Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Gershwin A Drain
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:23-cv-11618
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2023
Terminated:Nov 09, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 03, 2024 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
AEA International Holdings Pte. Lte.
Represented By
Frances J. Hollander
Starr, Butler, Alexopoulos & Stoner, PLLC
contact info
Joseph A. Starr
Starr, Butler, Alexopoulos, & Stoner, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Faye Geroche
Represented By
Kara Krause
Hurwitz Law PLLC
contact info
Noah S. Hurwitz
Hurwitz Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, November 09, 2023
12 12 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Thu 11/09 2:39 PM
STIPULATED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
11 11 notice Appear* Fri 09/29 10:48 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Settlement Conference set for 7/24/2024 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti in Courtroom 672. **Settlement statements are due by 7/17/24.** Please refer to Judge Patti's Settlement Conference Practice guidelines available at https://www.mied.uscourts.gov/index.cfm?pageFunction=chambers&judgeid=51 (LHos)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge* Fri 09/29 10:32 AM
ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Patti : Settlement Conference. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/28 11:12 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/29/2024 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/29/2024 Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2024 at 2:30 PM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain Jury Trial set for 8/27/ at 9:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. Related [+] (TMcg)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 09/28 11:10 AM
Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain: Scheduling Conference held on 9/28/2023 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (TMcg)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
8 8 notice Appearance Mon 09/25 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kara Krause on behalf of Faye Geroche. (Krause, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
7 7 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Wed 09/20 1:59 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Hollander, Frances)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 09/18 9:32 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 9/28/2023 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
6 6 notice Appear* Fri 09/15 12:32 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2023 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
5 5 misc Attorney Appearance Wed 09/06 1:26 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph A. Starr appearing on behalf of AEA International Holdings Pte. Lte. (Starr, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/05 1:52 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses Limited Reliance Upon and Objection to Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Hollander, Frances)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Tue 08/08 10:22 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. AEA International Holdings Pte. Lte. waiver sent on 7/7/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. (Hurwitz, Noah)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued* Fri 07/07 1:24 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *AEA International Holdings Pte. Lte.* (NAhm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 07/07 1:02 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Faye Geroche against AEA International Holdings Pte. Lte. d/b/a International SOS, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9409724 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Out of Country. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Hurwitz, Noah)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 07/07 1:25 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (NAhm)
Related: [-]