Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Charles R Merrill
Case #: 3:23-bk-31551
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Aug 15, 2023
Terminated:Sep 07, 2023

Debtor
B & J Marine Inc.
5910 Poplar Level Road
Louisville, KY 40228
Represented By
Michael W. McClain
Goldberg Simpson LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
William Stephen Reisz
401 W. Main St., Ste 1400
Louisville, KY 40202
US Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Asst. U.S.Trustee 601 West Broadway #512
Louisville, KY 40202


Docket last updated: 08/01/2023 3:23 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
crditcrd none Wed 07/05 2:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition([LINK 23-31551 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt number A10587385 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 30+ pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 07/05 11:27 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $338. Filed by B & J Marine Inc.. (McClain, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 - Corp Wed 07/05 11:30 AM
Meeting of Creditors& Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Reisz, William Stephen with 341(a)
Related: [-]