Minnesota District Court
Judge:Susan Richard Nelson
Referred: David T Schultz
Case #: 0:23-cv-02056
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2023
Terminated:Sep 19, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 06, 2024 3:07 AM CST
Defendant
Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Jake Elrich
Messerli Kramer
contact info
Terrance J Wagener
Messerli & Kramer P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Tamiquea Spencer
Represented By
Jeff Schleeter
Fields Law Firm
contact info
Zachary Schmoll
Fields Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, September 20, 2024
20 20 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Fri 09/20 11:25 AM
JUDGMENT(LTT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Thursday, September 19, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 09/19 1:49 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by The Hon. Susan Richard Nelson on 9/19/2024. (LLM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
18 18 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Wed 09/18 3:08 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re17 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Schleeter, Jeff)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 09/18 3:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Tamiquea Spencer. Jointly Signed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Schleeter, Jeff)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
16 16 order Order Cancelling Deadline & Hearing Wed 07/31 2:04 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER Cancelling Deadline & Hearing. Settlement conference set for 8/12/24 is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/31/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 07/29 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Tamiquea Spencer (Schleeter, Jeff)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
14 14 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Tue 07/09 3:11 PM
ORDER/NOTICE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 7/29/2024. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 7/29/2024. Settlement Conference set for 8/12/2024 at 01:00 PM by Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/9/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders Mon 07/08 4:21 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting11 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/8/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
12 12 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Fri 06/28 10:14 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re11 Stipulation. (Schleeter, Jeff)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Stipulation Fri 06/28 10:10 AM
STIPULATION by Tamiquea Spencer. (Schleeter, Jeff)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
10 10 order Order/Notice to Attorney Thu 09/28 3:55 PM
ORDER REGARDING LR 5.6. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/28/2023. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ex 1,
Att: 2 ex 2
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/28 3:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2023. Motions (non-disp) due 2/1/2024. Motions (disp) SCHEDULE by 7/1/2024. Ready for trial due by 11/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/28/2023. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
8 8 order Order Cancelling Deadline & Hearing Tue 09/12 2:25 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER Cancelling Deadline & Hearing. Pretrial conference is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/12/2023. (TJB)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 09/12 11:20 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Tamiquea Spencer.(Wagener, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
6 6 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Fri 08/11 3:59 PM
ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 9/7/2023. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/7/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/11/2023.(TJB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Friday, August 04, 2023
5 5 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Fri 08/04 4:06 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Wagener, Terrance)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/04 4:04 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Wagener, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 07/10 2:45 PM
Summons Issued as to Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (ABR)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Mon 07/10 2:43 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 23-cv-2056 (SRN/DTS). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/10 12:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10395560) filed by Tamiquea Spencer. Filer requests summons issued. (Schleeter, Jeff)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet