Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-20867

Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert D Berger
Case #: 2:23-ap-06018
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2023
Terminated:Feb 29, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Goldman Sachs Bank USA d/b/a Applecard GS Bank
co CT Corporation System 1108 E. South Union Avenue
Midvale, UT 84047
Represented By
Goldman Sachs Bank USA d/b/a Applecard GS Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher J. Redmond, Trustee
Redmond Law Firm, LLC South Creek Office Park 13220 Metcalf Avenue, Suite 310
Overland Park, KS 66213
Represented By
Christopher J. Redmond
Redmond Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Christopher J Redmond
Redmond Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, February 29, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Thu 02/29 2:04 PM
Adversary Case 2:23-ap-6018 Closed . (kst)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 13, 2024
9 9 notice Voluntary Dismissal Sat 01/13 12:12 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Redmond . Related [+]
Related: [-] dmond, Christopher
Thursday, August 24, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/24 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 08/24/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 08/22 10:53 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Goldman Sachs Bank USA d/b/a Applecard GS Bank. Related [+]. (kst)
Related: [-] 6 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Goldman Sachs Bank USA d/b/a Applecard GS Bank Filed by Christopher J Redmond on behalf of Christopher J. Redmond . filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Redmond
Monday, August 21, 2023
6 6 misc Request For Clerk's Entry of Default Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7055(a) and FRCP 55(a) Mon 08/21 11:32 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Goldman Sachs Bank USA d/b/a Applecard GS Bank Filed by Christopher J Redmond on behalf of Christopher J. Redmond . Related [+]
Related: [-] dmond, Christopher
Thursday, July 20, 2023
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/20 4:14 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Proof of Service - Green Card for Certified Mail. Filed by Christopher J Redmond on behalf of Christopher J. Redmond
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Redmond, 3 Summons Issued, 4 Summons Service Executed 1 Adversary case 23-06018 Complaint by Christopher J. Redmond, Christopher J Redmond on behalf of Christopher J. Redmond against Goldman Sachs Bank USA d/b/a Applecard GS Bank. Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Cover Sheet), 3 Summons Issued on Goldman Sachs Bank USA d/b/a Applecard GS Bank Date Issued 7/7/2023, Answer Due 8/7/2023 (kst), 4 Summons Service Executed on Goldman Sachs Bank USA d/b/a Applecard GS Bank 7/7/2023dmond, Christopher
Friday, July 07, 2023
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 07/07 1:18 PM
Summons Service Executed on Goldman Sachs Bank USA d/b/a Applecard GS Bank 7/7/2023 Related [+]
Related: [-] dmond, Christopher
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 07/07 9:40 AM
Summons Issued on Goldman Sachs Bank USA d/b/a Applecard GS Bank Date Issued 7/7/2023, Answer Due 8/7/2023 (kst)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
2 2 cmp Summons Request Thu 07/06 2:11 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Christopher J Redmond on behalf of Christopher J. Redmond - summons(es) requested on Goldman Sachs Bank USA d/b/a Applecard GS Bank Related [+]
Related: [-] dmond, Christopher
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/06 2:06 PM
Adversary case 23-06018 Complaint by Christopher J. Redmond, Christopher J Redmond on behalf of Christopher J. Redmond against Goldman Sachs Bank USA d/b/a Applecard GS Bank. Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Related [+]
Related: [-] dmond, Christopher
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet