Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:23-cv-03147
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jan 08, 2024 4:01 AM EST
Defendant
3M Company
Represented By
Richard F Bulger
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Daniel Leslie Ring
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Defendant
City of Watertown
Interested Party
State of Tennessee
Represented By
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
State of Arizona
Represented By
Curtis Andrew Cox
Office Of The Attorney General - Phoenix
contact info
Interested Party
State of Rhode Island
Represented By
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
State of Oregon
Represented By
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
State of Ohio
Represented By
Kyle J McGee
Grant And Eisenhofer PA
contact info
Interested Party
State of North Carolina
Represented By
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
State of New Mexico
Represented By
William G. Grantham
New Mexico Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
State of New Hampshire
Represented By
Christopher G Aslin
Nh Attorney General'S Office (environmental)
contact info
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
State of Minnesota
Represented By
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
State of Massachusetts
Represented By
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
State of Maryland
Represented By
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
State of Maine
Represented By
Matthew F Pawa
Seeger Weiss
contact info
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
State of Hawaii
Represented By
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
State of Connecticut
Represented By
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
State of Colorado
Represented By
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Heather Kelly
Office Of The Colorado Attorney General
contact info
Interested Party
State of New Jersey
Represented By
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Gwen Farley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Interested Party
State of Texas
Represented By
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
State of Vermont
Represented By
Laura B Murphy
Vermont Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
State of Wisconsin
Represented By
Bradley Motl
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By
Jimmy Rock
Edelson PC
contact info
Interested Party
The People of the State of California, ex rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California
California Department of Justice 1515 Clay Street
Oakland, CA 94612
Represented By
Nicholas George Campins
California Department Of Justice
contact info
Interested Party
Town of New Windsor
555 Union Ave
New Windsor, NY 12553
Interested Party
City of Everett City of Everett
Represented By
Christopher M Huck
Goldfarb And Huck Roth Riojas PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
City of Greenville
Represented By
Randy Lowell
Burr & Forman (dan Is)
contact info
Interested Party
City of Los Angeles
Represented By
Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Keller Rohrback LLP
contact info
Interested Party
City of New London
Represented By
Brian Keith Estep
Conway Londregan Sheehan And Monaco PC
contact info
Interested Party
Metropolitan Water District of Southern California
Represented By
Jessica K Ferrell
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Interested Party
North Texas Municipal Water District
Represented By
Jessica K Ferrell
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Olivenhain Municipal Water District
777 S. Figueroa Street 34th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Gina Nicholls
Gina Nicholls
contact info
Interested Party
Rainbow Municipal Water District
777 S. Figueroa Street 34th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Gina Nicholls
Gina Nicholls
contact info
Interested Party
Rincon del Diablo Municipal Water District
777 S. Figueroa Street 34th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Gina Nicholls
Gina Nicholls
contact info
Interested Party
Roosevelt County Water Coop, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher Ross Rodriguez
Singleton Schreiber LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Airway Heights, City of
Represented By
Jessica K Ferrell
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Interested Party
California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By
Annadel Angeline Almendras
California Attorney Generals Office
contact info
Janelle Muriel Smith
California Attorney Generals Office
contact info
William Jenkins
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Sarae Snyder
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Interested Party
California State Water Resources Control Board
Represented By
Annadel Angeline Almendras
California Attorney Generals Office
contact info
Janelle Muriel Smith
California Attorney Generals Office
contact info
William Jenkins
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Sarae Snyder
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Interested Party
Security Water District
Interested Party
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By
Ann R Johnston
Pennsylvania Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Interested Party
Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands
Office of the Attorney General Caller Box 10007
Saipan, MP 96950
Represented By
Keisha Blaise
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
DuPont, City of
Represented By
