Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-40375

Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mary Jo Heston
Case #: 3:23-ap-04020
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2023
Terminated:Jan 12, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
San Mar Corporation, a Washington corporation,
Represented By
San Mar Corporation
contact info
Defendant
Ride the Wind Investors, LLC, a Washington limited liability company,
Represented By
Ride the Wind Investors, LLC
contact info
Defendant
240 Tech LLC, a Texas limited liability company,
Represented By
240 Tech LLC
contact info
Defendant
Cloudfund LLC dba Samson Group, a New York limited liability company,
Represented By
Cloudfund LLC dba Samson Group
contact info
Defendant
Delta Bridge Funding LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,
Represented By
Delta Bridge Funding LLC
contact info
Defendant
Redstone Advance, Inc., a Connecticut corporation,
Represented By
Redstone Advance, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
ROQ US, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,
Represented By
ROQ US, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Royal Business Group LLC, a New York limited liability company,
Represented By
Royal Business Group LLC
contact info
Defendant
Samson Horus, LLC, a New York limited liability company,
Represented By
Samson Horus, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Samson MCA LLC, a New York limited liability company,
Represented By
Samson MCA LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles D. Carlson, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Bankruptcy Estate of Printforia, Inc.,
Represented By
Richard B Keeton
Bush Kornfeld LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:07 PM PDT
Friday, January 12, 2024
order Close Adversary Fri 01/12 11:04 AM
CLOSED. Adversary Case 3:23-ap-4020 Closed . (CMK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
22 22 court Minutes - Hearing Not Held Stricken cw Tue 12/05 7:42 AM
Minutes. Hearing Not Held. Hearing has been stricken from the calendar. Related document(s)18 ORDER to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution. Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding docketed 12/4/2023, at ECF21 . (AMT)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
21 21 order Dismissing Adversary Case (order) Mon 12/04 7:52 AM
ORDER Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Case Can Close: 1/4/2024. . (CMK)
Related: [-] 19
Thursday, November 30, 2023
20 20 misc Received UNSIGNED Order Thu 11/30 12:31 PM
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss Adversary Case Thu 11/30 12:21 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Case --Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Charles D. Carlson (Keeton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
18 18 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 11/16 2:00 PM
ORDER to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution . Show Cause hearing date is set for 1/9/2024 at 09:00 AM at Vancouver ZoomGov Hearing MJH. (MT)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
17 17 order ~Dismissing One Party in an Adversary Proceeding Fri 08/11 2:34 PM
ORDER Approving Stipulation. Related [+] (SLM)
Related: [-] 15
Thursday, August 10, 2023
16 16 misc Received UNSIGNED Order Thu 08/10 4:31 PM
Related: [-]
15 15 motion ~generic~ Motion Thu 08/10 4:25 PM
Ex Parte Motion Stipulation Between Trustee and Royal Business Group and Request for Approval of Same Filed by Michael M Sperry on behalf of Royal Business Group LLC (Sperry, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 order Judgment Thu 08/10 2:13 PM
Default JUDGMENT Related [+]. (MT)
Related: [-] 8
13 13 order Default (order) Thu 08/10 2:12 PM
ORDER of Default Related [+] . (MT)
Related: [-] 8
12 12 misc Received UNSIGNED Order Thu 08/10 12:02 PM
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Received UNSIGNED Order Thu 08/10 12:02 PM
Related: [-]
10 10 ans Declaration Thu 08/10 11:37 AM
Declaration of Charles D. Carlson in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Order of Default and Default Judgment Related [+]... Filed by Richard B Keeton of Bush Kornfeld LLP on behalf of Charles D. Carlson. (Keeton, Richard)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Default
9 9 ans Declaration Thu 08/10 11:36 AM
Declaration of Richard B. Keeton in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Orer of Default and Default Judgment Related [+]... Filed by Richard B Keeton of Bush Kornfeld LLP on behalf of Charles D. Carlson. (Keeton, Richard)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Default
8 8 motion Default Thu 08/10 11:31 AM
Ex Parte Motion for Default and Default Judgment . Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Charles D. Carlson (Keeton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/11 2:39 PM
Notice of Appearance . Filed by James B Zack on behalf of San Mar Corporation. (Zack, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/11 2:37 PM
Notice of Appearance . Filed by Gregory R. Fox on behalf of San Mar Corporation. (Fox, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
5 5 misc Proof of Service Fri 07/07 3:38 PM
Proof of Service --Declaration of Mailing Summons in an Adversary Proceeding and Complaint for Declaratory Judgment to Determine the Validity, Priority, and Extent of Liens and Interests in Property . Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Charles D. Carlson. Related [+]. (Keeton, Richard)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons and Pretrial Conference
4 4 notice Notice Regarding Final Adjudication and Consent Fri 07/07 12:58 PM
Notice Regarding Final Adjudication and Consent . Filed by Richard B Keeton of Bush Kornfeld LLP on behalf of Charles D. Carlson. (Keeton, Richard)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Mediation Certification (ADR) Fri 07/07 12:57 PM
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
2 2 court Summons and Pretrial Conference Thu 07/06 6:43 AM
Summons issued to Plaintiff's Attorney, Richard Keeton, for Service on 240 Tech LLC Answer Due 8/7/2023; Cloudfund LLC dba Samson Group Answer Due 8/7/2023; Delta Bridge Funding LLC Answer Due 8/7/2023; ROQ US, LLC Answer Due 8/7/2023; Redstone Advance, Inc. Answer Due 8/7/2023; Ride the Wind Investors, LLC Answer Due 8/7/2023; Royal Business Group LLC Answer Due 8/7/2023; Samson Horus, LLC Answer Due 8/7/2023; Samson MCA LLC Answer Due 8/7/2023; San Mar Corporation Answer Due 8/7/2023. (SAB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 07/05 1:24 PM
Adversary case[LINK 23-04020 . Adversary case 23-04020 Complaint by Charles D. Carlson (attorney Richard B Keeton) against San Mar Corporation, Ride the Wind Investors, LLC, 240 Tech LLC, Cloudfund LLC dba Samson Group, Delta Bridge Funding LLC, Redstone Advance, Inc., ROQ US, LLC, Royal Business Group LLC, Samson Horus, LLC, Samson MCA LLC. . Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)) (Keeton, Richard)
Related: [-]