Member Case
Lead case is: 4:23-bk-90739

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:23-bk-90738
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2023
Terminated:Jul 31, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Ironroc Energy Partners LLC
3322 West End Ave., Suite 450
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
Eric Michael English
Porter Hedges LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 07/31 5:00 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Wed 07/31 5:08 PM
An order has been entered in this case directing that all further reporting concerning the administration of the assets and liabilities in this case will occur only in the case of Alpine Summit Energy Partners, Inc., Case No. 23-90739 (MI). All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 23-90739 (MI). The docket in Case No. 23-90739 (MI) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
9 9 trustee Remark (batch) Mon 10/16 7:16 PM
Remark: Case Reassigned from Judge Jones to Judge Isgur . (RobbieWestmoreland)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 09/22 11:07 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Martin Warren Seidler Filed by on behalf of Triumph Testing Unlimited, LLC (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
7 7 notice Notice Tue 08/29 1:56 PM
Notice of Perfection of Lien Pursuant to Section 546(b) by Archrock Partners Operating LLC . Filed by Archrock Partners Operating LLC (Maraist, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit -A
Monday, July 10, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 07/10 4:31 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Kevin M Maraist Filed by on behalf of Archrock Partners Operating LLC (Maraist, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 08, 2023
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/08 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/08/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order for Joint Administration
Thursday, July 06, 2023
4 4 order Joint Administration Thu 07/06 12:00 PM
Order for Joint Administration under 23-90739 Signed on 7/6/2023 (AlbertAlonzo)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists Thu 07/06 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration Thu 07/06 12:00 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Ironroc Energy Partners LLC (English, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Thu 07/06 12:01 PM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 23-90739 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (AlbertAlonzo)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 07/06 12:07 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-90738 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A24547617. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
1 1 15 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Wed 07/05 10:52 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Ironroc Energy Partners LLC. (English, Eric)
Related: [-]