California Eastern District Court
Judge:Chi Soo Kim
Referred: Kendall J Newman
Case #: 2:23-cv-01319
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2023
Case in other court:Placer County Superior Court, S-CV-0050569
Last checked: Saturday Dec 30, 2023 1:22 AM PST
Defendant
American Contractors Indemnity Company
Represented By
Garret M. Mandel
Porter Law Group, Inc.
contact info
Benjamin M. Johnson
Berliner Cohen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Darin Dowd
Represented By
Benjamin M. Johnson
Berliner Cohen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Dowd
Represented By
Benjamin M. Johnson
Berliner Cohen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Granite Bay Excavating, Inc.
Represented By
Garret M. Mandel
Porter Law Group, Inc.
contact info
Julie D. McElroy
Jacobsen & Mcelroy PC
contact info
Defendant
Joe Loomis
Represented By
Benjamin M. Johnson
Berliner Cohen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Molly Loomis
Represented By
Benjamin M. Johnson
Berliner Cohen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dana Riisager
Represented By
Benjamin M. Johnson
Berliner Cohen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ron Riisager
Represented By
Benjamin M. Johnson
Berliner Cohen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Heather Silvis
Represented By
Benjamin M. Johnson
Berliner Cohen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Velocity Solar Power Installations, LLC
Represented By
Benjamin M. Johnson
Berliner Cohen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Velocity Solar Power, Inc.
Represented By
Benjamin M. Johnson
Berliner Cohen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Emmett Edward Wyrick
Represented By
Benjamin M. Johnson
Berliner Cohen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Erika Wyrick
Represented By
Benjamin M. Johnson
Berliner Cohen, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Erik Fox
Represented By
Marcus L. Turner
Turner Law
contact info
Daniel Kohls
Hansen, Kohls, Sommer & Jacob, LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 04 2023
ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 08/03/23 VACATING any hearing dates currently set and REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. New Case Number 2:23-cv-01319 KJN. (Licea Chavez, V).
GPO Feb 06 2024
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/06/24 DENYING 22 Request for Judicial Notice GRANTING 5 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's claims are STAYED pending a determination of their arbitrability. (Licea Chavez, V)

Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
29 29 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 04/11 2:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 4/11/2025: On February 6, 2024, the Court issued an order granting Defendants Velocity Solar Power, Inc.; Velocity Solar Power Installations, Inc.; Darin Dowd; Jennifer Dowd; Ron Riisager; Dana Riisager; Emmett Edward Wyrick; Erika Wyrick; Joe Loomis; Molly Loomis; and Heather Silvis's motion to compel arbitration and staying the claims pending a determination of their arbitrability. (ECF No. 25.) The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report updating the Court on the status of this case within thirty (30) days. (Text Only Entry) (Deputy Clerk AW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 04/10 4:28 PM
NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Julie D. McElroy. (McElroy, Julie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 09/26 3:47 PM
NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Benjamin M. Johnson. (Johnson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
26 26 1 pgs misc Order Reassigning Magistrate Judge As Presider Tue 04/02 8:16 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of *Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim* to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from *Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman* to Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim for all further proceedings. (Woodson, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
25 25 6 pgs order Order Order on Motion to Compel Tue 02/06 10:47 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/06/24 DENYING22 Request for Judicial Notice GRANTING5 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's claims are STAYED pending a determination of their arbitrability. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
24 24 misc Opposition Wed 11/08 10:24 PM
OPPOSITION by Defendant Velocity Solar Power, Inc. to22 Request for Judicial Notice. (Johnson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
23 23 misc Association of Counsel Tue 10/24 3:13 PM
ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Julie D. McElroy for Granite Bay Excavating, Inc.. (McElroy, Julie)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Request for Judicial Notice Tue 10/24 2:09 PM
REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Erik Fox in re8 Opposition to Motion.(Turner, Marcus)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-10,
Att: 2 Exhibit 11-18
Friday, October 20, 2023
21 21 misc Association of Counsel Fri 10/20 8:44 AM
ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Julie D. McElroy for Granite Bay Excavating, Inc.. (Jacobsen, Karen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
20 20 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 10/19 3:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Chief Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/19/2023: The hearing on the defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings (ECF No.5 ), now calendared for 10/31/2023 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). The hearing date of 10/31/2023 is VACATED. Any additional filings should be submitted in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument or supplemental briefing is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
