Alabama Southern District Court
Judge:Kristi K Dubose
Referred: Katherine P Nelson
Case #: 1:23-cv-00254
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2023
Terminated:May 03, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 02, 2024 2:34 AM CST
Defendant
Baldwin County
Plaintiff
Shannon Lee Boone
34990 6230 Cedartown Rd
Molino, FL 32577

GPO Jul 10 2023
ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Boone is ORDERED to, no later than 08/04/23, either (1) pay to the Clerk of Court the $402 filing fee, or (2) complete and file an IFP motion, using this Courts form, as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 07/10/23. (Copy to Plaintiff) (cjr)
GPO Apr 11 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (AMENDED) re 1 Complaint filed by Shannon Lee Boone. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice (1) for failure to pay the statutory filing and administrative fees for this action or show entitlement to IFP status; and, additionally and alternatively, (2) for failure to prosecute and/or obey a court order, under both Rule 41(b) and the Courts inherent authority, as no other lesser sanction will suffice. Copy to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/11/2024. (meh)
GPO May 03 2024
strict Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/3/2024. (meh)ORDER ADOPTING 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (AMENDED) re 1 Complaint filed by Shannon Lee Boone. This civil action is DISMISSED without prejudice (1) for failure to pay the statutory filing and administrative fees for this action or show entitlement to in forma pauperis status; and, additionally and alternatively, (2) for failure to obey a court order, under both Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) and the Courts inherent authority to manage its docket. Copy to Plaintiff. Signed by Di
GPO May 03 2024
JUDGMENT - It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that this civil action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Copy to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/3/2024. (meh)

Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago
Friday, May 03, 2024
7 7 order Judgment Fri 05/03 11:31 AM
JUDGMENT - It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that this civil action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Copy to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/3/2024. (meh)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Fri 05/03 11:28 AM
ORDER ADOPTING5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (AMENDED) re1 Complaint filed by Shannon Lee Boone. This civil action is DISMISSED without prejudice (1) for failure to pay the statutory filing and administrative fees for this action or show entitlement to in forma pauperis status; and, additionally and alternatively, (2) for failure to obey a court order, under both Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) and the Courts inherent authority to manage its docket. Copy to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/3/2024. (meh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
utility Motions Referred Tue 04/30 3:04 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:5 Report and Recommendations. Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
5 5 motion Report and Recommendations ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 04/11 2:52 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (AMENDED) re1 Complaint filed by Shannon Lee Boone. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice (1) for failure to pay the statutory filing and administrative fees for this action or show entitlement to IFP status; and, additionally and alternatively, (2) for failure to prosecute and/or obey a court order, under both Rule 41(b) and the Courts inherent authority, as no other lesser sanction will suffice. Copy to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/11/2024. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
4 4 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 04/10 10:37 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice as further set out. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 04/10/2024. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff by USPS) (jmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
3 3 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 07/10 4:33 PM
ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Boone is ORDERED to, no later than 08/04/23, either (1) pay to the Clerk of Court the $402 filing fee, or (2) complete and file an IFP motion, using this Courts form, as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 07/10/23. (Copy to Plaintiff) (cjr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 07/07 12:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shannon Lee Boone. (See1 Complaint, page 3) Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cjr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/07 11:48 AM
COMPLAINT against Baldwin County, filed by Shannon Lee Boone. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/4/2023. Referred to MJ Nelson. (cjr)
Related: [-]