Arizona District Court
Judge:Krissa M Lanham
Case #: 2:23-cv-01274
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jan 06, 2024 2:04 AM MST
Defendant
Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated
Represented By
Brendan Alan Melander
Husch Blackwell Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Jessica Ivy Brown
Husch Blackwell Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Tomasena Powell
Represented By
Kimberly Ann Eckert
Law Offices Of Kimberly A Eckert
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
46 46 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/25 4:14 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated. (Melander, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
45 45 respm Response to Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 03/10 8:03 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tomasena Powell. (Eckert, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
44 44 motion Summary Judgment Fri 02/07 11:57 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated.(Melander, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 11,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 12,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 13,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 14,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 15,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit 16,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit 17,
Att: 19 Exhibit Exhibit 18,
Att: 20 Exhibit Exhibit 19,
Att: 21 Exhibit Exhibit 20,
Att: 22 Exhibit Exhibit 21,
Att: 23 Exhibit Exhibit 22,
Att: 24 Exhibit Exhibit 23,
Att: 25 Exhibit Exhibit 24,
Att: 26 Exhibit Exhibit 25
Monday, November 25, 2024
43 43 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 11/25 10:46 AM
ORDER granting42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Dispositive Motions. Dispositive motions due by 2/7/2025. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Krissa M Lanham on 11/25/2024. (NSH)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
42 42 motion Extension of Time Fri 11/22 3:54 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Dispositive Motions by Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated.(Melander, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
41 41 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 09/17 11:19 AM
ORDER the motion to extend (Doc.40 ) is GRANTED. The parties shall complete all discovery no later than 10/21/24. Dispositive motions are due no later than 12/4/24. Signed by District Judge Krissa M. Lanham on 9/16/24. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
40 40 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 09/16 12:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Stipulation by Tomasena Powell.(Eckert, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
39 39 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 09/11 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated. (Melander, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
38 38 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 09/03 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Tomasena Powell. (Eckert, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
37 37 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 08/28 10:02 AM
ORDER - The conference set for November 18, 2024, is VACATED. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by District Judge Krissa M Lanham on 8/27/2024. (NSH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
36 36 notice Notice of Deposition Tue 08/27 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Deposition of Abigail Rivera, filed by Tomasena Powell. (Eckert, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 08/13 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated. (Melander, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
34 34 minute_ord ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges Wed 08/07 9:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Due to the appointment of a new District Judge in the Phoenix Division, this case is hereby reassigned by the Clerk to the Honorable District Judge Krissa M Lanham. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV 23-1274 PHX-KML. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 07/25 9:01 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Tomasena Powell. (Eckert, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 07/22 4:56 PM
ORDER upon review of the Parties' Stipulated31 Motion for Extension of Time, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Case Management Order (Doc.28 ) is extended as follows: The deadline for the completion of fact discovery shall be extended to September 20, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other case deadlines remain the same. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/22/2024. (ESG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
31 31 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 07/17 10:51 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery STIPULATED by Tomasena Powell.(Eckert, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Deposition Tue 07/02 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Deposition of Joseph Skelton, filed by Tomasena Powell. (Eckert, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 06/04 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Tomasena Powell. (Eckert, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/21 9:50 AM
ORDER upon review of the parties' Joint Motion and27 Stipulation to Modify Case Deadlines, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Case Management Orders are extended as follows: Discovery due by 8/5/2024. Dispositive motions due by 11/4/2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the 9/18/2024 trial setting conference is reset to 11/18/2024 at 9:00 a.m. (15 minutes allowed). See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/20/2024. (ESG)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
27 27 misc Stipulation Mon 05/20 12:35 PM
STIPULATION Joint and Motion to Modify Case Deadlines re:12 Scheduling Order,,, Terminate Hearings,,18 Order on Stipulation,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, by Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated.(Melander, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 05/15 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated. (Melander, Brendan)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 05/15 2:55 PM
*Document was filed in the wrong case. All docket text associated with the entry has been removed on 5/15/2024. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 05/13 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated. (Melander, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 05/01 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated. (Melander, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
22 22 misc Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions Mon 04/22 8:55 PM
REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions by Tomasena Powell. (Eckert, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 02/27 7:42 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Tomasena Powell. (Eckert, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 02/16 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated. (Melander, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only) Thu 02/08 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Brendan Alan Melander. (Melander, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/31 8:44 AM
ORDER pursuant to the17 Stipulation to Modify Case Deadlines, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Case Management Order is extended. Discovery due by 6/4/2024. Dispositive motions due by 9/3/2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the 7/19/2024 trial setting conference is reset to 9/18/2024 at 8:45 a.m. (15 minutes allowed). See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 1/30/2024. (ESG)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
17 17 misc Stipulation Fri 01/26 11:32 AM
STIPULATION re:12 Scheduling Order,,, Terminate Hearings,, and Motion to Modify Case Deadlines by Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated.(Melander, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 12/19 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Tomasena Powell. (Eckert, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Mon 10/16 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Alan Melander on behalf of Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated. (Melander, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 30, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Sat 09/30 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Tomasena Powell. (Eckert, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 09/29 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated. (Melander, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
12 12 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Wed 09/06 3:45 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/5/2024. Dispositive motions due by 7/5/2024. IT IS ORDERED the 9/19/2023 Rule 16 Case Management Conference is vacated. On 7/19/2024 at 8:45 a.m. (15 minutes allowed), the Court will conduct a telephonic trial setting conference. Participants shall have their calendars available for the conference. The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/6/2023. (ESG)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Wed 09/06 1:57 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Tomasena Powell. (Eckert, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/25 12:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated. (Melander, Brendan)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/25 11:49 AM
NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated. (ESG)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
8 8 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 08/04 1:47 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 9/19/2023 at 8:45 a.m. (15 minutes allowed). The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 10 days before the Case Management Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). The parties shall jointly file the Case Management Report with the Clerk not less than seven days before the Case Management Conference. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 8/4/2023. (ESG)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/04 11:36 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated.(Melander, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 07/11 3:45 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/11/2023. (ESG)
Related: [-]
5 5 4 pgs order Order Tue 07/11 3:38 PM
ORDER This matter having recently come before this Court, the parties are advised of the following preliminary policies and procedures that will govern these proceedings and are ordered as follows. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/11/2023. (ESG)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 07/11 1:08 PM
Summons Issued as to Transdev Alternative Service Incorporated. (MYE)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
3 3 misc New Case Opened Tue 07/11 1:03 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22089149. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 23-1274 PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Tue 07/11 12:50 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Tomasena Powell. (Eckert, Kimberly) (MYE)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/11 12:47 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22089149 filed by Tomasena Powell. (Eckert, Kimberly)(MYE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet