Member Case
Lead case is: 4:23-bk-90739

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:23-bk-90742
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2023
Terminated:Jul 31, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Ageron Ironroc Energy, LLC
3322 West End Ave., Ste. 450
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
Eric Michael English
Porter Hedges LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 07/31 5:01 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Wed 07/31 5:09 PM
An order has been entered in this case directing that all further reporting concerning the administration of the assets and liabilities in this case will occur only in the case of Alpine Summit Energy Partners, Inc., Case No. 23-90739 (MI). All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 23-90739 (MI). The docket in Case No. 23-90739 (MI) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
8 8 claims Withdrawal of Claim Thu 07/25 4:52 PM
Withdrawal of Claim: 3 KARNES COUNTY c/o JOHN T. BANKS (Banks, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
7 7 trustee Remark (batch) Mon 10/16 7:16 PM
Remark: Case Reassigned from Judge Jones to Judge Isgur . (RobbieWestmoreland)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
6 6 claims Withdrawal of Claim Thu 09/28 11:55 AM
Withdrawal of Claim: 7 (Pennell, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 08, 2023
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/08 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/08/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order for Joint Administration
Thursday, July 06, 2023
4 4 order Joint Administration Thu 07/06 12:02 PM
Order for Joint Administration under 23-90739 Signed on 7/6/2023 (AlbertAlonzo)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists Thu 07/06 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration Thu 07/06 12:01 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Ageron Ironroc Energy, LLC (English, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Thu 07/06 12:02 PM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 23-90739 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (AlbertAlonzo)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 07/06 12:07 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-90742 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A24547617. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
1 1 15 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Wed 07/05 11:10 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Ageron Ironroc Energy, LLC. (English, Eric)
Related: [-]