Ungarelli v. Newsom Eye & Laser Center, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia M Hernandez Covington |
Referred: | Mac R Mccoy |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-01531 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex) |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 06, 2024 4:11 AM EST |
Defendant
Newsom Eye & Laser Center, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Ungarelli
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 16, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Wed 08/16 10:05 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: On the basis of the Notice of Settlement (Doc. # 11 ), this cause is hereby dismissed, without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within 60 days of the date hereof, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or request an extension of time, should they so choose or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause being shown. After that 60-day period, however, without further order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. Furthermore, the Court advises the parties that "good cause" exists to reopen an action when a settlement agreement has yet to be finalized because of various delays. But incomplete performance of an executed settlement agreement, such as the failure to disburse settlement funds, does not constitute good cause to reopen an action. This Court does not retain jurisdiction to ensure performance of a settlement agreement or consent judgment because such failure to perform should be addressed in a separate breach of contract action. The Clerk is directed to terminate any previously scheduled deadlines and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/16/2023. (JAK) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of settlement by Jessica Ungarelli (Yormak, Benjamin) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 08/01 4:11 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:23-cv-1531-VMC-UAM. Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy no longer assigned to the case. (AG) |
|
Sunday, July 16, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Sun 07/16 3:23 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The Court is aware of the notice entered in this case, explaining that Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the filing of a uniform case management report with forty or seventy days, depending on the circumstances of the case. However, under Local Rule 1.01(b), a judge can modify or suspend for all or part of an action the application of any rule, except Rule 1.05(a). This Court finds it beneficial to enter a fast-track scheduling order in certain categories of cases before entry of a case management and scheduling order. Additionally, in cases that are not fast-tracked, this Court finds it efficient to have the parties confer and file case management reports within 14 days after the defendant's responsive pleading is due or within 14 days after a case is removed to this Court. In light of this, the Court hereby suspends Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) in this case. At a time the Court deems appropriate, the Court will enter a further order in this case setting either a deadline to file a completed uniform case management report or various fast-track deadlines for the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/16/2023. (MEJ) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() SUMMONS issued as to Newsom Eye & Laser Center, Inc. (LAB) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 07/12 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 07/11 9:05 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 8:23-cv-1531-VMC-MRM. (AET) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Benjamin H. Yormak on behalf of Jessica Ungarelli. Lead Counsel: Benjamin H. Yormak. (Yormak, Benjamin) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jessica Ungarelli. (Yormak, Benjamin) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jessica Ungarelli. Related case(s): No (Yormak, Benjamin) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Newsom Eye & Laser Center, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21023998) filed by Jessica Ungarelli.(Yormak, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |