Arizona District Court
Judge:Stephen M Mcnamee
Case #: 2:23-cv-01225
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2023
Terminated:Jul 10, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 30, 2023 2:21 AM MST
Defendant
George Khalaf
Represented By
Kory A Langhofer
Statecraft PLLC
contact info
Thomas J Basile
Statecraft PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Resolute Group LLC
Represented By
Kory A Langhofer
Statecraft PLLC
contact info
Thomas J Basile
Statecraft PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Targeted Victory LLC
Represented By
Evan S Nadel
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton Llp - San Francisco, Ca
contact info
Erick S Durlach
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton Llp - Scottsdale, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
44 44 order Clerks Judgment Wed 07/10 4:14 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's Order filed July 10, 2024, judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff and against defendants jointly and severally in the amount of $120,000.00. (REK)
Related: [-]
43 43 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 07/10 4:13 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to42 Stipulation, Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants. Defendants shall pay a total amount of one hundred twenty thousand dollars ($120,000) to Plaintiff (the "Judgment Amount"). Defendants are jointly and severally liable for the Judgment Amount. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly and close this action. See document for further details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/10/2024. (REK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
42 42 misc Stipulation Tue 07/09 3:42 PM
STIPULATION for Entry of Consent Judgment; [Proposed] Judgment by Targeted Victory LLC. (Durlach, Erick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
41 41 minutes In Camera Hearing Tue 06/11 4:21 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angela M Martinez: Settlement Conference held on 6/11/2024. The parties reached a settlement agreement and will file closing documents within thirty (30) days. Related [+] Hearing held 12:00 PM to 12:30 PM and 3:00 PM to 3:30 PM(SIB)
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
40 40 minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 05/29 2:01 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angela M Martinez: Settlement Conference held on 5/29/2024. The parties are in continued settlement negotiations and will reconvene for a final meeting with the Court at 12:00 p.m. (noon) on June 11, 2024. Settlement Conference set for 6/11/2024 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Angela M Martinez. In Camera Conference held off the record from 10:00 AM to 11:45 AM.(SIB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
39 39 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/24 8:49 AM
ORDERED setting a continued settlement conference in the above-captioned matter for May 29, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Angela M. Martinez. The parties shall appear via Zoom videoconference. The Court shall provide the parties with details regarding their appearances via videoconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angela M Martinez on 5/23/24. (MYE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
38 38 minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 05/23 2:30 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angela M Martinez: Settlement Conference held on 5/22/2024. The parties are in continued settlement negotiations and will reconvene with the Court at 10:00 a.m. on May 29, 2024. In Camera Conference held from 10:30 AM to 6:30 PM.(SIB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
37 37 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 04/24 9:06 AM
ORDERED that a settlement conference is set for 5/22/2024 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Angela M. Martinez. The parties shall appear via Zoom videoconference. The Court shall inform the parties of the details regarding their appearances at a date closer to the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angela M Martinez on 4/23/24. (MYE)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
36 36 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/05 11:34 AM
ORDER referring this matter to United States Magistrate Judge Angela M. Martinez for a settlement conference. Counsel are directed to jointly contact the chambers of Judge Martinez to schedule a settlement conference to be held on or before Friday, June 7, 2024. See document for further details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/05/2024. (REK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
35 35 minutes Scheduling Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Wed 04/03 11:30 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/3/2024: This is the time set for Scheduling Conference. Discussion held re: Settlement Conference referral. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Erick Durlach and Evan Madel for Plaintiff with Representative Katie Reynolds appearing telephonically. Kory Langhofer for Defendants with Defendant George Khalaf appearing in person. (Court Reporter Hilda Lopez.) Hearing held 10:56 AM to 11:22 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
34 34 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/21 2:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by George Khalaf, Resolute Group LLC. (Basile, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/08 2:33 PM
NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Resolute Group LLC. (LFIG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/04 4:13 PM
ORDER denying the parties'31 Joint Motion. ORDERED resetting the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference for 4/3/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/4/2024. (LFIG)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
31 31 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/01 4:39 PM
Joint MOTION to Vacate Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Request for Court to Issue a Rule 16(d) Scheduling Order by Targeted Victory LLC.(Durlach, Erick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
30 30 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/27 8:40 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by George Khalaf, Resolute Group LLC.(Basile, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
29 29 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Mon 02/26 12:12 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Targeted Victory LLC. (Durlach, Erick)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 02/23 2:39 PM
