Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John F Murphy
Case #: 2:23-cv-02664
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2023
Terminated:Oct 13, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jan 08, 2024 4:44 AM EST
Defendant
FXWINNING LIMITED
Represented By
JOHN PATRICK MCAVOY
Zarwin Baum, P.C.
contact info
BRIAN J BARAKAT
Barakat Bossa, PLLC
contact info
ANTHONY R. TWARDOWSKI
Zarwin Baum Devito Kaplan Schaer & Toddy PC
contact info
JOCELYNE ANNE MACELLONI
Barakat & Bossa PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MATTHEW ELONIS
Represented By
STEVEN J. PACINI
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
THEODORE ELONIS
Represented By
STEVEN J. PACINI
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
RAFAEL BRITO CUTIE
Terminated: 10/06/2023
Defendant
ROMAN CARDENAS
Terminated: 10/06/2023
Defendant
CFT SOLUTIONS, LLC
Terminated: 08/25/2023
Represented By
Justin B Kaplan
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
RYAN K. TODD
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough
contact info
JEREMY A. MERCER
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Defendant
RENAN DE ROCHA GOMES BASTOS
Terminated: 08/25/2023
Represented By
Justin B Kaplan
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
RYAN K. TODD
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough
contact info
JEREMY A. MERCER
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Defendant
YVENSON ISRAEL
Terminated: 10/06/2023
Represented By
JOEL AARON READY
Cornerstone Law Firm
contact info
JOE M. GRANT
Lorium Pllp
contact info
Defendant
SAZEDUL KHAN
Terminated: 10/06/2023
Defendant
WANDY TOUSSAINT
Terminated: 10/06/2023
Represented By
JOEL AARON READY
Cornerstone Law Firm
contact info
JOE M. GRANT
Lorium Pllp
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, October 13, 2023
41 41 3 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/13 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MATTHEW ELONIS, THEODORE ELONIS As To all defendants(IN DEN BERKEN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
40 40 motion Quash Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 10/09 7:05 PM
MOTION to Quash Service of Process , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FXWINNING LIMITED.Brief.(BARAKAT, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, October 06, 2023
39 39 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/06 5:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MATTHEW ELONIS, THEODORE ELONIS As To Wandy Toussaint, Yvenson Israel, Rafael Brito Cutie, Roman Cardenas, and Sazedul Khan(IN DEN BERKEN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
38 38 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 09/20 2:57 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR, ATTORNEY JOCELYNE ANNE MACELLONI for FXWINNING LIMITED, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 9/20/23. 9/20/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
37 37 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 09/20 2:54 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR, ATTORNEY BRIAN J BARAKAT for FXWINNING LIMITED, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 9/20/23. 9/20/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 09/20 1:28 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jocelyne Anne Macelloni, Esquire by FXWINNING LIMITED. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16957431.). (TWARDOWSKI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 09/20 1:26 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian J. Barakat, Esquire by FXWINNING LIMITED. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16957412.). (TWARDOWSKI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
34 34 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 09/18 10:59 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE PARTIES AGREE THAT THE DEADLINE FOR THE ELONIS BROTHERS TO FILE THEIR OPPOSITION TO WANDY TOUSSAINTS AND YVENSON ISRAELS MOTION TO DISMISS SHALL BE 10/6/2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 9/18/23. 9/18/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
33 33 misc Stipulation Fri 09/15 5:58 PM
STIPULATION re28 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants Toussaint and Israel's Motion to Dismiss by MATTHEW ELONIS, THEODORE ELONIS. (IN DEN BERKEN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 09/11 8:00 AM
ORDER THAT THIS CAUSE IS BEFORE THE COURT THIS 8TH DAY OF SEPTEMBER 2023, UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT FXWINNING, LTD.S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME. THIS COURT HAS CAREFULLY CONSIDERED THE MOTION, AND IS OTHERWISE FULLY ADVISED IN THE PREMISES. THE MOTION IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT FXWINNING IS GRANTED 30 DAYS FROM THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 9/8/23.9/11/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/08 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN PATRICK MCAVOY on behalf of FXWINNING LIMITED with Certificate of Service(MCAVOY, JOHN)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 09/08 12:49 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (Attorney), filed by FXWINNING LIMITED.Certificate of Service.(TWARDOWSKI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/08 12:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY R. TWARDOWSKI on behalf of FXWINNING LIMITED with Certificate of Service(TWARDOWSKI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
28 28 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 08/31 10:44 AM
First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by YVENSON ISRAEL, WANDY TOUSSAINT.Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction.(READY, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Israel and Toussaint's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Yvenson Israel,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Wandy Toussaint
Monday, August 28, 2023
27 27 3 pgs notice Notice (Other) Mon 08/28 5:10 PM
NOTICE by MATTHEW ELONIS, THEODORE ELONIS of Filing of Declaration of Compliance(IN DEN BERKEN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Compliance,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-A - Affidavit of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1-B - Acceptance Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1-C - E-mail to FxWinning,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1-D - Registered Mail Receipt,
Att: 6 Exhibit 1-E - E-mail to Barakat + Bossa,
Att: 7 Exhibit 1-F - USPS Mail Receipt and Tracking Report,
Att: 8 Exhibit 1-G - Email from B. Barakat
Friday, August 25, 2023
26 26 3 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 08/25 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MATTHEW ELONIS, THEODORE ELONIS As To Defendants CFT Solutions, LLC and Renan de Rocha Gomes Bastos(IN DEN BERKEN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 08/24 2:24 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS NO LATER THAN 8/25/23 OR IT WILL BE DEEMED UNOPPOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 8/24/23. 8/24/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 08/23 8:51 AM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JOE M. GRANT, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 8/22/23. 8/23/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 08/22 3:41 PM
