California Central District Court
Judge:Terry J Hatter, Jr
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:23-cv-05577
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2023
Terminated:Aug 21, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 07, 2024 1:18 AM PST
Defendant
Postech Fashion, Inc.
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Kilina America, Inc.
Represented By
Scott A. Burroughs
Doniger Burroughs
contact info
Trevor William Barrett
Doniger Burroughs
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
17 17 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 08/22 7:55 AM
IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Counsel are hereby notified that pursuant to the Judge's directive, this case is closed per the Notice of Voluntary dismissal16 with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
16 16 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 04/30 9:29 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Kilina America, Inc.. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Burroughs, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 03/05 4:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. In the present case, it appears that one or more of these time periods has not been met. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before APRIL 30, 2024 why this action should not be dismissedfor lack of prosecution. See minute order for details. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
14 14 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Mon 01/29 9:39 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Postech Fashion, Inc. (shb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
13 13 motion Clerk to Enter Default Fri 01/05 4:53 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Postech Fashion, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Kilina America, Inc.. (Barrett, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 12/04 9:14 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before JANUARY 5, 2024 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/22 4:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kilina America, Inc.. upon Postech Fashion, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/15/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Weihua Yang. (Barrett, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 07/14 10:52 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9C. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more information. (shb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 07/12 2:11 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Postech Fashion, Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 07/12 2:08 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 07/12 2:07 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 07/12 2:07 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (sh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
5 5 notice Summons Request Tue 07/11 4:35 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Kilina America, Inc.. (Barrett, Trevor)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Tue 07/11 4:34 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Kilina America, Inc.. (Barrett, Trevor)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 07/11 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kilina America, Inc., (Barrett, Trevor)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 07/11 4:32 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kilina America, Inc.. (Barrett, Trevor)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 07/11 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35651371 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Kilina America, Inc.. (Attorney Trevor William Barrett added to party Kilina America, Inc.(pty:pla))(Barrett, Trevor)
Related: [-]