ORDER approving the27 Stipulation to Appear Telephonically. (Doc. 27). The parties' representatives may appear telephonically at the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all counsel will receive dial-in instructions for the teleconference separately via electronic mail prior to the hearing. However, only those who have received permission from the Court may dial-in. All others must appear in-person. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/22/2024. (LFIG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
27 27 misc Stipulation Thu 02/22 1:01 PM
STIPULATION re:24 Order,, Set/Reset Hearings, for Parties' Representatives to Appear Telephonically by Targeted Victory LLC. (Durlach, Erick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 02/21 6:02 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by George Khalaf, Resolute Group LLC. (Basile, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 02/16 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Targeted Victory LLC. (Durlach, Erick)
Related: [-]
24 24 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 02/16 10:33 AM
ORDER setting a Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference for 3/6/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/13/2024. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
23 23 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Hearing Tue 02/13 2:44 PM
ORDER denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss.16 . FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot the Motion to Dismiss filed on September 5, 2023.12 . FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants must answer the Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. FURTHER ORDERED granting Plaintiff's Motion for Rule 16 Conference.22 . A separate order setting the Rule 16 Conference is forthcoming. See document for further details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/13/2024. (CSL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
22 22 misc Request Fri 02/09 12:55 PM
REQUEST re: Rule 16 Conference by Plaintiff Targeted Victory LLC. (Durlach, Erick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 10/24 2:06 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by George Khalaf, Resolute Group LLC.(Basile, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/17 3:09 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Targeted Victory LLC. (Durlach, Erick)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
19 19 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 10/06 12:48 PM
ORDER granting the parties' Joint Motion for Stipulated Protective Order18 . See document for further details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/6/23. (REK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
18 18 motion Protective Order Wed 10/04 3:54 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Targeted Victory LLC.(Durlach, Erick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulated Protective Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
17 17 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Wed 10/04 10:48 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Targeted Victory LLC. (Durlach, Erick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 10/03 4:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by George Khalaf, Resolute Group LLC. (Basile, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) Wed 09/20 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Targeted Victory LLC .(Durlach, Erick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
14 14 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Wed 09/20 9:53 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:13 Amended Complaint filed by Targeted Victory LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1(b) - The amending party must file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use event Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) and attach a copy of the amended pleading that indicates in what respect it differs from the pleading which it amends, by bracketing or striking through the text that was deleted and underlining the text that was added. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/19 9:52 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Targeted Victory LLC filed by Targeted Victory LLC.(Durlach, Erick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 09/05 4:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by George Khalaf, Resolute Group LLC. (Basile, Thomas)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Tue 09/05 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Basile on behalf of George Khalaf, Resolute Group LLC. (Basile, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
10 10 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges ~Util - Terminate Hearings Wed 08/02 11:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Stephen M McNamee. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 23-1225 PHX-SMM. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for August 21, 2023 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc 25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge Wed 08/02 11:27 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
7 7 misc 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b)) Fri 07/21 3:15 PM
ORDER that Targeted Victory LLC show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Instructions,
Att: 2 Consent Form
Friday, July 14, 2023
6 6 service Service Executed Fri 07/14 11:05 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Targeted Victory LLC: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 7/13/23 to George Khalaf & The Resolute Group . (Durlach, Erick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 07/12 12:19 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Evan S Nadel on behalf of Plaintiff Targeted Victory LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 07/03 3:58 PM
Summons Issued as to George Khalaf, Resolute Group LLC.(BAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Saturday, July 01, 2023
4 4 misc New Case Opened Mon 07/03 3:53 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22064117. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 23-01225 PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAC)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Submitted Mon 07/03 3:51 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Targeted Victory LLC. (Durlach, Erick)(BAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/03 3:49 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Targeted Victory LLC. (Durlach, Erick) (BAC)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 07/03 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22064117 filed by Targeted Victory LLC. (Durlach, Erick)(BAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet