Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Judith G Dein
Case #: 1:23-cv-11548
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2023
Terminated:Dec 06, 2023
Case in other court:Middlesex Superior Court, 2381CV01798
Last checked: Sunday Jan 07, 2024 4:18 AM EST
Defendant
Rippling PEO 1, Inc.
Represented By
Joshua D. Nadreau
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christina Bennani-Persechini
Represented By
Scott A. Lathrop
Attorney At Law
contact info

GPO Apr 30 2024
Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. ORDER on Defendant's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. For the reasons detailed herein, Rippling's Motion for Sanctions (Docket No. 19) is DENIED. (Thomson, Katherine)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
24 24 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Sanctions Tue 04/30 2:02 PM
Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. ORDER on Defendant's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. For the reasons detailed herein, Rippling's Motion for Sanctions (Docket No.19 ) is DENIED. (Thomson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
23 23 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 04/18 5:45 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held by video conference before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2024 re19 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Rippling PEO 1, Inc.; case called; the clerk gives notice of prohibition on broadcasting, photographing, or recording of the court proceeding; USMJ Dein hears arguments from counsel and takes motion under advisement. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html. For a transcript of this proceeding, contact mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Nadreau and Lathrop) (Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
22 22 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Thu 03/14 10:42 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE SETTING HEARING on Motion19 MOTION for Sanctions : Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 Related [+] before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the [LINK:Court schedule] . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Thomson, Katherine)
Related: [-] mote only
Thursday, February 29, 2024
21 21 respm Opposition to Motion Fri 03/01 1:52 PM
Opposition re19 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Christina Bennani-Persechini. (Thomson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1,
Att: 2 Attachment 2,
Att: 3 Attachment 3,
Att: 4 Attachment 4
Thursday, February 22, 2024
20 20 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 02/22 8:29 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re19 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Rippling PEO 1, Inc..(Nadreau, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Sarah Bloom,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
19 19 motion Sanctions Thu 02/22 8:27 PM
MOTION for Sanctions by Rippling PEO 1, Inc..(Nadreau, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 12/06 2:03 PM
Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Thomson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
17 17 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 11/29 4:09 PM
Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered granting7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
16 16 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 09/13 11:41 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein:case called; Motion Hearing held on 9/13/2023 re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rippling PEO 1, Inc.; USMJ Dein hears arguments from counsel and takes motion under advisement. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html. For a transcript of this proceeding, contact mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Lathrop via telephone and Nadreau) (Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
15 15 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Thu 08/24 11:57 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE RESETTING HEARING on Motion7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing reset for 9/13/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15 (In person only) before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Thomson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 08/24 11:55 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting13 MOTION to Continue Hearing. (Thomson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
13 13 motion Continue Wed 08/23 3:41 PM
Assented to MOTION to Continue Hearing on Rippling PEO 1, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Rippling PEO 1, Inc..(Nadreau, Joshua)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Wed 08/23 9:39 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE SETTING HEARING on Motion7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15 (In person only) before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. This hearing will be held in person unless the parties request otherwise. (Thomson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
11 11 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 08/15 2:55 PM
CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Rippling PEO 1, Inc... (Nadreau, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
10 10 misc Reminder to Submit Consent or Refusal of MJ Jurisdiction Wed 08/09 3:11 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A notification form indicating whether or not the parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge has not been filed. Submission of the form is mandatory, and a completed form should be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Thomson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Opposition to Motion Wed 08/09 6:12 AM
Opposition re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Christina Bennani-Persechini. (Lathrop, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
8 8 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 08/04 4:02 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rippling PEO 1, Inc.. (Nadreau, Joshua)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 08/04 4:02 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rippling PEO 1, Inc..(Nadreau, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 07/18 2:45 PM
Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting5 MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/04/2023 to File Answer . Answer due by 8/4/2023. (Thomson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 07/17 11:06 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/04/2023 to File Answer by Rippling PEO 1, Inc..(Nadreau, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
4 4 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Tue 07/11 1:11 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Tue 07/11 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 07/11 10:08 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rippling PEO 1, Inc.. (Nadreau, Joshua)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs notice Notice of Removal Tue 07/11 10:05 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rippling PEO 1, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number CMADC-9939987 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Nadreau, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 61 pgs Exhibit State Court Docket,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Category Form