California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00106
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jul 14, 2023 11:09 AM PDT
Defendant
Augusto Alizo (3)
Represented By
Sara Azari
Law Office Of Sara Azari
contact info
Mark S Lowry
Lowry Legal, LLC
contact info
Michael J Entin
Michael J. Entin P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Eric Marsiglia (1)
Represented By
Gail R. Shifman
Law Offices Of Gail Shifman
contact info
Steven E Farese, Sr
Farese, Farese & Farese, P.A.
contact info
Joseph Whitten Cooper
Farese Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Kourosh Mirmehdi (2)
Represented By
Martin Antonio Sabelli
Law Offices Of Martin A. Sabelli
contact info
Defendant
Michael Podhurst (4)
Represented By
Jonathan F Marshall
The Law Offices Of Jonathan F. Marshall
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christiaan H Highsmith
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Ross E Weingarten
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The Northern District Of Cal
contact info

GPO May 11 2023
STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release as to Eric Marsiglia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/11/2023. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2023)
GPO Jun 05 2023
STIPULATION AND ORDER To Continue Hearing & Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Eric Marsiglia.Status Conference previously set for 6/9/2023 is continued to 7/18/2023 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/rs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/5/2023. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2023)
GPO Jul 13 2023
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 57 Continuing Hearing & Excluding Time as to Eric Marsiglia, Augusto Alizo. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/13/2023. Status Conference previously set for 7/18/2023 is continued to 9/19/2023 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/rs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2023)STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 57 Continuing Hearing & Excluding Time as to Eric Marsiglia, Augusto Alizo. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/13/2023. Status Conference previously set for 7/18/2023 is continued to 9/19/2023 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/rs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2023)
GPO Nov 22 2023
STIPULATION AND ORDER 65 CONTINUING STATUS HEARING AND EXCLUDING TIME UNDER THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACT FROM DECEMBER 12, 2023, TO FEBRUARY 27, 2024 as to Eric Marsiglia, Augusto Alizo. Status Conference previously set for 12/12/2023 is continued to 2/27/2024 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/22/2023. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023)STIPULATION AND ORDER 65 CONTINUING STATUS HEARING AND EXCLUDING TIME UNDER THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACT FROM DECEMBER 12, 2023, TO FEBRUARY 27, 2024 as to Eric Marsiglia, Augusto Alizo. Status Conference previously set for 12/12/2023 is continued to 2/27/2024 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/22/2023. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 2:33 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Eric Marsiglia (1) count(s) 1, 2-5, 6, 7-12, 13-14, Kourosh Mirmehdi (2) count(s) 1, 2-5, 13, Augusto Alizo (3) count(s) 1, 2-5, 13, Michael Podhurst (4) count(s) 6, 7-12, 14. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Penalty Sheet,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet
Att: 3 30 pgs (4/25/2023) Redacted Indictment
4 4 MOTION to Seal Documents by USA as to Eric Marsiglia, Kourosh Mirmehdi, Augusto Alizo, Michael Podhurst. (mjj2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Seal Documents as to Eric Marsiglia (1), Kourosh Mirmehdi (2), Augusto Alizo (3), Michael Podhurst (4) Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/11/2023. (mjj2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]