California Eastern District Court
Judge:Dena M Coggins
Referred: Sean C Riordan
Case #: 2:23-cv-01359
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jan 07, 2024 1:11 AM PST
Defendant
ForLawFirmsOnly Marketing, Inc.
Represented By
Shalend Shane Singh
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ron Lasorsa
Defendant
Edward Lott
Represented By
Shalend Shane Singh
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
Victory Litigation Fund, LP
Plaintiff
Clear View Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Michael N Sofris
Michael N. Sofris
contact info


Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago
Monday, October 21, 2024
20 20 order Minute Order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 10/21 10:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan on 10/21/2024: Pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), Plaintiff's18 Motion for Default Judgment is SUBMITTED without oral argument. The hearing set for 11/7/2024 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Her, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
19 19 2 pgs misc Order Reassigning Newly Appointed District Judge Thu 10/10 3:13 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Troy L. Nunley: Due to the appointment of District Judge Dena M. Coggins to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from District Judge *Morrison C. England, Jr.* to District Judge Dena M. Coggins for all further proceedings. All hearings currently set before the District Judge in this reassigned action are VACATED. (Donati, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
18 18 motion Default Judgment Tue 10/01 9:44 AM
MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Defaulting Defendant Victory Litigation Fund, LP by Clear View Enterprises, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (SCR) before Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan. (Sofris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael N. Sofris In Support,
Att: 2 (Proposed) Default Judgment,
Att: 3 Request to Appear Remotely,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Sunday, September 22, 2024
17 17 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Sun 09/22 11:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: On April 17, 2024, and at the request of Plaintiff, the Clerk entered default as to defendant VICTORY LITIGATION FUND, LP (ECF No. 15). Plaintiff has not yet moved for entry of default judgment. Accordingly, not later than ten (10) days following the date of this Order, Plaintiff is directed to file a Motion for Default Judgment as to defendant VICTORY LITIGATION FUND, LP before the assigned magistrate judge. (Terrin, S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
16 16 1 pgs misc Order Reassigning Newly Appointed Magistrate Judge (SCR) Tue 08/06 9:23 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan to the bench of the Eastern District of California, the court hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes to Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan for all further proceedings. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 04/17 8:01 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Victory Litigation Fund, LP* (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
14 14 misc Request for Entry of Default Thu 04/11 2:58 PM
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Victory Litigation Fund, LP by Clear View Enterprises, LLC.(Sofris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Clerk's Entry of Default
Thursday, November 16, 2023
13 13 misc Civil New Case Documents for MCE Thu 11/16 2:36 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
12 12 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Thu 11/16 2:35 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The new case number is: 2:23-cv-1359 MCE DB. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Thu 11/16 2:11 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Sofris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
10 10 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 11/14 10:40 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Singh, Shalend)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
9 9 order Minute Order Mon 11/13 4:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Law Clerk for Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/13/2023: Within 14 days of the date of this order the parties shall complete and file the form entitled Consent to Assignment or Request for Reassignment. The form is available on the court's website, at this link: http://www.caed.uscourts.gov/caednew/index.cfm/forms/civil/ (Text Only Entry)(Van Dine, B)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/29 10:03 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by ForLawFirmsOnly Marketing, Inc., Edward Lott. Attorney Singh, Shalend Shane added.(Singh, Shalend)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/28 5:02 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Edward Lott served on 8/28/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (Sofris, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/28 5:00 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: ForLawFirmsOnly Marketing, Inc. served on 8/28/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (Sofris, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/28 4:59 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Victory Litigation Fund, LP served on 8/23/2023, answer due 9/13/2023. (Sofris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Tue 07/11 9:59 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
3 3 2 pgs service Summons Tue 07/11 9:59 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *ForLawFirmsOnly Marketing, Inc., Ron Lasorsa, Edward Lott, Victory Litigation Fund, LP* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael N Sofris* *468 N. Camden Drive Suite 200* *Beverly Hills, CA 90210*. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs utility Civil Cover Sheet Tue 07/11 9:19 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Clear View Enterprises, LLC (Sofris, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 07/11 9:17 AM
COMPLAINT against Clear View Enterprises, LLC by Clear View Enterprises, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10953729) (Sofris, Michael)
Related: [-]