Illinois Central District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-30038
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2023 2:51 AM CDT
Defendant
Sebastian Chelemen (1)
Represented By
Rosana E Brown
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Tanner K Jacobs
Us Atty
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/17/2024 10:04 PM CDT
Friday, June 16, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Sebastian Chelemen (1). (DM) [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
2 2 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL DOCUMENT--COMPLAINT-- UNREDACTED (DM) [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
Arrest of Sebastian Chelemen. (BL) [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught: The Writ6 is QUASHED because the scheduled hearing is in person. The Clerk is directed to issue a new writ. (DM) Modified on 6/21/2023 to correct quashed writ document numbe(BL). [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Sebastian Chelemen. (GL) [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
ORDER granting Oral Motion to Unseal Case as to Sebastian Chelemen (1). Entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 6/20/2023. (GL) [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught: Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint as to Sebastian Chelemen held on 6/21/2023. AUSA Douglas J. Quivey present on behalf of the Government. Defendant present in custody from a detention facility by video. Defendant advised of charges. Government's oral motion to unseal is ALLOWED. Defendant advised of rights, including right to counsel. Defendant sworn and questioned by the Court regarding his financial situation. Court finds Defendant qualifies for court-appointed counsel and appoints Federal Public Defenders Office. AFPD Rosana Brown is present and accepts the appointment. Per Government, consulor office notified. Government states statutory penalties. Government seeks detention. The Defendant moves for a continuance. Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing to be held IN PERSON on 6/26/2023 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught, Courtroom 3, Springfield. Government advised of obligations under Brady v. Maryland and advised of the possible consequences of violating such obligations. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Hearing adjourned. (Tape #SP-C 12:41 PM.) (GL) [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 06/20/2023: Initial Appearance set for defendant Sebastian Chelemen on 6/20/2023 at 12:30 p.m. via video before Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught. Defendant and all counsel to appear via video. Video conference instructions are attached. (DM) [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
5 5 VIDEO Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Defendant Sebastian Cheleman, before Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 6/20/2023 by video at 12:30 PM. (DM) [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
6 6 QUASHED. VIDEO Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Defendant Sebastian Cheleman, before Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 6/26/2023 by video at 3:30 PM. (DM) Modified on 6/20/2023 (DM). [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/20/2023 as to Sebastian Chelemen. (BL) [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
8 8 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Sebastian Chelemen for June 26, 2023 at 3:30 PM before US Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught. (DM) [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Sebastian Chelemen. (SEE WRITTEN ORDER.) Entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 6/20/2023. (GL) [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) as to Sebastian Chelemen. (SEE WRITTEN ORDER.) Entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 6/20/2023. (GL) [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
11 11 + + PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Sebastian Chelemen (LT) [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught: Detention Hearing held in person as to Sebastian Chelemen on 6/26/2023. AUSA Tanner Jacobs present on behalf of the Government. Defendant present in custody with AFPD Rosana E. Brown. Parties proceed with detention hearing and proffer evidence. Arguments heard. Court orders defendant detained pending further proceedings. Government to file proposed Order of Detention. Defendant waives preliminary hearing. Per Government, consulate office notified. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals. Hearing adjourned. (Tape #SP-C 3:33 PM.) (GL) [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
12 12 NOTICE of Filing by USA as to Sebastian Chelemen(Jacobs, Tanner) [3:23-mj-03066-KLM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Detention Order
Thursday, July 06, 2023
13 13 INDICTMENT as to Sebastian Chelemen (1) count(s) 1. (JPL)
Related: [-]
14 14 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL INDICTMENT DOCUMENT UNREDACTED (JPL)
Related: [-]
15 15 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET. (JPL)
Related: [-]
16 16 9 pgs TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 7/6/2023: Arraignment on Indictment set for defendant Sebastian Chelemen on 7/11/2023 at 11:00 a.m. via video before Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught. Defendant and all counsel to appear via video. Video conference instructions are attached. (JPL)
Related: [-]