Original Case: 1:21-cv-06428

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-00269
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2022
Terminated:Jul 05, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jul 07, 2023 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Richmond University Medical Center
Defendant
Alexander Usorov, M.D.
Defendant
Vaithilingham Aruthasan, M.D.
Defendant
Obi Valentine, M.D.
Defendant
Roland Ngum, M.D.
Defendant
Annette Netsama, M.D.
Defendant - Appellant
Jessie Saverimuttu, M.D.
Represented By
David Bloom
Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Michele Walker, individually and as Administratrix of the Estate of Harry Walker, deceased
Represented By
Antigone Curis
Antigone Curis, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/07/2023 4:32 AM EDT
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jessie Saverimuttu, FILED. [3258172] [22-269] [Entered: 02/09/2022 01:12 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED
2 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Jessie Saverimuttu, district court receipt # ANYEDC-15249944, FILED.[3258176] [22-269] [Entered: 02/09/2022 01:15 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 7 pgs DISTRICT COURT ELECTRONIC TEXT ORDER, dated 01/06/2022, RECEIVED.[3258181] [22-269] [Entered: 02/09/2022 01:19 PM]
Related: [-]