Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-15371

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:23-ap-01331
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sierra Insulation Contractors II, LLC
Represented By
Sierra Insulation Contractors II, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Steve Burnell
Greenspoon Marder
contact info
Asa S Hami
Greenspoon Marder, LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Thursday, March 14, 2024
23 23 notice Notice Thu 03/14 3:08 PM
Notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Burnell, Steve)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:23-ap-01331. Complaint by Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee against Sierra Insulation Contractors II, LLC. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Complaint for (1) Avoidance of Preferential Transfers; (2) Recovery of Avoided Transfers; (3) Preservation of Avoided Transfers; and (4) Disallowance of Claims Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee
Friday, March 01, 2024
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 03/01 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF)
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 03/01 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
20 20 order JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Wed 02/28 7:52 AM
JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Judgment is entered in Plaintiff's favor, and against Defendant (SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS) Signed on 2/28/2024. (ME2)
Related: [-]
19 19 order JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Wed 02/28 7:44 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Default judgment shall be entered against Defendant, and in favor of Plaintiff (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Signed on 2/28/2024. (ME2) Modified on 2/28/2024 (ME2)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
18 18 misc Notice of Lodgment Mon 02/26 12:27 PM
Notice of lodgment Notice of Lodgment of Order or Judgment in Adversary Proceeding Re: Complaint for: (1) Avoidance of Preferential Transfers; (2) Recovery of Avoided Transfers; (3) Preservation of Avoided Transfers; and (4) Disallowance of Claims Filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Burnell, Steve)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:23-ap-01331. Complaint by Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee against Sierra Insulation Contractors II, LLC. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Complaint for (1) Avoidance of Preferential Transfers; (2) Recovery of Avoided Transfers; (3) Preservation of Avoided Transfers; and (4) Disallowance of Claims Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee
17 17 misc Notice of Lodgment Mon 02/26 12:26 PM
Notice of lodgment Notice of Lodgment of Order or Judgment in Adversary Proceeding Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Under 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Burnell, Steve)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee Default Judgment Motion due by 12/14/2023. filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
16 16 court Hearing Held (Other) Wed 02/21 9:22 PM
Hearing held on 2-6-24 re1 Status Conference re: 12 Related [+] Complaint by Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee against Sierra Insulation Contractors II, LLC: RULING - OFF CALENDAR. (ME2)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
15 15 court Hearing Held (Other) Wed 02/21 9:18 PM
Hearing Held on 2-6-24 re9 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Under LBR 7055-1: RULING - GRANTED. Tentative is the ruling. Order to follow; (ME2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
14 14 misc Supplemental Tue 01/16 4:17 PM
Supplemental Supplemental Declaration of Howard M. Ehrenberg in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Burnell, Steve)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
13 13 court Hearing Held (Other) Mon 01/01 10:48 PM
Hearing Held on 12-5-23 re9 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Under LBR 7055-1: RULING - CONTINUED to 2-6-24 at 2PM; (ME2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
court Hearing Set (Motion) (AP Case) Tue 11/21 10:56 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing to be held on 12/05/2023 at 02:00 PM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1539 Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Sheri Bluebond (ME2)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee
Friday, November 17, 2023
12 12 notice Notice Fri 11/17 11:31 AM
Notice Notice of Continued Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Burnell, Steve)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:23-ap-01331. Complaint by Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee against Sierra Insulation Contractors II, LLC. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Complaint for (1) Avoidance of Preferential Transfers; (2) Recovery of Avoided Transfers; (3) Preservation of Avoided Transfers; and (4) Disallowance of Claims Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 11/15 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 11/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Notice that Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC)
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of motion/application Tue 11/14 6:04 PM
Notice of motion/application Notice of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Burnell, Steve)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee Default Judgment Motion due by 12/14/2023. filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee
9 9 motion Default Judgment (motion) Tue 11/14 5:59 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee Default Judgment Motion due by 12/14/2023. (Burnell, Steve)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
8 8 misc Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC) Mon 11/13 1:20 PM
Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default Against Defendant(s) Sierra Insulation Contractors II, LLC; fka Sierra Insulation Contractors, Inc.; Sierra Insulation Co., Inc. Ontario and/or Sierra Gold Coast Insulation Contractors, Inc Related [+] (SM)
Related: [-] 7 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee
Thursday, November 09, 2023
7 7 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Thu 11/09 4:17 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Sierra Insulation Contractors II, LLC fka Sierran Insulation Contractors, Inc., Sierra Insulation Co., Inc. Ontario and/or Sierra Gold Coast Insulation Contractors, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Burnell, Steve)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Tue 09/19 1:15 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 12/05/2023 at 02:00 PM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1539 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for1 , (ME2)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
6 6 court Hearing Held (Other) Tue 09/19 4:35 PM
Hearing held on 9-5-23 re1 Status Conference re: 12 Related [+] Complaint by Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee against Sierra Insulation Contractors II, LLC.: RULING S/C CONTINUED to 12-5-23 at 2PM. File/ serve default judgment motion by 11-14-23 and set for hearing for 12-5-23 at 2pm. (ME2)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
5 5 misc Status report Tue 08/29 1:47 PM
Status report Unilateral Status Report [LBR 7016-1(a)(3)] Filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Burnell, Steve)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
4 4 notice Notice Wed 07/19 4:25 PM
Notice Notice of Compliance With Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1 and Rule 7026 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Burnell, Steve)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:23-ap-01331. Complaint by Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee against Sierra Insulation Contractors II, LLC. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Complaint for (1) Avoidance of Preferential Transfers; (2) Recovery of Avoided Transfers; (3) Preservation of Avoided Transfers; and (4) Disallowance of Claims Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 07/19 4:24 PM
Summons Service Executed on Sierra Insulation Contractors II, LLC 7/18/2023 (Burnell, Steve)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 07/12 6:30 PM
Summons Issued on Sierra Insulation Contractors II, LLC Date Issued 7/12/2023, Answer Due 8/11/2023 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 9/5/2023 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sheri Bluebond (ME2)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee
Friday, June 30, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/30 3:33 PM
Adversary case 2:23-ap-01331. Complaint by Howard M. Ehrenberg, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee against Sierra Insulation Contractors II, LLC. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Complaint for (1) Avoidance of Preferential Transfers; (2) Recovery of Avoided Transfers; (3) Preservation of Avoided Transfers; and (4) Disallowance of Claims Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Burnell, Steve)
Related: [-]