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Guam
Represented By
William J Jackson
Kelley Drye And Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Lakewood Water District
Represented By
Jessica K Ferrell
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Moses Lake, City of
Represented By
Jessica K Ferrell
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Newburgh, City of
Represented By
Amy K Kendall
Knauf Shaw LLP
contact info
Alan Jon Knauf
Knauff Shaw LLP
contact info
Interested Party
District of Columbia
Represented By
Jimmy Rock
Edelson PC
contact info
Movant
Town of East Hampton
Movant
Town of Harrietstown, New York
Movant
Town of Islip, New York
Notice only
Greenville Water System
Objector
Fort Worth, City of
Represented By
Jessica K Ferrell
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Objector
Widefield Water & Sanitation District
Represented By
Alexandra Lisowski
Jones And Keller PC
contact info
Howard Kenison
Jones And Keller PC
contact info
Objector
Hannah Heights Owners Association
Represented By
Jessica K Ferrell
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Objector
Lakehaven Water & Sewer District
Represented By
Jessica K Ferrell
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Objector
Eagle River Water & Sanitation District
Represented By
Jessica K Ferrell
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Objector
Las Cruces, City of
Represented By
Jessica K Ferrell
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Objector
Little Hocking Water Association
3998 Newbury Road
Little Hocking, OH 45742
Represented By
Dennis David Altman
Altmannewman Co Lpa
contact info
Justin Newman
Altmannewman Co Lpa
contact info
Objector
Lower Colorado River Authority
Represented By
Jessica K Ferrell
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Objector
Tacoma, City of
Represented By
Jessica K Ferrell
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Objector
Upper Eagle Regional Water Authority
Represented By
Jessica K Ferrell
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Objector
Vancouver, City of
Represented By
Jessica K Ferrell
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Objector
City of La Crosse
Objector
Brazos River Authority
Represented By
Jessica K Ferrell
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Objector
Dallas, City of
Represented By
Jessica K Ferrell
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Jeff B Kray
Marten Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Camden
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
City Of Philadelphia
1515 Arch Street 15th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Village of Bridgeport
301 Main Street
Bridgeport, OH 43912
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Township of Verona
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Seaman Cottages
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Niagara County
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Megan E Shannon
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Martinsburg Municipal Authority
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dutchess County Water and Wastewater Authority and Dalton Farms Water System
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
California Water Service Company
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Benwood
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Brockton
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Delray Beach
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Coraopolis Water & Sewer Authority
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
City of South Shore
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Sioux Falls
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Pineville
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Megan E Shannon
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Iuka
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Megan E Shannon
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Freeport
Represented By
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Robert H Klonoff
Robert H Klonoff LLC
contact info
Elizabeth Fegan
Fegan Scott LLC
contact info
Special Master
Matthew Garretson
TERMINATED PARTIES
Movant
Leech Lake Band of Ojibwe
Terminated: 11/17/2023
Represented By
Robert J Nelson
Lieff Cabraser Heimann And Bernstein
contact info
Dan Drachler
Lieff Cabraser Heimann And Bernstein LLP
contact info
Eric B Fastiff
Lieff Cabraser Heimann And Bernstein LLP
contact info
Emily Harwell
Lieff Cabraser Heimann And Bernstein
contact info
Elizabeth J Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann And Bernstein LLP
contact info
Frank Sharp Holleman, IV
Sonosky Chambers Sachse Endreson And Perry LLP
contact info
Katherine Amanda Saunders
Sonosky Chambers Sachse Miller And Monkman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
271 271 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/03 1:46 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOVANT VILLAGE OF ARDMORE'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO ALLOW PHASE ONE ACTION FUND CLAIMS FORM SUBMISSIONS IN THE 3M PWS SETTLEMENT AND DUPONT PWS SETTLEMENT This Order Relates to 2:23-cv-03147-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG. The Court GRANTS Movant Village of Ardmore's motion ( 6861 Motion in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (270) in case 2:23-cv-03147-RMG; (234) in case 2:23-cv-03230-RMG). AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/3/2025.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03147-RMG, 2:23-cv-03230-RMG(sshe, )
Related: [-]