Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Karen Gren Scholer
Case #: 3:23-cv-01524
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1334 Bankruptcy Appeal
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2023
Re-opened:Oct 04, 2024
Terminated:Oct 04, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 03, 2024 3:14 AM CST
Defendant
NCP Finance Limited Partnership
Represented By
Jeffrey D Anderson
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Sara Kernan Babineaux
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Bradley Hancock
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
David D Hornbeak
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Defendant
TitleMax of Texas Inc
Represented By
Jeffrey D Anderson
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Sara Kernan Babineaux
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Lawrence Bradley Hancock
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
David D Hornbeak
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
Jay Clark Zeleskey
Zeleskey Mediations
contact info
Plaintiff
Katie J. Alvarez Gomez
11300 N. Central Expwy, Suite 301
Texas, TX 75243
Represented By
Karen L Kellett
Kellett & Bartholow PLLC
contact info
Thad Bartholow
Kellett & Bartholow PLLC
contact info
Claude D Smith
Kellett & Bartholow PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago
Friday, October 04, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Mon 10/07 8:32 AM
ORDER: The Clerk is directed to REOPEN this case to enable the dismissal of this case with prejudice pursuant to the parties' Stipulation. In light of the Stipulation, all claims that Plaintiff asserts, or could have asserted, against Defendants in this lawsuit are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party will bear their own attorney's fees and costs. All relief not expressly granted is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/4/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
33 33 misc Stipulation Tue 10/01 1:55 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Katie J. Alvarez Gomez. (Smith, Claude)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 02, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Thu 05/02 12:26 PM
Order: The parties have announced that this case has been resolved, but they require time to obtain approval of the settlement by the United States Bankruptcy Court in the pending Chapter 13 bankruptcy case of Katie J. Alvarez Gomez. This case is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED, without prejudice to its being reopened upon motion by any party to enter a judgment or order of dismissal or for further proceedings if the settlement is not consummated. All pending motions, deadlines, trial dates, and hearings are TERMINATED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/2/2024) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
31 31 motion Stay Wed 05/01 12:31 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines Pending Approval of Settlement filed by Katie J. Alvarez Gomez (Smith, Claude)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 25, 2024
30 30 order Order Thu 04/25 2:56 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court is29 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Titlemax to Provide Discovery Responses ("Motion"). The Court sets the Motion on an expedited briefing schedule. Defendants shall respond to the Motion by May 1, 2024 . Any reply from Plaintiff, if necessary, shall be filed by 12:00 p.m. on May 3, 2024 . The Court further sets the Motion for an in-person hearing on Monday, May 6, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/25/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
29 29 motion Compel Fri 04/19 5:20 PM
MOTION to Compel Defendant TitleMax to Produce Documents and Tangible Things filed by Katie J. Alvarez Gomez with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Smith, Claude)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support of Motion to Compel,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, February 02, 2024
28 28 order Protective Order Fri 02/02 5:38 PM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/2/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
27 27 motion Protective Order Thu 02/01 5:46 PM
Agreed MOTION for Protective Order filed by NCP Finance Limited Partnership, TitleMax of Texas Inc (Hornbeak, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
26 26 motion Protective Order Wed 01/31 2:58 PM
Agreed MOTION for Protective Order filed by TitleMax of Texas Inc (Hornbeak, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1
Monday, October 30, 2023
25 25 order Scheduling Order Mon 10/30 4:56 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 12/2/2024 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Motions due by 8/2/2024. Discovery due by 7/15/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2024 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/30/2023) (kaf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
24 24 1 pgs order Order For ADR Fri 10/27 9:14 AM
MEDIATION ORDER: The court appoints Jay Clark Zeleskey as mediator. The parties are to complete mediation 90 days before trial.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/26/2023) (cfk)
Related: [-]
23 23 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 10/26 2:10 PM
ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Scheduling Conference held on 10/26/2023. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Thad Bartholow; Defense - Landon Mignardi. (Court Reporter: Tutti Bui) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :05. (tub)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
22 22 misc Status Report Mon 10/23 6:09 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT - Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Katie J. Alvarez Gomez. (Smith, Claude)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 22, 2023
21 21 order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Sun 10/22 3:12 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court RESETS the October 25, 2023, FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference to October 26, 2023 , at 11:00 a.m. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/22/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
20 20 misc Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order Fri 10/20 1:35 PM
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order as agreed by the parties by Katie J. Alvarez Gomez. (Smith, Claude)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Mon 10/16 3:54 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL HEARING: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, the Court sets this case for hearing on 10/25/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. At least one counsel of record for each party shall be present. This hearing will be conducted in person. The parties are directed to confer and be prepared to discuss with the Court the matters set forth in Rules 16(b)(3) and 26(f). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/16/2023) (twd)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
18 18 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Mon 09/25 9:29 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by TitleMax of Texas Inc. (sxf)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 09/22 3:23 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court GRANTS 16 TitleMax of Texas, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Answer. The Clerk is instructed to receive and file TitleMax of Texas, Inc.'s Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs Complaint in the form as received with the Motion. See ECF No. 16-1. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/22/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
16 16 motion Leave to File Wed 09/20 6:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by TitleMax of Texas Inc (Hornbeak, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
15 15 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Wed 09/20 3:13 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by NCP Finance Limited Partnership (Hornbeak, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 09/12 9:25 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that13 Plaintiff's Unopposed Expedited Motion to Extend Time to File a Motion to Strike DefendantTitleMax of Texas Inc.'s Answer, to and including September 22, 2023 , is GRANTED . (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/12/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
13 13 motion Extension of Time Fri 09/08 11:26 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time for Plaintiff to File Motion to Strike Answer of TitleMax of Texas, Inc. filed by Katie J. Alvarez Gomez (Smith, Claude)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
12 12 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 08/30 6:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NCP Finance Limited Partnership. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hornbeak, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/30 6:10 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by NCP Finance Limited Partnership. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hornbeak, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
10 10 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Thu 08/24 12:32 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that9 Defendant NCP Finance Limited Partnership's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, to and including August 30, 2023 , is GRANTED . (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/24/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 08/18 5:37 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by NCP Finance Limited PartnershipAttorney David D Hornbeak added to party NCP Finance Limited Partnership(pty:dft) (Hornbeak, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 08/18 2:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TitleMax of Texas Inc. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Hornbeak, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/18 1:52 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by TitleMax of Texas Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney David D Hornbeak added to party TitleMax of Texas Inc(pty:dft) (Hornbeak, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Thu 08/17 11:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to TitleMax of Texas Inc ; served on 7/21/2023. (Smith, Claude)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Thu 08/17 11:36 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to NCP Finance Limited Partnership ; served on 7/21/2023. (Smith, Claude)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 07/10 9:41 AM
Summons Issued as to NCP Finance Limited Partnership, TitleMax of Texas Inc. (axm)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
3 3 qcref Scholer Mon 07/10 9:30 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 07/07 6:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Katie J. Alvarez Gomez. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Smith, Claude)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/07 5:48 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Katie J. Alvarez Gomez. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number BTXNDC-13867909) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Smith, Claude)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) H