Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-43515

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:23-ap-04284
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2023
Terminated:Sep 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Connor R. Gibaratz
17603 Cranbrook Dr.
Northville, MI 48168
Represented By
Connor R. Gibaratz
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of Denis Preka
Represented By
Madeline Sinkovich
Mike Morse Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
James Thom
Represented By
Madeline Sinkovich
Mike Morse Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Majlinda Preka Thom
Represented By
Madeline Sinkovich
Mike Morse Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, September 30, 2024
25 25 order Dismissing Case - sua sponte Mon 09/30 10:04 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 09/30 10:05 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:23-ap-4284 : Dismissed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 09/30 10:06 AM
Adversary Case 2:23-ap-4284 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order order (Generic) Wed 08/28 8:49 AM
Order Requiring Plaintiffs to File Another Status Report Regarding the Pending State Court Lawsuit, and to Show Cause Why This Adversary Proceeding Should Not Be Dismissed (KEC)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Tue 08/27 10:29 AM
Certificate of Service Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Estate of Denis Preka Related [+]. (Sinkovich, Madeline)
Related: [-] 22 Memorandum
22 22 2 pgs misc Memorandum Tue 08/27 10:28 AM
Memorandum Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Estate of Denis Preka Related [+]. (Sinkovich, Madeline)
Related: [-] 21 Order (Generic)
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order order (Generic) Tue 08/20 2:20 PM
Order Requiring Plaintiffs to File a Status Report Regarding the Pending State Court Lawsuit Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 19 Memorandum filed by Plaintiff Estate of Denis Preka
Monday, May 06, 2024
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Mon 05/06 4:49 PM
Certificate of Service Status Report Regarding Trial Date Filed by Plaintiff Estate of Denis Preka Related [+]. (Sinkovich, Madeline)
Related: [-] 19 Memorandum
19 19 2 pgs misc Memorandum Mon 05/06 4:47 PM
Memorandum Status Report Regarding Trial Date Filed by Plaintiff Estate of Denis Preka Related [+]. (Sinkovich, Madeline)
Related: [-] 13 Order (Generic)
Thursday, January 11, 2024
18 18 answer Response Thu 01/11 11:59 AM
Response to Related [+] Status Report regarding Trial Filed by Plaintiff Estate of Denis Preka (Sinkovich, Madeline)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulated Order,13 Order (Generic)
17 17 order Striking Document (text) Thu 01/11 11:39 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because the certificate of service must contain the court and case heading Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Thomas J. Tucker (Vozniak, Mary)
Related: [-] Response16 Response filed by Plaintiff Estate of Denis Preka
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
16 16 answer Response Wed 01/10 3:03 PM
THIS PLEADING HAS BEEN STRICKEN PER ORDER OF THE COURT DATED 01/11/2024. Response to Related [+] Status Report Regarding Trial Date Filed by Plaintiff Estate of Denis Preka (Sinkovich, Madeline) Modified on 1/11/2024 (lbryant)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulated Order,13 Order (Generic)
Thursday, November 30, 2023
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Thu 11/30 10:15 AM
Certificate of Service of Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Estate of Denis Preka Related [+]. (Sinkovich, Madeline)
Related: [-] 14 Response
14 14 answer Response Thu 11/30 10:12 AM
Response to Related [+] Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Estate of Denis Preka (Sinkovich, Madeline)
Related: [-] 13 Order (Generic)
Monday, November 20, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order order (Generic) Mon 11/20 4:29 PM
Order Requiring Plaintiff's to File a Status Report Regarding the Pending State Court Lawsuit (KEC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/25 9:25 AM
Certificate of Service for Plaintiffs' Response to Order to Show Cause Filed by Plaintiff Estate of Denis Preka Related [+]. (Sinkovich, Madeline)
Related: [-] 11 Response
11 11 answer Response Wed 10/25 9:23 AM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Estate of Denis Preka (Sinkovich, Madeline)
Related: [-] 10 Order (Generic)
Thursday, October 19, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order order (Generic) Thu 10/19 4:09 PM
Order Requiring Plaintiffs To Show Cause In Writing Why This Adversary Proceeding Should Not Be Dismissed, Because Of The Plaintiff's Failure to Comply With The Court's August 16, 2023 Order Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulated Order
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
9 9 order stipulated order Thu 08/17 8:50 AM
Order Staying this Adversary Proceeding Pending Outcome of State Court Action, and Setting a Deadline for Plaintiffs to File Status Report. Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Estate of Denis Preka
Monday, July 31, 2023
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 07/31 2:56 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Connor R. Gibaratz. (Glusac, Rodney)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation Mon 07/31 1:27 PM
Stipulation By and Between Estate of Denis Preka; Connor R. Gibaratz Re: Holding Adversary Proceeding in Abeyance Pending Outcome of State Court Action . Filed by Plaintiff Estate of Denis Preka. (Sinkovich, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 27, 2023
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 07/27 3:48 PM
Summons Service Executed on Connor R. Gibaratz 7/27/2023 (Sinkovich, Madeline)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Reissued Summons (auto) Thu 07/27 12:25 PM
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Request for Reissued Summons Thu 07/27 12:25 PM
Request for Reissued Summons filed by Madeline Sinkovich on behalf of Estate of Denis Preka. (Sinkovich, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
3 3 order Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant Thu 07/20 8:23 AM
Order Regarding Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Connor R. Gibaratz . Proper Service of Summons and Complaint Due on 7/27/2023. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 07/07 12:07 PM
Summons Issued on Connor R. Gibaratz Answer Due 08/7/2023 (Sinkovich, Madeline)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/07 12:07 PM
Adversary case 23-04284 (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): Complaint by Estate of Denis Preka, James Thom, Majlinda Preka Thom against Connor R. Gibaratz. Fee Amount $350. (Sinkovich, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Complaint
Att: 2 Exhibit Order Lifting Stay in Related Case