North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:Catherine C Eagles
Referred: Joi Elizabeth Peake
Case #: 1:23-cv-00554
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 03, 2023
Terminated:Nov 27, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
6 6 misc Mail Returned Wed 01/31 3:20 PM
Envelope Containing4 KENTREAL DESHAWN QUICK, NORTHERN NECK REGIONAL JAIL, P.O. BOX 1060, WARSAW, VA 22572 returned to court by postal service, marked undeliverable, unable to forward. (at)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
5 5 misc Mail Returned Fri 01/05 10:35 AM
Envelope Containing3 Recommendation Notice,2 Order and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge addressed to KENTREAL DESHAWN QUICK, NORTHERN NECK REGIONAL JAIL, P.O. BOX 1060, WARSAW, VA 22572 returned to court by postal service, marked undeliverable because Not Here. (ab)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
4 4 order Judgment Order Mon 11/27 11:01 AM
ORDER AND JUDGMENT signed by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 11/27/2023, that this action is filed and dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to the plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper § 1983 forms, which corrects the defects cited in the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation and is filed in the proper district. (ab)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
utility Case Referred to Judge Wed 11/15 12:27 PM
CASE REFERRED RE:2 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (rw)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Mailing Recommendation Mon 10/23 4:58 PM
Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 11/6/2023. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 11/9/2023. (Bowers, Alexis)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge Mon 10/23 4:55 PM
ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 10/23/2023, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be filed and dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper § 1983 forms, which corrects the defects cited above and is filed in the correct district. (Bowers, Alexis)
Related: [-]
order Order Mon 10/23 4:57 PM
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 10/23/2023, that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. (Bowers, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
utility Case Assigned Wed 07/05 4:32 PM
Case Assigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Butler, Carol)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred for Screening Wed 07/05 4:52 PM
CASE REFERRED for Screening (Butler, Carol)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/05 10:11 AM
COMPLAINT against NORTHERN NECK REGIONAL JAIL, filed by KENTREAL DESHAWN QUICK.(Butler, Carol)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope - Front and Back