California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:J Barrett Marum
Case #: 3:23-bk-01998
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Green Hygienics Holdings, Inc.
1876 Round Potrero
Potrero, CA 91963
Represented By
Andrew S. Bisom
Bisom Law Group
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 07/10/2023 5:00 PM PDT
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
crditcrd Auto-docket of credit card Tue 07/11 10:25 AM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition([LINK 23-01998 11] ) [misc,1031] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 1738.00 Receipt number A17747509 Related [+]; (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 48 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (fee) external Tue 07/11 9:49 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Fee Amount $ 1738.00. Declaration re: Electronic Filing due by 07/25/2023, Chapter 11 Plan due by 11/8/2023, Disclosure Statement due by 11/8/2023, Filed by Andrew S. Bisom of Bisom Law Group on behalf of Green Hygienics Holdings, Inc.. (Bisom, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement (CSD 1007-7) Tue 07/11 10:23 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Corporate Affiliates added to case:, Alita Capital, Inc. as Corporate Debtor. filed by Andrew S. Bisom on behalf of Green Hygienics Holdings, Inc.. (Bisom, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Special Notice by UST (Request) (paperless entry) Tue 07/11 2:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Special Notice. United States Trustees Office, 880 Front Street, Third Floor, Suite 3230, San Diego, CA 92101 filed by Elvina Rofael on behalf of United States Trustee. (Rofael, Elvina)
Related: [-]