19 19 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 09/15 3:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy E. Argento for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/15/2023 GRANTING the parties' Stipulation to Continue the motion hearing (ECF No.18 ). The hearing on the Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings (ECF No.5 ) is RESET to 10/31/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The hearing will take place via ZOOM and parties will receive instructions from the court on how to appear closer to the hearing date. (Text Only Entry) (Argento, E.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
18 18 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 09/14 5:53 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Order to Continue Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration and Order Thereon re 16 Minute Order,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing, by American Contractors Indemnity Company, Darin Dowd, Jennifer Dowd, Joe Loomis, Molly Loomis, Dana Riisager, Ron Riisager, Heather Silvis, Velocity Solar Power Installations, LLC, Velocity Solar Power, Inc., Emmett Edward Wyrick, Erika Wyrick. (Johnson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
17 17 12 pgs misc Status Report Tue 08/29 5:28 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Erik Fox. (Kohls, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
16 16 order Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing Tue 08/08 9:40 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Chief Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/8/2023: In light of the Consent Order assigning this matter to Judge Newman (ECF No.15 ), the hearing on the defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings (ECF No,5 ), is RESET for 9/26/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The hearing will take place via Zoom and parties will receive instructions on how to appear. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order Fri 08/04 11:56 AM
ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 08/03/23 VACATING any hearing dates currently set and REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. New Case Number 2:23-cv-01319 KJN. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
14 14 misc Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction Thu 08/03 11:30 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION Please DISREGARD re [ 13 ] Consent Minute Order, issued in error. [Text only] Related [+]
Related: [-] ader, L
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
13 13 order Consent Minute Order Wed 08/02 4:59 PM
CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/2/2023: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 2:23-CV-1319 JAM KJN Related [+]
Related: [-] ader, L
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
12 12 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 08/01 9:32 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kohls, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
11 11 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Mon 07/31 5:21 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mandel, Garret)
Related: [-]
10 10 11 pgs misc Reply Mon 07/31 3:53 PM
REPLY by American Contractors Indemnity Company, Darin Dowd, Jennifer Dowd, Joe Loomis, Molly Loomis, Dana Riisager, Ron Riisager, Heather Silvis, Velocity Solar Power Installations, LLC, Velocity Solar Power, Inc., Emmett Edward Wyrick, Erika Wyrick re5 Motion to Compel,.(Johnson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Supp. Dec - Darin Dowd,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Heather Silvis,
Att: 3 Declaration Supp. Dec - Ron Riisager,
Att: 4 12 pgs Exhibit Exhibit to Ron Riisager's Supp. Dec.
Friday, July 28, 2023
9 9 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Fri 07/28 4:06 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Johnson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
8 8 respm Opposition to Motion Fri 07/21 5:54 PM
OPPOSITION by Erik Fox to5 Motion to Compel,.(Kohls, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice Objectiion to Evidence,
Att: 2 6 pgs Declaration Declaration of Erik Fox,
Att: 3 3 pgs Declaration Declaration of Marcus Turner
Thursday, July 20, 2023
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/20 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Erik Fox. (Turner, Marcus)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
6 6 service Certificate / Proof of Service Wed 07/12 6:39 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by American Contractors Indemnity Company, Darin Dowd, Jennifer Dowd, Joe Loomis, Molly Loomis, Dana Riisager, Ron Riisager, Heather Silvis, Velocity Solar Power Installations, LLC, Velocity Solar Power, Inc., Emmett Edward Wyrick, Erika Wyrick. (Johnson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
5 5 3 pgs motion Compel Fri 07/07 5:45 PM
MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by American Contractors Indemnity Company, Darin Dowd, Jennifer Dowd, Joe Loomis, Molly Loomis, Dana Riisager, Ron Riisager, Heather Silvis, Velocity Solar Power Installations, LLC, Velocity Solar Power, Inc., Emmett Edward Wyrick, Erika Wyrick. Attorney Johnson, Benjamin M. added. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez.(Johnson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 2 Declaration of Benjamin M. Johnson in Support to Motion Compel Arbitration,
Att: 3 3 pgs Declaration of Ron Riisager in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration
Thursday, July 06, 2023
4 4 2 pgs utility Civil Cover Sheet Thu 07/06 2:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by all defendants (Johnson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs misc Civil New Case Documents for JAM Thu 07/06 11:38 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Perdue, C.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 Order re Filing Requirements,
Att: 3 VDRP
Friday, June 30, 2023
2 2 2 pgs CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendants (Johnson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs NOTICE of REMOVAL from Placer County Superior Court, case number S-CV-0050569 by defendants. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10941854)(Johnson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F