Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Christopher P Tuite
Case #: 8:23-cv-01487
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2023
Terminated:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Dec 30, 2023 4:48 AM EST
Defendant
Trustees of Dartmouth College
Defendant
Tuck School of Business
Plaintiff
Mark Lindsay Nuckols
1044 Virginia Dr
Sarasota, FL 34234


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 04/16 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 04/14 6:35 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/14/2025. (AC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/28 5:03 PM
ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/28/2024. (AC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
6 6 3 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Wed 02/14 1:59 PM
ORDER adopting 5 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/14/2024. (AC)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
5 5 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 01/26 3:31 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: 1 Complaint and 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 1/26/2024. (MEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 07/06 9:00 AM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCH)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
3 3 service Proposed summons Wed 07/05 3:15 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Mary Lindsay Nuckols. (LD)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 07/05 3:08 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mary Lindsay Nuckols. (LD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/05 3:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Trustees of Dartmouth College, Tuck School of Business with Jury Demand filed by Mary Lindsay Nuckols.(LD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope