560 Seventh Avenue Owner Secondary LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:23-bk-11289
Lead case is: 1:23-bk-11289
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Philip Bentley |
Case #: | 1:23-bk-11071 |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
560 Seventh Avenue Owner Secondary LLC
560 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004 |
1. | Margaritaville Times Square Hotel Owner Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Protection (costar.com) |
Submitted Thu 07/13/2023 | |
Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago |
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
order
~Generic~ Order
Tue 01/30 11:04 AM
Order Terminating Joint Administration signed on 1/30/2024 (White, Greg) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
41 | 41
99
pgs
misc
Transcript
Fri 09/08 1:54 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 8/3/2023 at 11:00 AM RE: Initial Case Conference; Motion For Relief from Stay...etc... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 12/7/2023. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: AA EXPRESS TRANSCRIPTS.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/15/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 9/29/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/10/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 12/7/2023. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2023 | ||
40 | 40
13
pgs
misc
Transcript
Fri 09/08 8:13 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 8/31/2023 at 10:00 AM RE: Motion for Relief From Stay Filed By Harvey A. Strickon.... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/30/2023. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: AA EXPRESS TRANSCRIPTS.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/8/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 9/22/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/2/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/30/2023. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
39 | 39
order
Motion, Relief from Stay (fee)
Fri 09/01 11:38 AM
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Lifting the Automatic Stay signed on 9/1/2023 (White, Greg) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Affidavit
Mon 08/28 4:57 PM
Affidavit of David Crabtree of Direct Testimony submitted by the Debtor relating to Motion to Vacate Stay Filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of 560 Seventh Avenue Owner Secondary LLC. (Donovan, J.) |
|
37 | 37
misc
Affidavit
Mon 08/28 4:54 PM
Affidavit of Sethian Pomerantz of Direct Testimony submitted by the Debtor relating to Motion to Vacate Stay Filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of 560 Seventh Avenue Owner Secondary LLC. (Donovan, J.) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
ans
Response
Mon 08/21 5:48 PM
Response / Secured Party's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Harvey A. Strickon on behalf of AREPIII MVTS, LLC and CREP TIMES SQUARE HOTEL LLC. (Strickon, Harvey) |
|
35 | 35
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 08/21 4:46 PM
So Ordered Stipulation Establishing Schedule for Remote Evidentiary Hearing on August 31, 2023 in Connection with Secured Party's Motion for Relief from Stay signed on 8/21/2023; with hearing to be held on 8/31/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (PB) (White, Greg) |
|
Sunday, August 20, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Certificate of Mailing PDF notice
Mon 08/21 12:09 AM
Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 08/20/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
misc
PDF Notice
Fri 08/18 12:14 PM
Notice of Order Directing the Joint Administration of Affiliated Cases. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
32 | 32
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Fri 08/18 12:09 PM
Order signed on 8/17/2023 Granting Motion Directing the Joint Administration of Affiliated Cases . Lead case will be 560 Seventh Avenue Owner Primary LLC, Case No. 23-11289 (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Fri 08/18 11:13 AM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of 560 Seventh Avenue Owner Secondary LLC. (Donovan, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Fri 08/18 12:12 PM
Case Jointly Administered with Case No. 23-11289 PB) 560 Seventh Avenue Owner Primary LLC. Please see Lead Case No. 23-11289 PB) for all future entries. (Gomez, Jessica) |
||
Thursday, August 17, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
14
pgs
misc
Transcript
Thu 08/17 3:48 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 08/04/23 at 3:00 P.M. RE: Doc #10 Motion For Relief From Stay Filed By Harvey A. Strickon On Behalf Of Arepiii Mvts, Llc And Crep Times Square Hotel Llc. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/15/2023. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Pro-To-Type.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/24/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 9/7/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 9/18/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/15/2023. (Su, Kevin) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/17 10:08 AM
Stipulation and Order Establishing Schedule for Remote Evidentiary Hearing on August 31, 2023 Filed by Harvey A. Strickon on behalf of AREPIII MVTS, LLC and CREP TIMES SQUARE HOTEL LLC. (Strickon, Harvey) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
21
pgs
answer
Memorandum of Law
Thu 08/10 5:32 PM
Memorandum of Law Relating to the Application of Bad Faith Factors filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of 560 Seventh Avenue Owner Secondary LLC. (Donovan, J.) |
|
Saturday, August 05, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Blank Notice
Sun 08/06 12:07 AM
Certificate of Mailing. . Notice Date 08/05/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Thu 08/03 8:54 PM
Letter Filed by Harvey A. Strickon on behalf of AREPIII MVTS, LLC and CREP TIMES SQUARE HOTEL LLC. with hearing to be held on 8/4/2023 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (PB) (Strickon, Harvey) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Blank Notice (BNC)
Thu 08/03 2:36 PM
Notice of Hearing re: Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Harvey A. Strickon on behalf of AREPIII MVTS, LLC and CREP TIMES SQUARE HOTEL LLC ; with hearing to be held on 8/4/2023 at 03:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (PB) (White, Greg) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice, Appearance
Thu 08/03 8:52 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Documents filed by Jason S. Levin on behalf of Independent Managers Kristine E. Eppes and Benjamin L. Hancock. (Levin, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/02 3:09 PM
Order Regarding August 3, 2023 Hearing signed on 8/2/2023 (White, Greg) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Reply
Tue 08/01 6:12 PM
Reply to Motion of Secured Party for Relief from Stay filed by Harvey A. Strickon on behalf of AREPIII MVTS, LLC and CREP TIMES SQUARE HOTEL LLC. (Strickon, Harvey) |
|
Sunday, July 30, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Motion, Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim
Sun 07/30 12:51 PM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of 560 Seventh Avenue Owner Secondary LLC. (Donovan, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Notice | ||
20 | 20
22
pgs
misc
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury For Non-Individual Debtors - Official Form 202
Sun 07/30 12:49 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual , Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual , Matrix Filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of 560 Seventh Avenue Owner Secondary LLC. (Donovan, J.) |
|
19 | 19
answer
Opposition
Sun 07/30 11:43 AM
Opposition of the Debtor to the Lift Stay Motion filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of 560 Seventh Avenue Owner Secondary LLC. with hearing to be held on 8/3/2023 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (PB) (Donovan, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Ex. A - Appraisal | ||
Att: 2 Ex B - Budget | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - May and June P&L | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Resolution | ||
Att: 5 Exhibity E - Term Sheet | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Letter | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Memorandum Endorsed Order
Tue 07/25 7:10 PM
Memorandum Endorsed Order Granting Request. The Debtors time to respond to the Lenders lift-stay motion is extended to Sunday, July 30, 2023 at 12:00 noon signed on 7/25/2023 (White, Greg) |
|
17 | 17
2
pgs
misc
Letter
Tue 07/25 12:02 PM
Letter to Judge Bentley Filed by Harvey A. Strickon on behalf of AREPIII MVTS, LLC and CREP TIMES SQUARE HOTEL LLC. with hearing to be held on 8/3/2023 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (PB) Objections due by 7/27/2023, (Strickon, Harvey) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Tue 07/25 10:38 AM
Letter Requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Motion Filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of 560 Seventh Avenue Owner Secondary LLC. (Donovan, J.) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 07/13 5:30 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Harvey A. Strickon on behalf of AREPIII MVTS, LLC and CREP TIMES SQUARE HOTEL LLC. (Strickon, Harvey) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice, Appearance
Thu 07/13 1:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9010 filed by Lawrence R. Reich on behalf of IMCMV Times Square, LLC. |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Mailing PDF notice
Thu 07/13 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 07/12/2023. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting
Thu 07/13 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors . Notice Date 07/12/2023. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice, Appearance
Wed 07/12 5:19 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Clifford A. Katz on behalf of NEC Financial Services, LLC. (Katz, Clifford) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Motion, Relief from Stay (fee)
Wed 07/12 3:04 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Harvey A. Strickon on behalf of AREPIII MVTS, LLC and CREP TIMES SQUARE HOTEL LLC with hearing to be held on 8/3/2023 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (PB) Responses due by 7/27/2023,. (Strickon, Harvey) |
|
Att: 1 Pleading Motion for Relief from Stay | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice, Appearance
Wed 07/12 3:01 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Harvey A. Strickon on behalf of AREPIII MVTS, LLC and CREP TIMES SQUARE HOTEL LLC. (Strickon, Harvey) |
|
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 07/12 12:13 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Conference signed on 7/12/2023; with hearing to be held on 8/3/2023 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (PB) (White, Greg) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Appearance
Wed 07/12 10:23 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Laura E. Appleby on behalf of Global One Professional Investment Type Private U.S. Real Estate Investment Trust No. 2(H), Global One Professional Investment Type Private U.S. Real Estate Investment Trust No. 1(H). (Appleby, Laura) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 07/12 3:07 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay (fee)([LINK 23-11071 pb] ) [motion,185] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16272804. Fee amount 188.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Appearance
Mon 07/10 5:12 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Harvey A. Strickon on behalf of AREPIII MVTS, LLC. (Strickon, Harvey) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Appearance
Mon 07/10 4:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of All Notices, Pleadings, and Orders filed by Scott S. Markowitz on behalf of Garment Center Congregation. (Markowitz, Scott) |
|
4 | 4
trustee
UST SOA
Mon 07/10 9:59 AM
Notice of Rescheduled Section 341 Meeting of Creditors. All parties shall appear by phone. See Instructions Included. Filed by Brian S. Masumoto on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/7/2023 at 02:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Masumoto, Brian) |
|
3 | 3
trustee
UST SOA
Mon 07/10 9:56 AM
Notice of Rescheduled Section 341 Meeting of Creditors. All parties shall appear by phone. See Instructions Included. Filed by Brian S. Masumoto on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/7/2023 at 01:45 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Masumoto, Brian) |
|
2 | 2
misc
341(a) Notice (Chapter 11,12) (BNC)
Mon 07/10 9:38 AM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/7/2023 at 02:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Lopez, Mary) |
|
misc
Add Judge
Mon 07/10 7:59 AM
Judge Philip Bentley added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
Sunday, July 09, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
17
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 07/09 7:05 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Case Designated As Mega as per LBR 1073-1. Schedule A/B due 07/24/2023. Schedule D due 07/24/2023. Schedule E/F due 07/24/2023. Schedule G due 07/24/2023. Schedule H due 07/24/2023. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 07/24/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs due 07/24/2023. Atty Disclosure State. due 07/24/2023. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 07/24/2023. Declaration of Schedules due 07/24/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 07/24/2023, Chapter 11 Plan due by 11/6/2023, Disclosure Statement due by 11/6/2023, Initial Case Conference due by 8/8/2023, Filed by Kevin J. Nash of Goldberg Weprin Finkel Goldstein LLP on behalf of 560 Seventh Avenue Owner Secondary LLC. (Nash, Kevin) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Sun 07/09 7:21 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-11071 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16267147. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |