu 01/04 9:06 AM
ORDER ADOPTING15 Report and Recommendation and GRANTING9 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed final judgment by 01/17/2024. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
15 15 misc Report and Recommendations Order Tue 12/05 3:24 PM
ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTREATE JUDGE re9 Motion for Default Judgment, filed by Ossifix Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (jv2)
Related: [-]
utility Motions No Longer Referred Tue 12/05 3:24 PM
Motions No Longer Referred:9 MOTION for Default Judgment against Umbra Applied Technologies Group, Inc. (jv2)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
14 14 trial Exhibits Mon 12/04 4:23 PM
Exhibit List and EXHIBITS for Motion Hearing held 12/04/2023 before Magistrate Judge Mark Lane.(jv2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Exhibits 1 & 2
13 13 trial Witness List Mon 12/04 4:20 PM
Witness List for Motion Hearing held 12/04/2023 before Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (jv2)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 12/04 4:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Lane: Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2023 re9 MOTION for Default Judgment against Umbra Applied Technologies Group, Inc. filed by Ossifix Technologies, Inc. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) Motion taken under advisement. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter FTR Gold - ERO.)(jv2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
11 11 notice Notice Tue 11/07 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Hearing by Ossifix Technologies, Inc. re9 MOTION for Default Judgment against Umbra Applied Technologies Group, Inc.,10 Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Thu 11/02 5:00 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing on9 MOTION for Default Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (jv2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 10/31 10:32 AM
Text Order REFERRING9 Motion for Default Judgment entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Mark Lane for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmlc)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Tue 10/31 10:57 AM
MOTION REFERRED: referred9 MOTION for Default Judgment against Umbra Applied Technologies Group, Inc. Referral Judge: Mark Lane. (jv2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
9 9 5 pgs motion Default Judgment Tue 08/15 12:44 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Umbra Applied Technologies Group, Inc. by Ossifix Technologies, Inc..(Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Affidavit Declaration of Michael J. Smith,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 08/08 11:01 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Umbra Applied Technologies Group, Inc. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
7 7 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 08/07 4:39 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default against Umbra Applied Technologies Group, Inc. by Ossifix Technologies, Inc..(Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Affidavit Declaration of Michael J. Smith,
Att: 2 22 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 4 1 pgs Proposed Order
6 6 3 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/07 3:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ossifix Technologies, Inc.. All Defendants. (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
5 5 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 07/07 11:35 AM
Summons Issued as to Umbra Applied Technologies Group, Inc. (jv2)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 07/07 10:22 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ossifix Technologies, Inc.. (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Deficiency Notice Fri 07/07 10:17 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 2 Request for Issuance of Summons (jv2)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 07/07 9:58 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ossifix Technologies, Inc.. (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
notice Deficiency Notice Thu 07/06 10:30 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 1 Complaint, Pursuant to local rule CV-65, "An application for a temporary restraining order or for a preliminary injunction shall be made in an instrument separate from the complaint.". Please note that you will need to file a separate motion and proposed order if you still are requesting a TRO.(pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/03 1:08 PM
COMPLAINT and Application for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17617128). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Ossifix Technologies, Inc..(Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Demand,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/06 10:26 AM
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (pg)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Thu 07/06 10:27 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (pg)
Related: [-]