Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:23-cv-00762
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 02, 2024 3:04 AM CST
Defendant
Salesforce, Inc.
Represented By
Molly T. Senger
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Karl G. Nelson
Gibson, Dunn
contact info
Jason C. Schwartz
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stacey Cleveland
Represented By
Thomas A. Nesbitt
Deshazo & Nesbitt, LLP
contact info
Michael A. Shaunessy
contact info

GPO Feb 20 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 Motion to Compel, Motion to Dismiss filed by Salesforce, Inc. ( Motions No Longer Referred: 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Dismiss ). Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (pg)
GPO Mar 07 2024
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 19 Report and Recommendations. Defendant' s Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, (Dkt. 11), is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant's motion is GRANTED as to compelling arbitration and DENIED as to dismissing the case. IT IS ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending arbitration. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status reports detailing the status of the arbitration proceedings on June 5, 2024, and every 90 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)

Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Thursday, March 06, 2025
25 25 notice Notice Thu 03/06 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Status of Arbitration Proceedings by Stacey Cleveland (Nesbitt, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
24 24 misc Status Report Mon 12/02 5:20 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration Proceedings by Stacey Cleveland. (Shaunessy, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
23 23 misc Status Report Tue 09/03 1:41 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Salesforce, Inc.. (Nelson, Karl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
22 22 misc Advisory to the Court Wed 06/05 11:15 AM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Stacey Cleveland Joint . (Shaunessy, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations Status Report Order Order Staying Case Fri 03/08 1:37 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for19 Report and Recommendations. Defendant' s Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, (Dkt.11 ), is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant's motion is GRANTED as to compelling arbitration and DENIED as to dismissing the case. IT IS ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending arbitration. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status reports detailing the status of the arbitration proceedings on June 5, 2024, and every 90 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
20 20 misc Advisory to the Court Fri 03/01 3:14 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Stacey Cleveland . (Nesbitt, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
19 19 misc Report and Recommendations ~Util - Motions No Longer Referred Tue 02/20 5:13 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re11 Motion to Compel, Motion to Dismiss filed by Salesforce, Inc. ( Motions No Longer Referred:11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Dismiss ). Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
18 18 notice Notice Tue 02/06 6:42 PM
NOTICE Regarding Proposed Scheduling Order by Salesforce, Inc.(Nelson, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendant's Proposed Scheduling Order
17 17 misc Advisory to the Court Tue 02/06 4:26 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Stacey Cleveland Proposed Scheduling Order .(Shaunessy, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
16 16 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 02/06 2:41 PM
Scheduling Recommendations /Plaintiff's Discovery Plan by Stacey Cleveland. (Nesbitt, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Tue 01/23 10:59 AM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/6/2024. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (jv2)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 10/06 11:08 AM
Text Order REFERRING11 Motion to Compel; REFERRING11 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Mark Lane for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmlc)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Fri 10/06 12:09 PM
MOTION REFERRED: referred11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Dismiss. Referral Judge: Mark Lane. (jv2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 10/03 6:51 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Salesforce, Inc., re11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Salesforce, Inc.(Nelson, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit Declaration of Thomas J. McCormac IV
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
13 13 respm Response to Motion Tue 09/26 7:25 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Stacey Cleveland, re11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Salesforce, Inc.(Nesbitt, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 2 11 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 3 1 pgs Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 09/20 9:43 AM
Text Order GRANTING12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss on or before September 26, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmlc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 09/19 3:27 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss by Stacey Cleveland.(Shaunessy, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
11 11 motion Compel Dismiss Tue 09/05 4:22 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration , MOTION to Dismiss by Salesforce, Inc..(Nelson, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kristine Kopelakis in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration
Thursday, August 17, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/17 3:12 PM
ORDER GRANTING8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Molly T. Senger for Salesforce, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/17 3:11 PM
ORDER GRANTING7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason C. Schwartz for Salesforce, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/15 9:48 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karl G. Nelson (Molly T. Senger) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17774196) by on behalf of Salesforce, Inc..(Nelson, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/15 9:44 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karl G. Nelson (Jason C. Schwartz) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17774185) by on behalf of Salesforce, Inc..(Nelson, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Tue 08/15 9:34 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Salesforce, Inc.. (Nelson, Karl)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 08/15 9:32 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karl G. Nelson on behalf of Salesforce, Inc.. Attorney Karl G. Nelson added to party Salesforce, Inc.(pty:dft) (Nelson, Karl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
4 4 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 07/12 9:17 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stacey Cleveland as to Salesforce, Inc.. Waiver sent on 7/10/2023, answer due 9/8/2023. (Nesbitt, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 07/10 3:38 PM
Summons Issued as to Salesforce, Inc.. (cr5)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 07/06 10:32 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Stacey Cleveland. (Nesbitt, Thomas)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 07/06 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17624745), filed by Stacey Cleveland.(Nesbitt, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/10 2:59 PM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cr5)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Mon 07/10 3:27 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (cr5)
Related: [-]