Second MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Joe M. Grant, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16893515.) filed by YVENSON ISRAEL, WANDY TOUSSAINT.Pro Hac Vice Application of Joe Grant, Esq..(READY, JOEL)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 08/22 2:56 PM
ORDER THAT THE NONCOMPLIANT MOTION OF JOE M. GRANT, ESQ.21 FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO MOVE COMPLIANT WITH THE POLICIES AND PROCEDURES, SECTION 4. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 8/22/23.8/22/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 08/22 10:48 AM
First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Joe Grant, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16892100.) filed by YVENSON ISRAEL, WANDY TOUSSAINT.Pro Hac Vice Application of Joe Grant, Esq..(READY, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
20 20 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 08/10 12:26 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CFT SOLUTIONS, LLC.(Kaplan, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 08/10 7:50 AM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF YVENSON ISRAEL AND WANDY TOUSSAINTS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME, THE SAME IS GRANTED. YVENSON ISRAEL AND WANDY TOUSSAINT ARE GRANTED 20 DAYS FROM THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 8/9/23.8/10/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) Modified on 8/10/2023 (bw)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 08/09 12:51 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint filed by YVENSON ISRAEL, WANDY TOUSSAINT.Defendants, Yvenson Israel and Wandy Toussaint's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint.(READY, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/09 7:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOEL AARON READY on behalf of YVENSON ISRAEL, WANDY TOUSSAINT (READY, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order Wed 08/09 7:01 AM
ORDER THAT IT APPEARING DEFENDANT CFT SOLUTIONS, LLC HAS NOT FILED THE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT REQUIRED BY FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 AT THE TIME OF FILING THEIR FIRST APPEARANCE,1 AND REMINDING DEFENDANT CFT SOLUTIONS, LLC OF ITS CONTINUING OBLIGATION UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1(B)(2) TO PROMPTLY FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF ANY CHANGES TO THE INFORMATION REQUIRED BY FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1(A), IT IS ORDERED DEFENDANT CFT SOLUTIONS, LLC SHALL FILE ITS DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NO LATER THAN AUGUST 11, 2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 8/8/23. 8/9/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 08/08 4:23 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JUSTIN KAPLAN, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 8/8/23. 8/8/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 08/08 4:18 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF RYAN TODD, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 8/8/23.8/8/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
13 13 18 pgs respm Memorandum Fri 08/04 5:07 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CFT SOLUTIONS, LLC, RENAN DE ROCHA GOMES BASTOS.(MERCER, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - T. Elonis LPOA,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - M. Elonis LPOA,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Bastos Declaration,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
12 12 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 08/04 5:01 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CFT SOLUTIONS, LLC, RENAN DE ROCHA GOMES BASTOS.Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service.(MERCER, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 08/04 11:14 AM
Consent MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Justin Kaplan ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16858884.) filed by CFT SOLUTIONS, LLC, RENAN DE ROCHA GOMES BASTOS.Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service.(MERCER, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Justin Kaplan,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, August 03, 2023
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Thu 08/03 4:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service (IN DEN BERKEN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 08/03 4:20 PM
Consent MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Ryan Todd ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16857512.) filed by CFT SOLUTIONS, LLC, RENAN DE ROCHA GOMES BASTOS.Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service.(MERCER, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Ryan Todd,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Wed 07/26 10:35 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service (IN DEN BERKEN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Wed 07/26 10:33 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service (IN DEN BERKEN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Wed 07/26 10:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service (IN DEN BERKEN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Wed 07/19 3:46 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service (IN DEN BERKEN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Mon 07/17 1:12 PM
ORDER GRANTING2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF STEVEN J. PACINI. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 7/17/23.7/17/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 07/13 10:54 AM
Summons Issued as to RAFAEL BRITO CUTIE, ROMAN CARDENAS, CFT SOLUTIONS, LLC, RENAN DE ROCHA GOMES BASTOS, FXWINNING LIMITED, YVENSON ISRAEL, SAZEDUL KHAN, WANDY TOUSSAINT. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/13/23 (bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
2 2 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 07/12 6:22 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Steven J. Pacini ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16809385.) filed by MATTHEW ELONIS, THEODORE ELONIS..(IN DEN BERKEN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 07/12 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT against RAFAEL BRITO CUTIE, ROMAN CARDENAS, CFT SOLUTIONS, LLC, RENAN DE ROCHA GOMES BASTOS, FXWINNING LIMITED, YVENSON ISRAEL, SAZEDUL KHAN, WANDY TOUSSAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16808925.), filed by THEODORE ELONIS, MATTHEW ELONIS.(IN DEN BERKEN, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 20 pgs Exhibit A - FxWinning Customer Agreement,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Designation Form