Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00149
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jul 06, 2023 3:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Alfred Atsus (3)
Represented By
Jason J. Mattioli
The Mattioli Law Firm
contact info
Patrick A. Casey
Myers, Brier & Kelly LLP
contact info
Michael J. Ossont
The Mattioli Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Atsus (4)
Represented By
Patrick A. Casey
Myers, Brier & Kelly LLP
contact info
Defendant
Damien Boland (2)
Represented By
Matthew L. Clemente
Matthew L. Clemente, Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Nicholas Dombek (1)
Represented By
Ernest D. Preate, Jr.
Preate Law Offices
contact info
Interested Party
U.S. Probation - Scranton Office
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
James Buchanan
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Oct 10 2024
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus re 96 Joint MOTION to Sever Defendant Nicholas Dombek filed by Joseph Atsus, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, 100 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 1 of the Indictment for Failure to State an Offense filed by Joseph Atsus, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/10/2024. (gg)MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus re 96 Joint MOTION to Sever Defendant Nicholas Dombek filed by Joseph Atsus, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, 100 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 1 of the Indictment for Failure to State an Offense filed by Joseph Atsus, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/10/2024. (gg)MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus re 96 Joint MOTION to Sever Defendant Nicholas Dombek filed by Joseph Atsus, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, 100 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 1 of the Indictment for Failure to State an Offense filed by Joseph Atsus, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/10/2024. (gg)MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus re 96 Joint MOTION to Sever Defendant Nicholas Dombek filed by Joseph Atsus, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, 100 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 1 of the Indictment for Failure to State an Offense filed by Joseph Atsus, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/10/2024. (gg)
GPO Nov 13 2024
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus re 104 Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Firearm Recovered from Damien Boland's Aunt filed by Joseph Atsus, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/12/2024. (gg)MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus re 104 Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Firearm Recovered from Damien Boland's Aunt filed by Joseph Atsus, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/12/2024. (gg)MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus re 104 Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Firearm Recovered from Damien Boland's Aunt filed by Joseph Atsus, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/12/2024. (gg)MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus re 104 Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Firearm Recovered from Damien Boland's Aunt filed by Joseph Atsus, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/12/2024. (gg)
GPO Jan 06 2025
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus re 176 MOTION to Quash filed by CBS Broadcasting Inc., 169 MOTION to Compel filed by Damien Boland, 156 MOTION to Compel filed by Damien Boland, 200 MOTION to Quash Defendant Damien Boland's Subpoenas filed by Atlantic Monthly Group, LLC Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/6/2025. (gg)MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus re 176 MOTION to Quash filed by CBS Broadcasting Inc., 169 MOTION to Compel filed by Damien Boland, 156 MOTION to Compel filed by Damien Boland, 200 MOTION to Quash Defendant Damien Boland's Subpoenas filed by Atlantic Monthly Group, LLC Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/6/2025. (gg)MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus re 176 MOTION to Quash filed by CBS Broadcasting Inc., 169 MOTION to Compel filed by Damien Boland, 156 MOTION to Compel filed by Damien Boland, 200 MOTION to Quash Defendant Damien Boland's Subpoenas filed by Atlantic Monthly Group, LLC Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/6/2025. (gg)MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus re 176 MOTION to Quash filed by CBS Broadcasting Inc., 169 MOTION to Compel filed by Damien Boland, 156 MOTION to Compel filed by Damien Boland, 200 MOTION to Quash Defendant Damien Boland's Subpoenas filed by Atlantic Monthly Group, LLC Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/6/2025. (gg)
GPO Jan 13 2025
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus re 234 MOTION for Reconsideration re 229 Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Order on Motion to Quash,,, and/or Clarification and for Stay filed by CBS Broadcasting Inc. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/13/2025. (gg)MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus re 234 MOTION for Reconsideration re 229 Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Order on Motion to Quash,,, and/or Clarification and for Stay filed by CBS Broadcasting Inc. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/13/2025. (gg)MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus re 234 MOTION for Reconsideration re 229 Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Order on Motion to Quash,,, and/or Clarification and for Stay filed by CBS Broadcasting Inc. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/13/2025. (gg)MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus re 234 MOTION for Reconsideration re 229 Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Order on Motion to Quash,,, and/or Clarification and for Stay filed by CBS Broadcasting Inc. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/13/2025. (gg)

Docket last updated: 07/06/2023 3:31 AM EDT
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Nicholas Dombek (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 7-12, 13, Damien Boland (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 5, 6-10, 12, Alfred Atsus (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 7, Joseph Atsus (4) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 7, 11. (dw)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF ARREST WARRANT as to Nicholas Dombek, signed by Judge MEHALCHICK on 6/6/23. (dw)
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant Issued as to Nicholas Dombek. (dw)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF ARREST WARRANT as to Damien Boland, signed by Judge MEHALCHICK on 6/6/23. (dw)
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant Issued as to Damien Boland. (dw)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF ARREST WARRANT as to Alfred Atsus, signed by Judge MEHALCHICK on 6/6/23. (dw)
Related: [-]
9 9 Arrest Warrant Issued as to Alfred Atsus. (dw)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF ARREST WARRANT as to Joseph Atsus, signed by Judge MEHALCHICK on 6/6/23. (dw)
Related: [-]
11 11 Arrest Warrant Issued as to Joseph Atsus. (dw)
Related: [-]
12 12 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Nicholas Dombek, Damien Boland, Alfred Atsus, Joseph Atsus.(dw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support
13 13 ORDER granting12 Motion to Seal Case as to Nicholas Dombek (1), Damien Boland (2), Alfred Atsus (3), Joseph Atsus (4).Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 6/6/23. (dw)
Related: [-]