New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Referred: Jennifer E Willis
Case #: 1:23-cv-05780
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2023
Terminated:Sep 12, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 02, 2024 3:51 AM EST
Plaintiff
Luis Toro
Represented By
Mars Khaimov
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Elite Era, LLC
Terminated: 10/04/2023
Represented By
Erik Mathew Bashian
Bashian & Papantoniou, P.C
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
15 15 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 10/04 6:00 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE, that the above-entitled action against all Defendants shall be and hereby is dismissed pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) with prejudice; without costs, or disbursements, or attorneys' fees to any party. SO ORDERED. Elite Era, LLC terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/4/2023) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/03 5:54 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Elite Era, LLC. Document filed by Luis Toro. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/03 11:05 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Mars Khaimov. RE-FILE Document No. 13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The docket entry text needs to match the document. When re-filing select that the document is pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Your document cites to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)). Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/02 6:13 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Elite Era, LLC. Document filed by Luis Toro. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. ..(Khaimov, Mars) Modified on 10/3/2023 (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
12 12 order Order of Dismissal Tue 09/12 6:01 PM
ORDER: The Court having been advised that all claims asse1ted herein have been settled in principle, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within 30 days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within 30 days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same 30-day period to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(C) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made pa1t of the public record. Any proposed order approving the settlement agreement that seeks the Court's continued jurisdiction should either (1) expressly state that the Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the agreement or (2) incorporate the terms of the settlement agreement in the order. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/12/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 09/11 6:51 PM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Luis Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
10 10 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/30 10:24 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Elite Era, LLC..(Bashian, Erik)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 08/24 9:13 AM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Consent of All Parties addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Erik M Bashian dated August 14, 2023.,1 Complaint. Granted. Defendant's response is due September 15, 2 023. SO ORDERED. Elite Era, LLC answer due 9/15/2023. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/24/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/26 4:31 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Elite Era, LLC served on 7/26/2023, answer due 8/16/2023. Service was accepted by Gjiro Ukeh. Document filed by Luis Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 07/07 3:55 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E Willis. The parties are hereby notified that this Court has written on a legal issue that appears central to this case: the applicability of the ADA to websites. See Del-Orden v. Bonobos, Inc., No. 17 Civ. 2744 (PAE), 2017 WL 6547902 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 20, 2017). (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/7/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 07/07 2:10 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elite Era, LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 07/07 10:53 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 07/07 10:54 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 07/07 10:54 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
3 3 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 07/06 3:17 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elite Era, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Luis Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 07/06 3:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Thu 07/06 3:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Elite Era, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27965434)Document filed by Luis Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]